UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PHILLIPS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ANITA S PHILLIPS and WAYNE L PHILLIPS
Case Number: 3:2019cv03620
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. ANITA S PHILLIPS waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (MURPHY, LYNNE)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. WAYNE L PHILLIPS waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (MURPHY, LYNNE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wayne L. Phillips on 10/9/2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, LYNNE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Anita S. Phillips on 10/9/2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, LYNNE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ANITA S PHILLIPS, WAYNE L PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Summons W. Phillips) (alb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MURPHY, LYNNE)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Summons for Anita S. Phillips, #2 Civil Summons for Wayne L. Phillips) (MURPHY, LYNNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PHILLIPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANITA S PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE L PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: LYNNE M MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?