DOYLE v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN DOYLE
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03747
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #9 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12851. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Florida Northern. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Aearo Technologies, LLC filed by Kevin Doyle re #1 Complaint. (Ready, Edward) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/1/2019) (pp). Modified on 10/1/2019 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to 3M Company filed by Kevin Doyle re #1 Complaint. (Ready, Edward) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/1/2019) (pp). Modified on 10/1/2019 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Ready, Edward) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/30/2019) (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7876885) filed by Kevin Doyle.Attorney Edward A. Ready added to party Kevin Doyle(pty:pla).(Ready, Edward) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOYLE v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN DOYLE
Represented By: Edward A. Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?