IN RE: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff: LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, CO-LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS and CO-CHAIR PSC
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, DOES ONE THROUGH FIFTY INCLUSIVE, AEARO LLC, CO-LIAISON COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS and 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
In Re: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019md02885
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 2786 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John B. Quinn.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6711980.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (QUINN, JOHN)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2785 COMPLAINT Original against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6711817.), filed by Bobby Lynn Cook. (WEBSTER, JASON)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2784 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel Rosenberg.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6711376.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ROSENBERG, RACHEL)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2783 ORDER granting #2679 Plaintiffs' Motion to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 02/18/22. (grj)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2782 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Tawil.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6710650.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (TAWIL, DAVID)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2781 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven L. Reitenour.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6710277.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (REITENOUR, STEVEN)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2780 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Denis Carey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6708566.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CAREY, DENIS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2779 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT. The Court hereby appoints Adriane Theis of Reisman Karron Greene LLP as a Special Master in this litigation for the purpose of assisting with the management of the Wave process. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/18/2022. (djb)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2778 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie M.K. Siegal.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6708115.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (SIEGAL, JULIE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2777 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rick Barreca.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6707453.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BARRECA, RICK)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2776 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2775 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yasmine G. Meyer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6707363.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MEYER, YASMINE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2774 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christa C. Cottrell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6707346.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (COTTRELL, CHRISTA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2773 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam R. Zurbriggen.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6707349.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ZURBRIGGEN, ADAM)
February 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2781 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven L. Reitenour; #2778 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie M.K. Siegal; #2782 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Tawil; #2780 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Denis Carey. (requirements met) (djb)
February 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2784 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel Rosenberg. (requirements met) (djb)
February 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2773 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam R. Zurbriggen; #2774 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christa C. Cottrell; #2777 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rick Barreca; #2775 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yasmine G. Meyer. (requirements met) (djb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2771 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS NATHAN LURIE, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (LURIE, THOMAS)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2770 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Casey L. Miller.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6703373.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MILLER, CASEY)
February 17, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2767 Defendants' MOTION for Order to Show Cause Based on Failure to Comply with Discovery (djb)
February 17, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2770 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Casey L. Miller. (requirements met) (djb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2772 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS: 22nd Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2022. Attendance of counsel in person, by telephone, and by Zoom. U.S. Magistrate Judge Gary Jones and Special Master Judge David Herndon present by Zoom. Order to follow memorializing the Case Management Conference. (Court Reporter Donna Boland.) (blr)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2769 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kyle DeCamp) Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(H)(1)(B) and Request for Removal from Service List by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2768 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Micah Brown) Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(H)(1)(B) and Request for Removal from Service List by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2767 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2766 ORDER granting #2743 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2744 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2749 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2756 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2759 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2764 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed ALYSSA CHRISTINE CLARK,STEFANIE ANN TUBBS,MEGHAN ANN AGOSTINELLI,WILLIAM M GAGE for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC; DIANE K WATKINS,GREGORY SEAN JEZ for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/16/2022. (djb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2765 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Erickson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6700420.) by NOTICE ONLY. (ERICKSON, MARC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2764 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William M. Gage.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6699087.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (GAGE, WILLIAM)
February 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2764 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William M. Gage. (requirements met) (djb)
February 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2765 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Erickson.(requirements met) (djb)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2763 ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/15/2022. The following are the docket numbers for each of the motions: Beal, case no. 7:20-cv-00006, ECF No. 57; Kelley, case no. 7:20-cv-00153, ECF No. 47; Vaughn, case no. 7:20-cv-00134, ECF No. 49; Vilsmeyer, case no. 7:20-cv-00113, ECF No. 60; Wilkerson, case no. 7:20-cv-00035, ECF No. 80. The Clerk is directed to file this order in each of the above referenced cases and must terminate the motion to seal in each of the cases. (kdm)
February 15, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2756 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diane K. Watkins; #2759 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by G. Sean Jez. (requirements met) (djb)
February 15, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger , #2757 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2762 ORDER - The #2761 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon Olsson is GRANTED temporarily for the limited purpose of the deposition scheduled on February 15, 2022. Counsel must file an amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice providing the required Certificate of Good Standing before making any further appearances. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/14/2022. (FS)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2761 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon Olsson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6692935.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jon E. Olsson for pro hac vice admission) (OLSSON, JON)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2760 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please continue to use the same Conference Call Instructions found at #5 Notice from Clerk to Counsel for #2741 Order setting the Case Management Conference to begin at 3:00 PM Central on Wednesday, February 16, 2022 (and for all future CMC's). - To connect to the conference call, please dial: 1-888-684-8852 - You will be prompted for the access code: 8296522# - Once the host has connected, you will be prompted for the security code: 3192885# Please mute your incoming volume and DO NOT place your phone on hold; otherwise, everyone will hear your office "music on hold." (blr)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2759 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by G. Sean Jez.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-6692310.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (JEZ, GREGORY) Modified on 2/15/2022 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY (djb).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2758 ORDER. This Order addresses representation issues with regard to duplicate cases filed on the active docket. Despite the Courts warning, the 39 plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A have two cases filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with each other and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 14 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dismissals to be filed on or before 2/28/2022.) (djb)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2757 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger filed by ELLIOTT BERGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Berger) (BATES, PHILIP)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2756 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diane K. Watkins.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6690679.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing MO Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B Related Cases) (WATKINS, DIANE) Modified on 2/15/2022 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2755 ORDER. This Order addresses issues related to duplicate cases filed on the active docket. The plaintiffs' law firms are hereby on notice that from the date of this Order forward, filing fees will not be refunded for any case filed on the active docket that is later dismissed as a duplicate case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/14/2022. (djb)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2754 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH BRABB on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRABB, ELIZABETH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2753 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH BRABB on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRABB, ELIZABETH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2752 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH BRABB on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRABB, ELIZABETH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2751 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH BRABB on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BRABB, ELIZABETH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2750 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA KAMINSKI on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KAMINSKI, JESSICA)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2749 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghan Agostinelli.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6688709.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (AGOSTINELLI, MEGHAN)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2748 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY R KIMBROUGH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KIMBROUGH, KELLY)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2747 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
February 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2749 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghan Agostinelli. (requirements met) (djb)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2746 ORDER. On January 21, 2022, the Court directed these 23 plaintiffs to submit the required authorizations, respond to Defendants discovery requests, and show cause why his or her case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and comply with an #2549 ORDER of the Court. The time for compliance expired on January 28, 2022, and the plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A failed to file a response to the Court's show cause Order. These plaintiffs are directed to file a response confirming that they complied with the Court's show cause Order and provided Defendants with therequisite materials by Wednesday, February 16, 2022 at 12 PM (Central Time), otherwise their case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2745 ORDER granting #2690 Motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #2700 Motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #2712 Motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #2722 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2724 Motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #2725 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2727 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2728 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2732 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2733 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2735 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2739 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2740 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed BRANDON M PELLEGRINO,AUSTIN DAVID O'MALLEY,MARK A DREHER for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC; BLAIR BERTRAM MATYSZCZYK, DANIEL L CEISLER, JOAN D TOOMEY, FRED HOWARD SHEPHERD, III,JESSICA KAMINSKI,GEORGE MICHAEL STEWART, GRACE PHILLIPS CHANDLER, AMY MARIE GABRIEL, ROBERT ALLEN GREEN, NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/11/2022. (djb)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2744 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stefanie Tubbs.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6683930.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (TUBBS, STEFANIE)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2743 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alyssa Clark.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6683626.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CLARK, ALYSSA)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2742 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-142) Certified - 17 actions re: MDL 2885, MN/0:22-cv-00272, MN/0:22-cv-00275, MN/0:22-cv-00279, MN/0:22-cv-00285, MN/0:22-cv-00286, MN/0:22-cv-00289, MN/0:22-cv-00290, MN/0:22-cv-00292, MN/0:22-cv-00293, MN/0:22-cv-00296, MN/0:22-cv-00297, MN/0:22-cv-00298, MN/0:22-cv-00299, MN/0:22-cv-00300, MN/0:22-cv-00301, MN/0:22-cv-00302, MN/0:22-cv-00303. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-142 Finalized) (djb)
February 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2744 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stefanie Tubbs, #2743 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alyssa Clark. (requirements met) (djb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2741 ORDER - The Court will hold a Case Management Conference on Wednesday, February16, 2022 at 3PM CT to discuss the wave process and the upcoming Wave Order #2.Counsel may appear in person, via Zoom or via telephone; however, due to thelimited number of persons Zoom can accommodate, only one counsel per plaintifflaw firm may appear via Zoom. All others wishing to appear must do so in person or via telephone. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/10/2022. (FS)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2740 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Ryan Mayfield.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6679617.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MAYFIELD, NICHOLAS) Modified on 2/10/2022 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
February 10, 2022 Filing 2739 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Allen Green.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6679222.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GREEN, ROBERT) Modified on 2/10/2022 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY (djb).
