EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. ZERO WASTE ENERGY LLC
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Defendant: Zero Waste Energy LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04297
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Leave to File re #4 Affidavit, #3 Response/Reply, #2 Notice (Other), #1 MOTION to Vacate filed by ZERO WASTE ENERGY LLC. (SHEPPARD, FRANCIS)
December 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply and For Oral Argument. (sdw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File re #4 Affidavit, #3 Response/Reply, #2 Notice (Other), #1 MOTION to Vacate by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
November 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Affidavit, #3 Response. (sdw)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 Response/Reply of Todd R. Johnston by ZERO WASTE ENERGY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (SHEPPARD, FRANCIS)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE by ZERO WASTE ENERGY LLC re #1 MOTION to Vacate or Modify or Arbitration Award. (SHEPPARD, FRANCIS)
November 6, 2019 Set Deadlines re #1 MOTION to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/20/2019.) (sdw)
November 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Filing, #1 MOTION to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award. (sdw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate or Modify Arbitration Award filed by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AFLNDC- 4687233.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BEASLEY, ROBERT) Modified on 11/5/2019 to edit title of document (sdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. ZERO WASTE ENERGY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Represented By: ROBERT OTHELL BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zero Waste Energy LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS H SHEPPARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?