CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC v. SELECTRICITY LLC et al
Plaintiff: Creative Instinct Signs and Graphic Design, Inc. and CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC
Defendant: Selectricity, L.L.C., Kool Karts, Inc. d/b/a Kool Graphics, Selectricity Cooling and Heating, LLC, SELECTRICITY LLC, SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC and KOOL KARTS INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03512
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 Amended Complaint. (sdw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against KOOL KARTS INC, SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC, SELECTRICITY LLC, filed by CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (SCHOFIELD, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC, SELECTRICITY LLC. (ZOESCH, JOHN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KOOL KARTS INC. (ZOESCH, JOHN)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC, SELECTRICITY LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/8/2019). (ZOESCH, JOHN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY GRACE RAHM on behalf of CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC (RAHM, MARY GRACE)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/21/2016. (alb)
October 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice of Appearance. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN R ZOESCH, III on behalf of KOOL KARTS INC, SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC, SELECTRICITY LLC (ZOESCH, JOHN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Selectricity, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 SELECTRICITY COOLING, #2 KOOL KARTS) (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Creative Instinct Signs and Graphic Design, Inc.. (SCHOFIELD, MICHAEL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SCHOFIELD, MICHAEL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4625919.), filed by Creative Instinct Signs and Graphic Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Design, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copyright and Ownership, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cease and Desist Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Screenshots, #6 Exhibit 6 - Demand, #7 Exhibit 7 - Civil Theft Demand, #8 Proposed Summons - Selectricity LLC, #9 Proposed Summons - Selectricity Cooling, #10 Proposed Summons - Kool Karts) (SCHOFIELD, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC v. SELECTRICITY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectricity, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kool Karts, Inc. d/b/a Kool Graphics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectricity Cooling and Heating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTRICITY LLC
Represented By: JOHN R ZOESCH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTRICITY COOLING AND HEATING LLC
Represented By: JOHN R ZOESCH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOOL KARTS INC
Represented By: JOHN R ZOESCH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Instinct Signs and Graphic Design, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES SCHOFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREATIVE INSTINCT SIGNS AND GRAPHIC DESIGN INC
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES SCHOFIELD
Represented By: MARY GRACE RAHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?