February 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2735 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A.Dreher. (requirements met) (djb)
February 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2740 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Ryan Mayfield; #2739 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Allen Green. (requirements met for both) (djb)
February 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2736 MOTION for Leave to File Objection re #2610 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (djb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2738 OBJECTION to #2610 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, dated January 26, 2022 by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2737 OBJECTION to #2610 Report and Recommendations dated January 26, 2022 by ELLIOTT BERGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BATES, PHILIP)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2736 MOTION for Leave to File re #2610 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is recommended that: (1) in future bellwether trials the Court find that Elliott Berger is not unavailable as contemplated under Rule 32(a)(4)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and (2) the Court conclude that the by ELLIOTT BERGER. (BATES, PHILIP)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2735 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A.Dreher.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6677552.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DREHER, MARK)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2734 ORDER granting #2691 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2703 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed RICHARD D SCHUSTER for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, and DARYL J DOUGLAS for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/9/2022. (djb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2733 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin D. O'Malley.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6676321.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing for New York) (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2732 AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Gabriel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6675831.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GABRIEL, AMY) Modified on 2/9/2022 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY also to note finance dept notified of second filing fee paid (djb).
February 9, 2022 Filing 2731 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-141) Certified- 28 actions re: MDL No. 2885. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/9/2022. (see order for case list) (Attachments: #1 CTO-141 Finalized) (djb)
February 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2733 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin D. O'Malley. (requirements met) (djb)
February 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2732 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Gabriel. (requirements met) (djb)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2730 NOTICE of Appearance by ALICIA P ELLSAYED on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ELLSAYED, ALICIA)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2729 FILED IN ERROR Counsel and Finance Department will be notified COMPLAINT Mark Givens and Jennifer Givens against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6672338.), filed by 3M COMPANY, Mark Givens, Jennifer Givens. (RUBENSTEIN, MARTIN) Modified on 2/9/2022 (djb).
February 8, 2022 Filing 2728 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Grace P. Chandler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6670619.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (CHANDLER, GRACE) Modified on 2/8/2022 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY (djb).
February 8, 2022 Filing 2727 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Michael Stewart.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6670355.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (STEWART, GEORGE)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2726 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSE MANUEL LUZARRAGA on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (LUZARRAGA, JOSE)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2725 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Mace Pellegrino.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6669051.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brandon M. Pellegrino Certificate of Good Standing) (PELLEGRINO, BRANDON)
February 8, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2725 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Mace Pellegrino. (requirements met) (djb)
February 8, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2727 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Michael Stewart; #2728 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Grace P. Chandler. (requirements met) (djb)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2724 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Kaminski by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAMINSKI, JESSICA)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2723 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-140) Certified - 11 actions. re: MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:22-cv-00213, MN/0:22-cv-00214, MN/0:22-cv-00216,MN/0:22-cv-00217, MN/0:22-cv-00218, MN/0:22-cv-00219, MN/0:22-cv-00220, MN/0:22-cv-00222,MN/0:22-cv-00223, MN/0:22-cv-00227, MN/0:22-cv-00231) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-140 Finalized) (djb)
February 7, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2722 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred H. Shepherd. (requirements met) (djb)
February 7, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2724 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Kaminski, re: #2764 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (requirements met) (djb)
February 7, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2719 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Group D Putative Expert Opinions Under Daubert and Rule 702; #2717 MOTION to Seal Document #2716 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants Expert Opinions and Testimony, the Declaration of Bryan F. Aylstock in Support of Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of (djb)
February 5, 2022 Filing 2722 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred H. Shepherd.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6664428.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SHEPHERD, FRED)
February 5, 2022 Filing 2721 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Antony Joseph Opinions Under Daubert and Rule 702 and Incorporated Memorandum by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2720 MOTION to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2719 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Group D Putative Expert Opinions Under Daubert and Rule 702 by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2718 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Group D Putative Expert Opinions Under Daubert and Rule 702 and Incorporated Memorandum (Public Version) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2717 MOTION to Seal Document #2716 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants Expert Opinions and Testimony, the Declaration of Bryan F. Aylstock in Support of Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants Expert Opinions and Testimony, and related exhibits by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2716 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants' Expert Opinions and Testimony by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Aylstock (Redacted), #2 Exhibit PX 1-44 SEALED COVER) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2715 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2714 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW WILLIAM CARY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC (CARY, ANDREW)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2713 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW WILLIAM CARY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC (CARY, ANDREW)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2712 MOTION (AMENDED) TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR JOAN D. TOOMEY by NOTICE ONLY. (TOOMEY, JOAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2711 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW WILLIAM CARY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CARY, ANDREW)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2710 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW WILLIAM CARY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC (CARY, ANDREW)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2709 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2708 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2707 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2706 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2705 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2704 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2703 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daryl J. Douglas.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6663101.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (DOUGLAS, DARYL)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2702 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN HUEY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HUEY, NATHAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2701 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN HUEY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HUEY, NATHAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2700 MOTION 2nd AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6659920.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (CEISLER, DANIEL)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2699 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAMON STEPHANIE MOSS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MOSS, SHAMON)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2698 Amended MOTION MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6659920.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (CEISLER, DANIEL)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2697 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN HUEY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HUEY, NATHAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2696 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-139) (Certified) - 5 actions re: MDLNo. 2885. MN/0:22-cv-00195, MN/0:22-cv-00196, MN/0:22-cv-00197,MN/0:22-cv-00198, MN/0:22-cv-00201. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-139 Finalized) (djb)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2695 ORDER granting #2661 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2664 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2665 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2667 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2669 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2673 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2675 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2677 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2678 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2680 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2682 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2683 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2685 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed KELLY R KIMBROUGH,CATHERINE B SLAVIN,JULIE BARDACKE HADDON,ANGELA G STRICKLAND,ANDREW WILLIAM CARY,THOMAS NATHAN LURIE, JR,NEIL MATTHEW KLIEBENSTEIN,JAMES DOMINIC CAMPODONICO,NATHAN HUEY,SHELLEY W COLEMAN for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC; ALICIA P ELLSAYED,ALEXANDRA WHITNEY ROBERTSON,SHAMON STEPHANIE MOSS for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/3/2022. (djb)
February 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2689 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blair Matyszczyk, #2690 Amended MOTION AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blair Matyszczyk; #2691 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Schuster. (requirements met) (djb)
February 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2700 SECOND AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6659920.) (requirements met) (djb)
February 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2698 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler. (civil case not indicated) (djb)
February 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2703 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daryl J. Douglas. #2712 MOTION (AMENDED) TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR JOAN D. TOOMEY (requirements met) (djb)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2694 ORDER. The #2671 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joan D. Toomey is DENIED without prejudice, for failure to provide the required Certificate of Good Standing. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/3/2022. (djb)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2693 ORDER - The #2674 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Wieczorkiewicz is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case pending within the MDL in which counsel appears as attorney of record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/3/2022. (djb)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2692 ORDER - The #2647 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Gabriel is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case pending within the MDL in which counsel appears as attorney of record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/3/2022. (djb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2691 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Schuster.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6661756.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SCHUSTER, RICHARD)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2690 Amended MOTION AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blair Matyszczyk.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6661579) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MATYSZCZYK, BLAIR)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2689 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blair Matyszczyk.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6661579.) by NOTICE ONLY. (MATYSZCZYK, BLAIR)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2688 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN M SEDGH on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (SEDGH, JONATHAN)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2687 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J PENNOCK on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PENNOCK, PAUL)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2686 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Ceisler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6659920.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (ZIMMERMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2685 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shamon Moss.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6659811.) by NOTICE ONLY. (MOSS, SHAMON)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2684 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-138) Certified - 39 actions re: MDLNo. 2885. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-138 Finalized) (djb)
February 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2682 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan A. Huey; #2683 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shelley Coleman.(requirements met) (djb)
February 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2685 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shamon Moss. (requirements met) (djb)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2683 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shelley Coleman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6657741.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COLEMAN, SHELLEY)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2682 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan A. Huey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6657386.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (HUEY, NATHAN) Modified on 2/3/2022 (djb).
