HARRIS v. CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Plaintiff: DARSELL HARRIS
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, MHM HEALTH PROFSSIONALS LLC and MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04939
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, MHM HEALTH PROFSSIONALS LLC. (MOLLOY, CATHERINE)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #11 Joint Report. Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 8/24/2020. Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Mediation to take place by 8/17/2020. Mediation Report due by 8/31/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/3/2020. (sdw)
January 31, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HUXOLL, GAYE)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 26 Disclosures by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, MHM HEALTH PROFSSIONALS LLC. (MOLLOY, CATHERINE)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26 Disclosures by DARSELL HARRIS. (HUXOLL, GAYE)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, MHM Health Professionals, LLC, filed by DARSELL HARRIS. (HUXOLL, GAYE)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to answer the complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A). (Answer due by 1/28/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/14/2020. (sdw)
January 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for a More Definite Statement. (sdw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for a More Definite Statement filed by DARSELL HARRIS. (HUXOLL, GAYE)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CENTURION LLC for CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC.. (MOLLOY, CATHERINE)
December 23, 2019 Set Deadlines re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for a More Definite Statement. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/6/2020.) (sdw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or for a More Definite Statement by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC. (MOLLOY, CATHERINE)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/30/2020. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/17/2019. (sdw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CAYLA MCCREA PAGE on behalf of CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC (PAGE, CAYLA)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC from Santa Rosa County, case number 19000868CAMXAX. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CFLNDC-4743355.), filed by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (MCCREA, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC
Represented By: CAYLA MCCREA PAGE
Represented By: RICHARD COURTNEY MCCREA, JR
Represented By: CATHERINE HOPE MOLLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM HEALTH PROFSSIONALS LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE HOPE MOLLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS INC
Represented By: CATHERINE HOPE MOLLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARSELL HARRIS
Represented By: GAYE LON HUXOLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?