PEVEY v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SHELBY PEVEY
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03755
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION to All Counsel of Record. (djb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00176. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Case Transferred to District of Northern Florida. Case transferred via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring cause to Northern District of Florida. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/19. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clerk's Certification of State Court Record - Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to 3M, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Aearo Technologies, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Clerk and Receipt for filing fee - Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter to Clerk forwarding proofs of service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Proof of Service of Summons - 3M, #9 Exhibit 9 - Proof of Service of Summons - Aearo Technologies) (Rushing, Stevie) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/4/19. (rtc) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. William Manuel on behalf of 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC (Manuel, J.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 3, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC, filed by Shelby Pevey. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC from Oktibbeha County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0443-CVC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1725900) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEVEY v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Stevie Farrar Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Stevie Farrar Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY PEVEY
Represented By: Stacy Everett Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?