February 2, 2022 Filing 2681 NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL MATTHEW KLIEBENSTEIN on behalf of 3M COMPANY (KLIEBENSTEIN, NEIL)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2680 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra W. Robertson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6656844.) by NOTICE ONLY. (ROBERTSON, ALEXANDRA)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
February 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger . Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
February 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger (djb)
February 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2680 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra W. Robertson.(requirements met) (djb)
February 2, 2022 Motions No Longer Referred: to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS #2679 MOTION to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) from Elliott Berger (djb)
February 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2678 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Dominic Campodonico; #2677 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil M. Kliebenstein. (requirements met) (djb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2678 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Dominic Campodonico.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6655117.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (CAMPODONICO, JAMES)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2677 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil M. Kliebenstein.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6655074.) by 3M COMPANY. (KLIEBENSTEIN, NEIL)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2676 NOTICE of Appearance by LUCIA VERONICA PAZOS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (PAZOS, LUCIA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2675 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Lurie.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6654508.) by 3M COMPANY. (LURIE, THOMAS)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2674 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Wieczorkiewicz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6654231.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KAMINSKI, JESSICA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2673 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Cary.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6654187.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (CARY, ANDREW)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2672 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA G STRICKLAND on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (STRICKLAND, ANGELA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2671 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joan D. Toomey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6654214.) by NOTICE ONLY. (TOOMEY, JOAN)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2670 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA G STRICKLAND on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (STRICKLAND, ANGELA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2669 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Angela G. Strickland.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6653971.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (STRICKLAND, ANGELA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2668 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY RAY JONES on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (JONES, GREGORY)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2667 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie B. Haddon.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6653967.) by 3M COMPANY. (HADDON, JULIE)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2666 ORDER granting the following Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice #2630 , #2633 , #2634 , #2636 , #2637 , #2643 , #2644 , #2645 , #2646 , #2657 , #2658 , #2659 , #2660 ; and terminating #2632 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/01/2022. (tvj)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2665 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Slavin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6653778.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing)) (SLAVIN, CATHERINE)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2664 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alicia Ellsayed.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6653682.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- List of Cases) (ELLSAYED, ALICIA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2663 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY R KIMBROUGH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KIMBROUGH, KELLY)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2662 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(H)(1)(B) and Request for Removal From Service List by NOTICE ONLY (MILLER, JAY)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2661 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly R. Kimbrough.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6653272.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (KIMBROUGH, KELLY)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2660 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate Unger Davis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6653045.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (UNGER, KATHERINE)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2659 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline Bolden.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6652902.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BOLDEN, JACQUELINE)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2658 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Augustine.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6652789.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (AUGUSTINE, STEVEN)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2657 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Jones.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6652779.) by NOTICE ONLY. (STASSI, ERIKA)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2656 TRANSFER ORDER Certified. Transferring 7 actions - MDL No. 2885, MN/0:21-cv-02132, MN/0:21-cv-02134, MN/0:21-cv-02136, MN/0:21-cv-02138, MN/0:21-cv-02140, MN/0:21-cv-02143, MN/0:21-cv-02259. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order Finalized) (djb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2655 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN RECH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RECH, STEVEN)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2654 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH T SMITH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SMITH, ELIZABETH)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2653 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY L OSTERLUND on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (OSTERLUND, ANTHONY)
February 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2671 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joan D. Toomey. (certificate not attached) (djb)
February 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2657 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Jones; #2658 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Augustine. (djb)
February 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2675 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Lurie; #2669 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Angela G. Strickland; #2673 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Cary. (requirements met) (djb)
February 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2664 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alicia Ellsayed; #2665 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Slavin; #2667 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie B. Haddon; #2661 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly R. Kimbrough. (djb)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2652 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 33. (Transition Order #3). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2651 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN WONG ROMAINE on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ROMAINE, SUSAN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2650 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2649 MOTION to Substitute Attorney MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by NOTICE ONLY. (STEVENS, LINDSAY)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2648 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY L STONE on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Claimants) (STONE, AMY)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2647 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Gabriel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6648262.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (GABRIEL, AMY) Modified on 1/28/2022 to correct filer (djb).
January 28, 2022 Filing 2646 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stevie F. Rushing.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6648193.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing) (RUSHING, STEVIE)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2645 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henrique A. Geigel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6648082.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GEIGEL, HENRIQUE)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2644 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rajeev K. Adlakha.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647995.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ADLAKHA, RAJEEV)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2643 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allen L. Rutz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647966.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (RUTZ, ALLEN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2642 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-137) Certified - 15 actions. re: MDL No. 2885, MN/0:22-cv-00099, MN/0:22-cv-00104, MN/0:22-cv-00110, MN/0:22-cv-00111, MN/0:22-cv-00113, MN/0:22-cv-00115, MN/0:22-cv-00116, MN/0:22-cv-00117, MN/0:22-cv-00118, MN/0:22-cv-00119, MN/0:22-cv-00120, MN/0:22-cv-00122, MN/0:22-cv-00123, MN/0:22-cv-00125, MN/0:22-cv-00127. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-137 Finalized) (djb)
January 28, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2644 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rajeev K. Adlakha; #2643 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allen L. Rutz; #2645 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henrique A. Geigel. (djb)
January 28, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2633 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Roper; #2637 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Duffy Randolph ("Randy") Reagan; #2632 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Duffy Randall ("Randy") Reagan; #2636 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Horan; #2634 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Hugo. (djb)
January 28, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2647 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Gabriel; #2646 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stevie F. Rushing. (djb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2641 NOTICE of Appearance by VIVIAN R HARRIS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (HARRIS, VIVIAN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2640 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNY TANG on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TANG, DENNY)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2639 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX TOVSTOLUG on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TOVSTOLUG, ALEX)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2638 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY PASQUALE MASTROIANNI on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MASTROIANNI, ANTHONY)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2637 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Duffy Randolph ("Randy") Reagan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647477.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (REAGAN, DUFFY)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2636 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Horan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647374.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (HORAN, THOMAS)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2635 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY JOHNSON DEGRUY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (DEGRUY, TIFFANY)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2634 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Hugo.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647215.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (HUGO, JOHN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2633 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Roper.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647263.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ROPER, MEGAN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2632 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Duffy Randall ("Randy") Reagan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6647210.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (REAGAN, DUFFY)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2631 ORDER granting #2590 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2591 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2596 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2597 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2600 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2601 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2602 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2605 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2606 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2611 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2612 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2614 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2618 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2619 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2621 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2623 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2624 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2625 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2628 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2629 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed JORDAN LEIGH SCHWINDT, STEVEN RECH, DAVID M TAYLOR, ANDREW DAVID THARP, KATHARINE S PERRY, SUSAN WONG ROMAINE, SHANNON L H PHILLIPS, ROSHAN RAJKUMAR, WILLIAM GREG LOCKWOOD, DAVID WAYNE CORNEIL for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. HAYDEN NICHOLAS WYATT, SAMIRA KHAZAELI, BRET D STANLEY, BRITTANY A RYGIEL, LEZZLIE HORNSBY,ALINA MARIE GREGORY, ERIKA MARIE STASSI, MARIELLE BRISBOIS, RENEE M FINCH, AMY L STONE for NOTICE ONLY) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/27/2022. (djb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2630 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurence G. Tien.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646983.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (TIEN, LAURENCE)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2629 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David W. Corneil.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646612.) by 3M COMPANY. (CORNEIL, DAVID)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2628 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Renee M. Finch.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646635.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (FINCH, RENEE)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2627 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA MARIE STASSI on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (STASSI, ERIKA)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2626 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEE M FINCH on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (FINCH, RENEE)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2625 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marielle Brisbois.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646480.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BRISBOIS, MARIELLE)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2624 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika M. Stassi.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646461.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert of Good Standing) (STASSI, ERIKA) Modified on 1/27/2022 to enter NOTICE ONLY as filer (djb).
