HABISREITINGER v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN HABISREITINGER
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv05081
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11727. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/27/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No. 1 and Amended Order No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7758369) filed by Steven Habisreitinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Steven Habisreitinger(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HABISREITINGER v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HABISREITINGER
Represented By: JEREMIAH A SPRAGUE
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FALCON
Represented By: JARRETT S FALCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?