PETTAWAY v. ALLEY APPLE MASONRY INC et al
Plaintiff: Kennedy Pettaway
Defendant: Alley Apple Masonry Inc and Roland A Landingin
Case Number: 3:2019cv03488
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/20/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2019. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/6/2019. (sdw)
November 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ALLEY APPLE MASONRY INC, ROLAND A LANDINGIN. (BARNETT, RYAN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ALLEY APPLE MASONRY INC. (Attachments: #1 ROLAND A LANDINGIN) (sdw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number FLN3-13260. Fee status updated to paid. (sdw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SCHMITZ, GREGORY)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alley Apple Masonry Inc, Roland A Landingin (Filing fee $400.), filed by Kennedy Pettaway. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued for Corporation, #2 Summons to be Issued for Individual) (SCHMITZ, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETTAWAY v. ALLEY APPLE MASONRY INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Pettaway
Represented By: GREGORY RONALD SCHMITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alley Apple Masonry Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A Landingin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?