January 27, 2022 Filing 2623 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Gregory Lockwood.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646405.) by 3M COMPANY. (LOCKWOOD, WILLIAM)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2622 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2621 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alina M. Gregory.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6646182.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (GREGORY, ALINA)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2620 NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON MORRIS CONNORS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2619 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lezzlie E. Hornsby.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6645891.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Of Good Standing) (HORNSBY, LEZZLIE)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2618 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roshan N. Rajkumar.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6645814.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2617 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON L H PHILLIPS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (PHILLIPS, SHANNON)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2616 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-136) Certified - 2 actions re: MDL No. 2885, (PAE/2:21-cv-04444, PAE/2:21-cv-04445). Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-136 Finalized) (djb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2615 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON L H PHILLIPS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (PHILLIPS, SHANNON)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2614 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon L. H. Phillips.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6645738.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (PHILLIPS, SHANNON) Modified on 1/27/2022 (djb).
January 27, 2022 Filing 2613 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSHAN RAJKUMAR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RAJKUMAR, ROSHAN)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2612 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy L. Stone.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6645695.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit List of Claimants) (MOODY, WILLARD) (Main Document 2612 replaced on 1/27/2022) (djb).
January 27, 2022 Filing 2611 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan W. Romaine.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6645664.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ROMAINE, SUSAN)
January 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2611 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan W. Romaine; #2614 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon L. H. Phillips; #2612 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy L. Stone. (djb) Modified on 1/27/2022 (djb).
January 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2630 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurence G. Tien. (djb)
January 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2625 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marielle Brisbois; #2619 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lezzlie E. Hornsby; #2624 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika M. Stassi; #2623 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Gregory Lockwood; #2621 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alina M. Gregory; #2618 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roshan N. Rajkumar. (djb)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2610 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended that: (1) in future bellwether trials the Court find that Elliott Berger is not unavailable as contemplated under Rule 32(a)(4)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and (2) the Court conclude that the November 22, 2021 Order does not bar Defendants from requesting permission to present Berger's testimony by remote transmission under Rule 43(a) and, therefore, Defendants are not unable to introduce any of Berger's testimony unless Berger voluntarily appears or unless Plaintiffs call Berger remotely. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/26/2022. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/23/2022. The Clerk is directed to file this report and recommendation in the master case, 3:19-md-2885-MCR-GRJ and also file it in the individual cases, Sloan v. 3M, case no.7:20cv-1-MCR-GRJ and Wayman v. 3M, case no. 7:20-cv-149-MCR-GRJ. (kdm)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2609 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVE FILS-AIME on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (FILS-AIME, STEVE)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2608 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERRIE ARMSTRONG DAVIS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (DAVIS, SHERRIE)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2607 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP JUDSON COMBS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (COMBS, PHILIP)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2606 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brittany Rygiel.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6644347.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (RYGIEL, BRITTANY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2605 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BRET STANLEY.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6644310.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (STANLEY, BRET) Modified on 1/26/2022 to correct filer (djb).
January 26, 2022 Filing 2604 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER GUS PAULOS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PAULOS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2603 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA T PAPANTONIO on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PAPANTONIO, SARA)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2602 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katharine S. Perry.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6644149.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (PERRY, KATHARINE)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2601 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew D. Tharp.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6644141.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (THARP, ANDREW)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2600 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samira Khazaeli.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6643891.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KHAZAELI, SAMIRA) Modified on 1/26/2022 to correct filer (djb).
January 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2596 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Taylor; #2591 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven R. Rech; #2597 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hayden N. Wyatt; #2590 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordan L. Schwindt. (djb)
January 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2600 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samira Khazaeli. (djb)
January 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2602 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katharine S. Perry; #2601 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew D. Tharp; #2605 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BRET STANLEY; #2606 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brittany Rygiel. (djb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2599 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD RYAN, III on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (RYAN, GERARD)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2598 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL ULITSKY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (ULITSKY, PAUL)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2597 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hayden N. Wyatt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6643526.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (WYATT, HAYDEN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2596 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Taylor.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6643491.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (TAYLOR, DAVID)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2595 NOTICE of Appearance by NINA I WEBB-LAWTON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (WEBB-LAWTON, NINA)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2594 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSEMARY D WELSH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (WELSH, ROSEMARY)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2593 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH T SMITH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SMITH, ELIZABETH)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2592 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT EDWARD ZULANDT, III on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ZULANDT, ROBERT)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2591 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven R. Rech.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6643016.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (RECH, STEVEN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2590 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordan L. Schwindt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6642888.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SCHWINDT, JORDAN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2589 NOTICE of Appearance by PERRY WALKER DORAN, II on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (DORAN, PERRY)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2588 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KATHLEEN GLASPY on behalf of 3M COMPANY (GLASPY, MARY)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2587 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY KATHLEEN GLASPY on behalf of 3M COMPANY (GLASPY, MARY)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2586 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER - One Notice of Appearance is sufficient. Please do not post for every case in the Lead Case. Re #2585 Notice of Appearance filed by 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, 3M COMPANY, AEARO LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, #2584 Notice of Appearance filed by 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, 3M COMPANY, AEARO LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (djb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2585 NOTICE of Appearance by DANE W SCHRADER on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SCHRADER, DANE)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2584 NOTICE of Appearance by DANE W SCHRADER on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SCHRADER, DANE)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2583 ORDER granting #2520 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2537 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2541 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2543 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2544 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2545 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2546 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2547 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2548 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2550 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2551 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2552 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2557 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2558 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2560 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2561 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2568 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2570 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2571 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2573 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2576 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2577 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2580 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Appointed TAYLOR BRADFORD MAYES, NINA I WEBB-LAWTON, STEPHEN ALAN TENSMEYER, KENNETH R COSTA, TIFFANY JOHNSON DEGRUY, ROBERT EDWARD ZULANDT, III, BRANDON COREY REES, ROSEMARY D WELSH, ALEXANDRIA NICOLE GONZALEZ,MICHAEL C WILLIAMS, JENNIFER JOSLIN, JULIA MARY RAFFERTY, CAITLYN ALEXIS CHELEDEN, SHARON TAMAR TURRET,INGRID GOLEMI, ANN THORNTON FIELD, ANTHONY SINCLAIR MILLER, SHERRIE ARMSTRONG DAVIS, COLIN B RATHE for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC,AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC,RANDOLPH DANIEL JANIS,HANNAH RUTH ROBERTS, JOSHUA HENRY BAUER for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/25/2022. (djb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2582 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN INGRAM CARRINGTON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (CARRINGTON, KATHLEEN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2581 NOTICE of Appearance by DANE W SCHRADER on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SCHRADER, DANE)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2580 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua H. Bauer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6641915.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Active Cases, #2 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing-Texas) (BAUER, JOSHUA)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2579 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R HIGGINBOTHAM on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HIGGINBOTHAM, DANIEL)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2578 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL BENJAMIN TUGGLE on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (TUGGLE, MITCHELL)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2577 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colin B. Rathe.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6641390.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (RATHE, COLIN)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2576 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sherrie Armstrong Davis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6641164.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DAVIS, SHERRIE)
January 25, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2568 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Turret; #2570 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingrid Golemi; #2576 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sherrie Armstrong Davis; #2573 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony S. Miller; #2571 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ann Thornton Field. (djb)
