ABOOD et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DAVID AKIN, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, RONALD BAILEY, ANDY P. ANDREWS, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, GARY ALPERT, ADAM ANDERSON, DEMARCO ANDREWS, KYLE BARRIX, GLEN ARMSTRONG, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, ELOY BARELA, STACEY ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, GLENN ANDERSON, GLENN BASS, II, JORDAN ARNOLD, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, CODY BARDWELL, CION BARNETT, MARK ANDERSON, DARRYL ALEXANDER, CHAD ALAN BALS, BRENDON AUSTIN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, DAVID BALL, DAVINA ALLEN, TODD MATTHEW BACON, BRENT BAILEY, GRIGORY AGREST, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, JAMES ARD, THOMAS BAILEY, BRYCE BATES, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, JARED BARKER, JAMES MERRILL BARB, JUSTIN BARKER, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, SCOTT ALEXANDER, BRYON BAILEY, JEREMY E ATCHISON, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, JEFFREY BALANDRA, KYLE ARMSTRONG, MALACHI ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, DONNY ANDERSON, DAVID AMMERMAN, CLINTON ATHEY, SAM AQUILA, MATTHEW BACAK, KEVIN ARTMAN, RICHARD BACA, II, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, PATRICK BALLARD, FREDERICK ALLEN, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, ROBERT BARRETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, RAYMOND ARANA, JOSEPH BARRY, MATTHEW ANDIS, JOHN ALLEN, NOEL ALBA, TONY ALEXANDER, ERIC BASSETT, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, DEVIN ALLEN, STEVEN BALDWIN, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, AARON ANDERSON, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, RAYMOND BAILEY, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, GARY HEATH ADAMS, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, KAMANE ASKINS, BRANDY BARNES, NEIL BARCLAY, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, THOMAS ARNONE, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARBER, RUBEN ABREU, GRIFFIN ABOOD and JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC, 3M COMPANY, AEARO LLC, DOES 1-50, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03373
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #25 Plaintiffs' Objections to #23 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES re #23 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #24 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019. Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019.) (djb)
October 10, 2019 Set Deadlines Replies due by 10/17/2019. (djb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply memoranda are due by October 17, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2019. (djb)
October 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand, re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, (djb)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/24/2019. (djb)
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 MOTION to Seal Defendants' #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibit 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/24/2019) (djb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #4 Response (Sealed)) (djb).
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is directed to terminate Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, ECF No. #14 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/11/2019. (sdw)
September 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION to Withdraw #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (sdw)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/23/2019.) (sdw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by GRIFFIN ABOOD, RUBEN ABREU, JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA, GARY HEATH ADAMS, NICK ADAMS, STACEY ADAMS, DANE KURTIS ADKINS, GRIGORY AGREST, SEAN ROBERT AHNER, DAVID AKIN, NOEL ALBA, FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER, DARRYL ALEXANDER, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TONY ALEXANDER, DAVINA ALLEN, DEVIN ALLEN, FREDERICK ALLEN, JOHN ALLEN, MICHAEL ALLEN, MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN, SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND, GARY ALPERT, DAVID AMMERMAN, AARON ANDERSON, ADAM ANDERSON, DONNY ANDERSON, GLENN ANDERSON, JONATHAN L. ANDERSON, MALACHI ANDERSON, MARK ANDERSON, MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON, MATTHEW ANDIS, ANDY P. ANDREWS, DEMARCO ANDREWS, LUIS VINCENTY APONTE, SAM AQUILA, RAYMOND ARANA, JAMES ARD, AUSTIN RAY ARMER, CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG, GLEN ARMSTRONG, KYLE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER, BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT, MICHAEL ARNENTEA, JORDAN ARNOLD, THOMAS ARNONE, KEVIN ARTMAN, LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER, KAMANE ASKINS, JEREMY E ATCHISON, CLINTON ATHEY, BRENDON AUSTIN, HOWARD JAMES AVERY, CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ, RICHARD BACA, II, MATTHEW BACAK, TODD MATTHEW BACON, DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW, JORDAN BADSTUEBNER, BRENT BAILEY, BRYON BAILEY, RAYMOND BAILEY, RONALD BAILEY, THOMAS BAILEY, XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY, JEFFREY BALANDRA, MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN, STEVEN BALDWIN, DAVID BALL, PATRICK BALLARD, CHAD ALAN BALS, RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER, MICHAEL M BARAHONA, JAMES MERRILL BARB, ROBERT BARBER, NEIL BARCLAY, CODY BARDWELL, ELOY BARELA, JARED BARKER, JUSTIN BARKER, DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II, BRANDY BARNES, CHRISTOPHER J BARNES, CION BARNETT, LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT, WESLEY BARNHOUSE, ROBERT BARRETT, KYLE BARRIX, JOSEPH BARRY, LEON BARTHOLOMEW, GLENN BASS, II, ERIC BASSETT, BRYCE BATES. (SINGLETON, GERALD) Modified on 9/11/2019 (sdw).
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02186. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-33) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2186 SRN/TNL. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7070283) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABOOD et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID AKIN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN L. ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY P. ANDREWS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN RAYMONE ALMOND
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY ALAN ARNDT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY ALPERT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMARCO ANDREWS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE BARRIX
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN ARMSTRONG
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANTHONY BALANDRAN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELOY BARELA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY ADAMS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICK ADAMS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN BASS, II
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN ARNOLD
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CARLOS ARMSTRONG
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODY BARDWELL
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CION BARNETT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL ALEXANDER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD ALAN BALS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDON AUSTIN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL EDWARD ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BALL
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVINA ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD MATTHEW BACON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIGORY AGREST
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUSTIN RAY ARMER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ARD
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYCE BATES
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE ASCHENBRENNER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED BARKER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MERRILL BARB
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BARKER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAVIER MARTIN MORGAN B BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ARNENTEA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT ALEXANDER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYON BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY E ATCHISON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL JOSEPH BARLOW, II
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY BALANDRA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE ARMSTRONG
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALACHI ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW ELLIOT ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL M BARAHONA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNY ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID AMMERMAN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON ATHEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM AQUILA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BACAK
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN ARTMAN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BACA, II
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANE KURTIS ADKINS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BALLARD
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN BADSTUEBNER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BARRETT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN TAYLOR BARNETT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND ARANA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BARRY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW ANDIS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOEL ALBA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY ALEXANDER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BASSETT
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN AVILA-GOMEZ
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS VINCENTY APONTE
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN ALLEN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BALDWIN
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL BRADLEY BANISTER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON ANDERSON
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON BARTHOLOMEW
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND BAILEY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN ROBERT AHNER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MICHAEL BADGEROW
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD JAMES AVERY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY HEATH ADAMS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO JESUS ALCOSER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER J BARNES
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMANE ASKINS
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY BARNES
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL BARCLAY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM WESLEY ARNDER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ARNONE
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY BARNHOUSE
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BARBER
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN ABREU
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN ABOOD
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN ALBERTO ACOSTA
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?