GRIFFIN v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARK C. GRIFFIN
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO HOLDINGS LLC, AEARO LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03754
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #15 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Mailed to Attorney, John P. Rodgers representing Defendants. (djb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida. (AWS) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-37). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/9/19. (AWS) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 2nd NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Bryan F. Aylstock. PHV Requirements Deadline: 11/4/2019 (AWS) Mailed to Bryan F. Aylstock. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aearo Intermediate, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/20/19. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/20/19. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/20/19. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Bryan F Aylstock: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aearo Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aearo, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo, LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aearo Intermediate, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Aearo Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent 3M Company for Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by 3M Occupational Safety LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for 3M Occupational Safety LLC. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by 3M Company. (Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 20, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Franklin County, TN, case number 2019-cv-157. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4082771), filed by Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, 3M Company, Aearo Holdings LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint in State Court, #2 Exhibit 2- Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodgers, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK C. GRIFFIN
Represented By: BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?