January 25, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2577 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colin B. Rathe. (djb)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2575 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney and withdrawal of counsel by NOTICE ONLY. (SHUART, BLAKE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2574 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney and withdrawal of counsel by NOTICE ONLY. (SHUART, BLAKE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2573 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony S. Miller.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6640737.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (MILLER, ANTHONY)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2572 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE ROSE ATKINSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ATKINSON, NATALIE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2571 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ann Thornton Field.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6640510.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (FIELD, ANN)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2570 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingrid Golemi.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6640475.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (GOLEMI, INGRID)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2569 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE ROSE ATKINSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ATKINSON, NATALIE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2568 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Turret.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6640527.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (TURRET, SHARON)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2567 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP BOHRER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (BOHRER, PHILIP)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2566 NOTICE of Appearance by M DAVID GRIFFITH, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (GRIFFITH, M)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2565 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN MEADOWS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (MEADOWS, SARAH)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2564 NOTICE of Appearance by CEDRIC EARL EVANS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (EVANS, CEDRIC)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2563 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY DANTE MILLER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "EXHIBIT A") (MILLER, JAY)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2562 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEIDA M MIELKE on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (MIELKE, ALEIDA)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2561 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caitlyn A. Cheleden.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6638693.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (CHELEDEN, CAITLYN)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2560 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia M. Rafferty.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6638674.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (RAFFERTY, JULIA)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2559 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY L OSTERLUND on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (OSTERLUND, ANTHONY)
January 24, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2558 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Joslin; #2557 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael C Williams; #2552 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandria N. Gonzalez; #2551 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon C. Rees; #2550 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rosemary D. Welsh. (djb)
January 24, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2560 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia M. Rafferty; #2561 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caitlyn A. Cheleden. (djb)
January 23, 2022 Filing 2558 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Joslin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6638568.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (JOSLIN, JENNIFER)
January 22, 2022 Filing 2557 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael C Williams.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6638532.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing for Michael C Williams) (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2556 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA RACHEL GARRITY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (GARRITY, JESSICA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2555 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B HEWES on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HEWES, MICHAEL)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2554 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN M WATSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (WATSON, BENJAMIN)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2553 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M DYE on behalf of All Defendants (DYE, RICHARD)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2552 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandria N. Gonzalez.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637925.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (GONZALEZ, ALEXANDRIA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2551 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon C. Rees.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637792.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (REES, BRANDON)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2550 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rosemary D. Welsh.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637728.) by 3M COMPANY. (WELSH, ROSEMARY)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2549 ORDER. It is ORDERED that: (1.) Defendants' #2502 Motion for Order to Show Cause Based on Failure to Comply With Discovery, is GRANTED. (2.) All individual plaintiffs identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby ORDERED: (a.) To comply with the Court's Order, ECF No. #2304 , and the parties' stipulation, ECF No. #2468 , by submitting the required records authorizations and responding to Defendants' discovery requests. The submissions are due by January 28, 2022. (b.) To SHOW CAUSE why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with an order of the Court, by January 28, 2022. Each plaintiff's response to the show cause order must be filed on the docket for his or her individual case only and must include a certification from counsel that the requisite materials have been submitted to Defendants. (c.) Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of a case with prejudice. (d.) The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the MDL docket and on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibits A and B. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/21/2022. (djb)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2548 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mitali R. Vyas.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637583.) by NOTICE ONLY. (VYAS, MITALI) Modified on 1/21/2022 to add case number of plaintiff, Russell Hall, Jr., 7:20-cv-61734-MCR-GRJ (djb).
January 21, 2022 Filing 2547 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert E. Zulandt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637584.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (ZULANDT, ROBERT) Modified on 1/21/2022 (djb).
January 21, 2022 Filing 2546 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah R. Roberts.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637571.) by NOTICE ONLY. (ROBERTS, HANNAH) Modified on 1/21/2022 to add case number for plaintiff, Eugene Hernandez, 7:20-cv-61601-MCR-GRJ (djb).
January 21, 2022 Filing 2545 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany deGruy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637556.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DEGRUY, TIFFANY)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2544 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth R. Costa.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637426.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COSTA, KENNETH)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2543 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Tensmeyer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637374.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (TENSMEYER, STEPHEN)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2542 NOTICE of Appearance by LELA HOLLABAUGH on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HOLLABAUGH, LELA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2541 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Webb-Lawton.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637350.) by 3M COMPANY. (WEBB-LAWTON, NINA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2540 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH CAREY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CAREY, JOHN)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2539 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JOSEPH CROSS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CROSS, ANDREW)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2538 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2537 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor B. Mayes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6637044.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MAYES, TAYLOR)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2536 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA ELIZABETH MURRAY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases) (MURRAY, JESSICA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2535 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINA ALLEN RELIFORD on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (RELIFORD, KRISTINA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2534 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD PERRY BERTRAM on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases) (BERTRAM, EDWARD)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2533 NOTICE of Appearance by RHETT MCSWEENEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case List) (MCSWEENEY, RHETT)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2532 NOTICE of Appearance by RHETT MCSWEENEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MCSWEENEY, RHETT)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2531 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES BAILEY KING, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KING, CHARLES)
January 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2520 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randolph Janis. (djb)
January 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2543 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen A. Tensmeyer; #2544 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth R. Costa. (djb)
January 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2541 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Webb-Lawton; #2537 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor B. Mayes. (djb)
January 21, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2548 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mitali R. Vyas; #2545 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany deGruy; #2547 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert E. Zulandt; #2546 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah R. Roberts. (djb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2530 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK FRANCIS SULLIVAN, III on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SULLIVAN, PATRICK)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2529 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER ANN LEVINSKY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (LEVINSKY, HEATHER)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2528 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL DONALD MOTZ on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (MOTZ, PAUL)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2527 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNA MARIE MILLER on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (MILLER, JENNA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2526 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J MCCAMBRIDGE on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (MCCAMBRIDGE, EDWARD)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2525 NOTICE of Appearance by CRYSTAL LIZ KURUVILLA on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KURUVILLA, CRYSTAL)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2524 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW DOUGLAS KELLY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KELLY, MATTHEW)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2523 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA J HENNEMAN on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HENNEMAN, LAURA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2522 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON PATRICK ECKERLY on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ECKERLY, JASON)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2521 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE ELIZABETH DEVAUGHN on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DEVAUGHN, ANNE)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2520 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randolph Janis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6636210.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (JANIS, RANDOLPH)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 ORDER granting the following Motions for Pro Hac Vice admission, ECF Nos. #2373 , #2380 , #2383 , #2385 , #2389 , #2393 , #2400 , #2403 , #2404 , #2405 , #2406 , #2407 , #2408 , #2409 , #2410 , #2411 , #2412 , #2413 , #2414 , #2416 , #2417 , #2418 , #2420 , #2421 , #2422 , #2423 , #2424 , #2425 , #2426 , #2429 , #2430 , #2431 , #2432 , #2434 , #2435 , #2436 , #2437 , #2439 , #2440 , #2441 , #2443 , #2444 , #2447 , #2450 , #2451 , #2452 , #2453 , #2454 , #2455 , #2457 , #2458 , #2469 , #2470 , #2471 , #2472 , #2474 , #2477 , #2478 , #2479 , #2480 , #2481 , #2482 , #2483 , #2484 , #2485 , #2486 , #2487 , #2488 , #2489 , #2490 , #2491 , #2492 , #2493 , #2494 , #2495 , #2496 , #2497 , #2498 , #2499 , #2500 , #2503 , #2504 , #2505 , #2506 , #2507 , #2508 , #2509 , #2510 , #2514 , #2515 , #2516 , #2517 , #2518 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/20/2022. (tvj) . (Main Document 2519 replaced with corrected order on 1/26/2022 re: Kime Smith) (djb). Modified on 1/26/2022 (djb).
