ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC v. KAN
Plaintiff: ONLINE PET SUPPLY, LLC, a Florida limited liability company and ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC
Defendant: PAUL KAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv03511
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PAUL KAN. (PRICE, MICHAEL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC. (WARZECHA, MARK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK F WARZECHA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WARZECHA, MARK)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/6 /2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/6/2019. Discovery due by 2/19/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/23/2019. (alb)
October 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PAUL KAN. (PRICE, MICHAEL)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANDREW PRICE on behalf of PAUL KAN (PRICE, MICHAEL)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC. ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (BOWMAN, J)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #6 Affidavit of Service filed by ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC. The above document was filed incorrectly, please re-file using "Summons Returned Executed" under "Service of Process" to allow the system to set appropriate answer deadlines. (alb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Paul Kan on 10/01/19, filed by ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC. (BOWMAN, J)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PAUL KAN. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by ONLINE PET SUPPLY, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (BOWMAN, J)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOWMAN, J)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAUL KAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4625893.), filed by ONLINE PET SUPPLY, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BOWMAN, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC v. KAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONLINE PET SUPPLY, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By: J BRUCE BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONLINE PET SUPPLY LLC
Represented By: J BRUCE BOWMAN
Represented By: KELLY GATSON SWARTZ
Represented By: MARK F WARZECHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL KAN
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?