SCIRE v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW SCIRE
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv03517
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Attachments: #1 252 Order) (mailed to atty, Shayna E. Sacks) (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 20, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/11/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158050/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17523572).Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCIRE v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW SCIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?