January 20, 2022 Filing 2518 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ruston J. Pritchard.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6636106.) by DANIEL WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (PRITCHARD, RUSTON)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2517 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kime H. Smith.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-6636052.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SMITH, KIME)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2516 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Burrichter.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635950.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BURRICHTER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2515 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Sean Berdy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635971.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BERDY, CHRISTOPHER)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2514 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenna M. Miller.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635799.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (J. Miller))) (MILLER, JENNA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2513 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (DELISE, CRISTINA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2512 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (LANIER, KATHRYN)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2511 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (LANIER, W)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2510 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenna C. Newmark.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635559.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (NEWMARK, JENNA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2509 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shundra Crumpton Manning.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635596.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MANNING, SHUNDRA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2508 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harold D. Mooty, III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6635539.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (MOOTY, HAROLD)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2507 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alison Cooney.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634918.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COONEY, ALISON)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2506 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crystal Kuruvilla.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634943.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (C. Kuruvilla))) (KURUVILLA, CRYSTAL)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2505 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mara Cusker Gonzalez.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634904.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CUSKER GONZALEZ, MARA)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2504 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Keenan Carter.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634824.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CARTER, SAMUEL)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2503 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie M. Chesney.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634548.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (CHESNEY, STEPHANIE)
January 20, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2502 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (djb)
January 20, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2506 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Crystal Kuruvilla; #2507 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alison Cooney; #2505 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mara Cusker Gonzalez; #2504 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Keenan Carter. (djb)
January 20, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2510 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenna C. Newmark; #2503 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie M. Chesney; #2514 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jenna M. Miller; #2508 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Harold D. Mooty, III; #2509 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shundra Crumpton Manning. (djb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2502 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2501 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA NICOLE EVANS on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (EVANS, DIANA)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2500 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason A. Cincilla.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6634089.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (CINCILLA, JASON)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2499 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie A. Carpenter.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633914.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (CARPENTER, JULIE)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2498 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika Medina.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633887.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (MEDINA, ERIKA)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2497 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Carey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633883.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Missouri (J.Carey)) (CAREY, JOHN)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2496 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Cross.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633874.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Missouri (A.Cross)) (CROSS, ANDREW)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2495 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cory S. Reed.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633836.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (REED, CORY)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2494 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christina M. Seanor.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633647.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing from State of Mississippi, #2 Exhibit B: Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Louisiana) (SEANOR, CHRISTINA)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2493 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dane W. Schrader.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633496.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (SCHRADER, DANE)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2492 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea La'Verne Edney.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633190.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (EDNEY, LA'VERNE)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2491 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Andrew Hutton.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633163.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HUTTON, JOHN)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2490 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin M. Stockmann.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633157.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (STOCKMANN, KEVIN)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2489 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth J. Ferguson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633088.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (FERGUSON, KENNETH)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2488 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C. Bailey King, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6633083.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - CGS) (KING, CHARLES)
January 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2485 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cedric E. Evans; #2487 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward McCambridge; #2486 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Motz. (djb)
January 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2490 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin M. Stockmann; #2491 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Andrew Hutton; #2488 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by C. Bailey King, Jr; #2492 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea La'Verne Edney; #2489 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth J. Ferguson. (djb)
January 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2495 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cory S. Reed; #2500 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason A. Cincilla; #2497 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Carey; #2496 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Cross; #2499 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie A. Carpenter; #2498 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika Medina. (djb)
January 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2493 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dane W. Schrader; #2494 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christina M. Seanor. (djb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2487 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward McCambridge.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6632670.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (E. McCambridge), #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing Michigan (E. McCambridge)) (MCCAMBRIDGE, EDWARD)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2486 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Motz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6632666.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (P.Motz))) (MOTZ, PAUL)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2485 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cedric E. Evans.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6632526.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (EVANS, CEDRIC)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2484 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth T. Smith.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6632337.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SMITH, ELIZABETH)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2483 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony L. Osterlund.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6632201.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (OSTERLUND, ANTHONY)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2482 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Sullivan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631954.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (P. Sullivan))) (SULLIVAN, PATRICK)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2481 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Anderson Frey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631792.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (FREY, SARA)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2480 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika J. Doherty.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631618.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DOHERTY, ERIKA)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2479 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathleen Glaspy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631621.) by 3M COMPANY. (GLASPY, MARY)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2478 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Adams.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631627.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ADAMS, JAMES)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2477 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Murphy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6631534.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing) (MURPHY, RYAN)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2476 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY LANE HOWARD on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (HOWARD, GARY)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2475 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-135) - 12 actions re: MDLNo. 2885. (MN/0:20-cv-01984, MN/0:20-cv-02010, MN/0:20-cv-02042, MN/0:20-cv-02125, MN/0:20-cv-02408, MN/0:21-cv-01310, MN/0:21-cv-01311, MN/0:21-cv-01313, MN/0:21-cv-01317, MN/0:21-cv-01319, MN/0:21-cv-01546, MN/0:21-cv-01665) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-135 Finalized) (djb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2474 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Van Tuyl.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6630826.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (VAN TUYL, EMILY)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2473 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILERS One Notice of Appearance is sufficient. Please do not post another appearance in the Lead Case. Re #2460 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2463 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2461 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2456 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2465 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2464 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2467 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2462 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2459 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY, #2466 Notice of Appearance filed by NOTICE ONLY. (djb)
January 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2474 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Van Tuyl; #2479 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathleen Glaspy; #2481 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Anderson Frey; #2477 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan M. Murphy; #2480 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erika J. Doherty; #2478 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Adams. (djb)
January 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2469 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina A. Reliford; #2470 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Brown; #2471 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis James Wood; #2472 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Eckerly. (djb)
January 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2482 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Sullivan. (djb)
January 18, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2484 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth T. Smith; #2483 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony L. Osterlund. (djb)
January 15, 2022 Filing 2472 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Eckerly.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6630282.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing (JPE)) (ECKERLY, JASON)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2471 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis James Wood.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6630135.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Cert Good Standing) (WOOD, LEWIS)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2470 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Brown.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6630152.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROWN, KEVIN)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2469 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina A. Reliford.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6630070.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (RELIFORD, KRISTINA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2468 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Service and Authorizations for Wave Cases by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2467 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE FLEMING TRACEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TRACEY, LAWRENCE)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2466 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE FLEMING TRACEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TRACEY, LAWRENCE)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2465 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE FLEMING TRACEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TRACEY, LAWRENCE)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2464 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2463 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2462 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2461 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2460 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2459 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2458 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Kelly.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6629278.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois (M. Kelly)) (KELLY, MATTHEW)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2457 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lela M. Hollabaugh.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6629248.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (HOLLABAUGH, LELA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2456 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA KING on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KING, REBECCA)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2455 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by E. Righton J. Lewis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628841.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter of Good Standing) (JOHNSON LEWIS, ELIZABETH)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2454 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael R. Klatt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628767.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KLATT, MICHAEL)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2453 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth G. Kurowski.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628504.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing) (KUROWSKI, ELIZABETH)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2452 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Cohan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628597.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (COHAN, LINDSEY)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2451 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keith S. Anderson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628414.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ANDERSON, KEITH)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2450 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karina E. Murski.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6628209.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MURSKI, KARINA)
