UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049
Case Number: 3:2019cv04813
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20 /2020. Discovery due by 7/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/7/2020. (alb)
January 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order of Recusal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 1/7/2020. (alb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BYRON ERNEST COTTON on behalf of All Defendants (COTTON, BYRON)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049. (COTTON, BYRON)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DREY, KATHYRN)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM) against 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem) (DREY, KATHYRN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 GMC SIERRA K2500 DENALI, VIN# 1GT12UEY9JF177049
Represented By: BYRON ERNEST COTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KATHYRN WILBURN DREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?