FLICK v 3M COMPANY
Plaintiff: ZACHARY FLICK
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03482
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to Attorney James H. Cook. (djb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00266. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Conditional Transfer Order CTO-34 MDL 2885 Flick v. 3M Company to Florida Northern District. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-34) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in IAS/4:19-cv-00266, 573 in MDL No. 2885) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/16/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2885, IAS/4:19-cv-00266 (TLL) (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34) Finalized on 9/16/19. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:19-cv-00266, 584 in MDL No. 2885).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Florida for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/16/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2885, IAS/4:19-cv-00266 (TLL) (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Letter and complaint emailed to panel. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3909148., filed by Zachary Flick. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/27/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/27/2019.(Cook, James) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLICK v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY FLICK
Represented By: James H Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?