January 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2447 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Candice C. Kusmer. (djb)
January 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2451 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keith S. Anderson; #2450 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karina E. Murski. (djb)
January 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2468 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND AUTHORIZATIONS FOR WAVE CASES (djb)
January 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2453 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth G. Kurowski; #2455 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by E. Righton J. Lewis; #2452 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Cohan; #2454 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael R. Klatt. (djb)
January 14, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2458 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Kelly. (djb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2449 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Hunter J. Norton) Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(H)(1)(b) and Request for Removal from Service List by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BROCK, ROBERT)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2448 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT CLAYTON GREENLEE on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (GREENLEE, SCOTT)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2447 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Candice C. Kusmer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6627490.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Letters of Good Standing) (KUSMER, CANDICE)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2446 NOTICE of Appearance by CLINT JAMES CASPERSON on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CASPERSON, CLINT)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2445 NOTICE of Appearance by TYE CURTIS BELL on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BELL, TYE)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2444 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number CFLNDC-6627049.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MODAK-TRURAN, ANITA)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2443 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tye C. Bell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6627096.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BELL, TYE)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2442 NOTICE of Appearance by CAMERON DAVID TURNER on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (TURNER, CAMERON)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2441 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura Henneman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6627059.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Laura Henneman) (HENNEMAN, LAURA)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2440 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Conner Turner.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626937.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (TURNER, CONNER)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2439 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel O'Neil.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626887.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (O'NEIL, DANIEL)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2438 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GANLEY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (GANLEY, MICHAEL)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2437 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Levinsky.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626783.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Heather Levinsky - Certificate of Good Standing Illinois) (LEVINSKY, HEATHER)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2436 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Larson, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626701.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LARSON, WILLIAM)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2435 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DAVID G. MAYHAN.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626629.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MAYHAN, DAVID)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2434 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Murray.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6626601.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Standing, #2 Exhibit List of Cases) (MURRAY, JESSICA)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2433 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA MARGARET KATEN on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (KATEN, SAMANTHA)
January 13, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2440 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Conner Turner, #2434 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Murray, #2436 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Larson, Jr, #2435 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DAVID G. MAYHAN, #2441 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura Henneman, #2444 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran, #2439 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel O'Neil, #2443 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tye C. Bell, #2437 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Levinsky. (djb)
January 13, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2431 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine A. Mitchell; #2430 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose Manuel Luzarraga; #2432 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles F. Morrow; #2429 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward Bertram. (djb)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2432 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles F. Morrow.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6625232.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MORROW, CHARLES)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2431 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine A. Mitchell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6625174.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of Cases) (MITCHELL, CATHERINE)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2430 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose Manuel Luzarraga.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6624972.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (LUZARRAGA, JOSE)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2429 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward Bertram.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6624912.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of Texas, #2 List of Cases) (BERTRAM, EDWARD)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2428 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE ANN MITCHELL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MITCHELL, CATHERINE)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2427 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN HERRE ECHSNER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (ECHSNER, STEPHEN)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2426 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie L. Sun.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623627.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (SUN, LESLIE)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2425 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edderek Linnel Cole.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623529.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COLE, EDDEREK)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2424 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barton J. Freeman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623526.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (FREEMAN, BARTON)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2423 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M Wilmoth.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623244.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (WILMOTH, THOMAS)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2422 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Elizabeth Carrington.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623226.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CARRINGTON, KATHLEEN)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2421 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin McRae Watson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6623186.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (WATSON, BENJAMIN)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2420 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher David Morris.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6623126.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MORRIS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2419 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-134) Certified - 4 actions. re: MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:20-cv-01753, MN/0:20-cv-01757, MN/0:20-cv-01758, MN/0:20-cv-01763) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 CTO-134 Finalized) (djb)
January 12, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2420 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher David Morris; #2422 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Elizabeth Carrington; #2423 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M Wilmoth; #2421 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin McRae Watson. (djb)
January 12, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2425 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edderek Linnel Cole; #2426 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie L. Sun; #2424 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barton J. Freeman. (djb)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2418 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott C. Greenlee.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6621947.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Texas Certificate of Good Standing) (GREENLEE, SCOTT)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2417 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zandra E. Foley.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6621577.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (FOLEY, ZANDRA)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2416 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey R. Blackwood.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6621548.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BLACKWOOD, JEFFREY)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2415 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA NICOLE GUNTNER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (GUNTNER, DEBRA)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2414 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Michael Barnes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6620659.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BARNES, JONATHAN)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2413 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Z. Brabb.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6620409.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (BRABB, ELIZABETH)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2412 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie B. Atkinson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619965.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (ATKINSON, NATALIE)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2411 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip J. Combs.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619960.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COMBS, PHILIP)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2410 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah A. Meadows.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619953.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MEADOWS, SARAH)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2409 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell B. Tuggle.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619950.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (TUGGLE, MITCHELL)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2408 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. David Griffith, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619945.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (GRIFFITH, M)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2407 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B. Cooke.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619938.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (COOKE, ANDREW)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2417 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zandra E. Foley; #2416 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey R. Blackwood; #2418 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott C. Greenlee. (djb)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2408 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. David Griffith, Jr.; #2405 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nikita S. McMillian; #2407 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B. Cooke; #2406 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Stephen Fritz, Jr.; #2409 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell B. Tuggle; #2412 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie B. Atkinson; #2410 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah A. Meadows; #2404 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Hewes; #2411 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip J. Combs. (djb)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2414 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Michael Barnes. (djb)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2413 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Z. Brabb. (djb)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2406 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Stephen Fritz, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619560.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (FRITZ, JAMES)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2405 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nikita S. McMillian.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619511.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MCMILLIAN, NIKITA)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2404 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael B. Hewes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6619470.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (HEWES, MICHAEL)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2403 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Higginbotham.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6618549.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (HIGGINBOTHAM, DANIEL)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2402 NOTICE of Filing Verification of Compliance with PTO 6 and Destruction of Juror Questionnaires by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2401 NOTICE of Appearance by R JASON RICHARDS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (RICHARDS, R)
January 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2400 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Dye. (djb)
