LANE v. MORING et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BURTON LANE
Defendant: BENJAMIN L HALL, RYAN A MCCORMICK, KYLE CREWS, BRIAN FREEMAN, BAILEY M HOTTINGER, KAREN D BERTRAM, HOWELL, TOMMY COOK, K MCKEE, WILLIAM C KEITH, MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR, TIFFANY LAIRD, MARY HEATHER LEDDON, GEORGINA ELISA HICKS, F ORRANIO, BARBARA WILLIAMS, D CULLIFER, JOHN MICHAEL MORING, T MCCOY and SAMUEL DUNAWAY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03745
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/20/2019. (Form mailed w/ORDER). (MB)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff may proceed with this case without prepaying the entire filing fee. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/20/2019. (Letter mailed w/ORDER to DOC). (MB)
November 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JUSTIN BURTON LANE. (MB)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/22/2019. (MB)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. Plaintiff=s motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate. (Filing Fee due by 11/22/2019.) (Form mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/22/2019. (MB)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (3 service copies), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (MB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, JUSTIN BURTON LANE. (MB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JUSTIN BURTON LANE. (MB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JUSTIN BURTON LANE. (MB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR, KAREN D BERTRAM, TOMMY COOK, KYLE CREWS, D CULLIFER, SAMUEL DUNAWAY, BRIAN FREEMAN, BENJAMIN L HALL, GEORGINA ELISA HICKS, BAILEY M HOTTINGER, HOWELL, WILLIAM C KEITH, TIFFANY LAIRD, MARY HEATHER LEDDON, RYAN A MCCORMICK, T MCCOY, K MCKEE, JOHN MICHAEL MORING, F ORRANIO, BARBARA WILLIAMS, filed by JUSTIN BURTON LANE. (3 service copies). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANE v. MORING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN L HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN A MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE CREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAILEY M HOTTINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN D BERTRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM C KEITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY LAIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY HEATHER LEDDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGINA ELISA HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F ORRANIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D CULLIFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MICHAEL MORING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL DUNAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BURTON LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?