January 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2403 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Higginbotham. (djb)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2400 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Dye.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6616247.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DYE, RICHARD)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2399 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE E ACCETTELLA on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Cases) (ACCETTELLA, ANNE)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2398 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA J CASTRONUOVA on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CASTRONUOVA, SARA)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2397 ORDER denying #2394 Elliott Berger's Expedited Motion Requesting Trial Testimony be Recorded. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/06/2022. (tvj)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2396 ORDER denying #2330 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order dated November 21, 2021 #2300 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/06/2022. (tvj)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2395 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE E LAMKIN on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (LAMKIN, JULIE)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2394 Emergency MOTION Requesting Elliott Berger's Trial Testimony be Recorded for Use or Possible Use at Future Trials by ELLIOTT BERGER. (BATES, PHILIP)
January 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2394 Emergency MOTION Requesting Elliott Berger's Trial Testimony be Recorded for Use or Possible Use at Future Trials (djb)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2393 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chelsie R. Warner.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6611804.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of Cases) (WARNER, CHELSIE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2392 NOTICE of Appearance by CHELSIE RAE WARNER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (WARNER, CHELSIE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2391 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M ROBINSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ROBINSON, SUSAN)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2390 NOTICE of Appearance by KARI L SUTHERLAND on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
January 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2387 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CHOICE OF LAW FACT-FINDING; #2389 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Memorandum on Choice of Law for Bellwether Group D re: #2388 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Choice of Law for Bellwether Group D (djb)
January 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2393 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chelsie R. Warner. (djb)
January 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2385 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrett Messerly. (djb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2389 MOTION to Seal Document #2388 Notice (Other),, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Memorandum on Choice of Law for Bellwether Group D by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2388 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Choice of Law for Bellwether Group D by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Aylstock, #2 Exhibit PX1 Sealed Cover, #3 Exhibit PX2 Sealed Cover, #4 Exhibit PX3 Sealed Cover, #5 Exhibit PX4 Sealed Cover, #6 Exhibit PX5, #7 Exhibit PX6 Sealed Cover, #8 Exhibit PX7 Sealed Cover, #9 Exhibit PX8 Sealed Cover, #10 Exhibit PX9 Sealed Cover, #11 Exhibit PX10 Sealed Cover, #12 Exhibit PX11 Sealed Cover, #13 Exhibit PX12 Sealed Cover, #14 Exhibit PX13 Sealed Cover, #15 Exhibit PX14 Sealed Cover, #16 Exhibit PX15 Sealed Cover, #17 Exhibit PX16 Sealed Cover) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2387 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Choice of Law Fact-Finding by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2386 NOTICE of Appearance by NADIA S ABRAMSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ABRAMSON, NADIA)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2385 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garrett Messerly.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6610281.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (MESSERLY, GARRETT)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2384 ORDER granting #2309 Motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #2310 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2321 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2322 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2323 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2324 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2329 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2333 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2334 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2340 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2343 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2346 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2347 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2348 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2349 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice); granting #2350 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2351 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2353 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2354 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2356 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2359 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2360 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2366 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2367 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2368 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for 3M COMPANY,KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC,KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for AEARO HOLDING LLC,KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC,KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for AEARO LLC,KIMBERLY D HILL,MEGAN DELUREY,SUSAN M ROBINSON,KARI L SUTHERLAND for AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC,DANIEL PATRICK BLOUIN,J ZACHARY ZATEZALO,CLINT JAMES CASPERSON,JULIA CLINE,MICHAEL JAMES GANLEY,LAWRENCE FLEMING TRACEY,KYLE MATTHEW SANFORD,BARRY M LANDY,ROBERT KEITH JENNER,JOHN H ALLEN, III,PAUL MICHAEL DOMINGUEZ,LAUREL LI HARRIS,ANTHONY PASQUALE MASTROIANNI,ALEX TOVSTOLUG,DENNY TANG,VIVIAN R HARRIS,STEVE FILS-AIME,PAUL ULITSKY,GERARD RYAN, III,ANNE E ACCETTELLA,SARA J CASTRONUOVA for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/4/2022. (djb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2383 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Howell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6609402.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (HOWELL, RICHARD)
January 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2381 DEFENDANTS' POST-HEARING BRIEF ADDRESSING NON-PARTYELLIOTT BERGER'S "UNAVAILABILITY" AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL, #2382 PLAINTIFFS POST-DECEMBER 29, 2021 HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, re #2330 MOTION for Reconsideration Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
January 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2380 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rhett A. McSweeney. (djb)
January 4, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2383 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Howell. (djb)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2382 NOTICE of Filing Post-December 29, 2021, Hearing Supplemental Brief by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2381 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Post-Hearing Brief Addressing Non-Party Elliott Berger's Unavailability as a Witness at Trial by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BROCK, ROBERT)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2380 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rhett A. McSweeney.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6608532.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Case List) (MCSWEENEY, RHETT)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2379 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILERS to not add parties to the lead case. Plaintiffs have been deleted off the docket and notice of appearances edited to change parties to NOTICE ONLY. Re #2376 Notice of Appearance filed by VINCENT PINTO, #2375 Notice of Appearance filed by RICARDO DOLCINE, #2374 Notice of Appearance filed by RICARDO DOLCINE (djb)
January 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2373 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne E. DeVaughn. (djb)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2378 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 32. The Court hereby extends the deadline found in CMO 27 #2164 by an additional sixty (60) days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/31/2021. (jff)
December 31, 2021 Filing 2377 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RICARDO DOLCINE, VINCENT PINTO re #2376 Notice of Appearance, #2375 Notice of Appearance (DRUMMOND, STEPHEN)
December 31, 2021 Filing 2376 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN L DRUMMOND on behalf of NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DRUMMOND, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/3/2022 to correct filer from VINCENT PINTO to NOTICE ONLY party (djb).
December 31, 2021 Filing 2375 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN L DRUMMOND on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DRUMMOND, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/3/2022 to correct filer from RICARDO DOLCINE to NOTICE ONLY party (djb).
December 30, 2021 Filing 2374 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROL GREEN VON KAUL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (VON KAUL, CAROL) Modified on 1/3/2022 to correct filer from RICARDO DOLCINE to NOTICE ONLY party (djb).
December 30, 2021 Filing 2373 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne E. DeVaughn.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6606678.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Case List) (DEVAUGHN, ANNE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2372 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE E LAMKIN on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (LAMKIN, JULIE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2371 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE E LAMKIN on behalf of Joshua Vanbeek (LAMKIN, JULIE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2370 FILED IN ERROR - Open an individual civil case COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6605605.), filed by Joshua Vanbeek. (LAMKIN, JULIE) Modified on 12/30/2021 to note finance department will be notified to refund filing fee (djb).
December 29, 2021 Filing 2369 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES:Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/29/2021 - written recommendation to follow (Court Reporter Lynn Durscher (Phipps)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Highlight, #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Exhibit 1-5) (tss)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2368 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence F. Tracey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6603710.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing TX) (TRACEY, LAWRENCE)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2367 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari L. Sutherland.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6603415.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2366 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Accettella.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6603234.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B-List of Related Cases) (ACCETTELLA, ANNE)
December 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2367 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari L. Sutherland, #2366 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Accettella. (djb)
December 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2360 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan M. Robinson, #2368 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence F. Tracey. (djb)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2365 RESPONSE by Elliott Berger re #2364 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Compel Response to Subpoena and Privilege Log. (BATES, PHILIP)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2364 ORDER denying #2358 Berger's Motion to Quash; granting #2361 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Third-Party Discovery. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/28/21. (grj)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2363 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREL LI HARRIS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case List) (HARRIS, LAUREL)
December 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2362 Notice of Compliance with Court Order. #2361 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Third-Party Discovery. Referred to GARY R JONES. (alb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2362 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by Elliott Berger re #2357 Order (BATES, PHILIP)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2361 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Third-Party Discovery by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2360 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan M. Robinson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6600981.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ROBINSON, SUSAN) (Main Document 2360 replaced with correct document on 12/27/2021) (alb).
December 27, 2021 Filing 2359 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Delurey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6600595.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (DELUREY, MEGAN)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2358 MOTION to Quash and Objection by Elliott Berger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BATES, PHILIP)
December 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2353 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly D. Hill.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6596931), #2354 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara J. Castronuova.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6597015), #2356 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerard Ryan, III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6597831), #2359 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Delurey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6600595.), (alb)
December 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2358 MOTION to Quash and Objection. Referred to GARY R JONES. (alb)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2357 ORDER scheduling evidentiary hearing before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Jones on Wednesday, December 29, 2021 at 10:00 AM EST re #2355 Order Referring Motion,,. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/22/21. (grj)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2356 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerard Ryan, III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6597831.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (RYAN, GERARD)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2355 ORDER- Given the pretrial filings currently before the undersigned ahead of the Sloan and Wayman consolidated bellwether trial beginning January 10, 2022, the Court finds it appropriate to refer this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Gary Jones to conduct an evidentiary hearing and the preparation of a report and recommendation pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). re #2330 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/21/2021. Motions referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2354 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara J. Castronuova.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6597015.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B) (CASTRONUOVA, SARA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2353 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly D. Hill.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6596931.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (HILL, KIMBERLY)
December 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2351 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Ulitsky. (djb)
December 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2352 Response in Opposition to Motion, #2330 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2300 Order and Rule 72 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's November 22, 2021 Order (djb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2330 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2300 Order and Rule 72 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's November 22, 2021 Order filed by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Aylstock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2351 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Ulitsky.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6595247.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (ULITSKY, PAUL)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2350 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steve Fils-Aime.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6595208.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (FILS-AIME, STEVE)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2349 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vivian R. Harris.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6595184.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (HARRIS, VIVIAN)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2348 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Denny Tang.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6595048.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (TANG, DENNY)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2347 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Tovstolug.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6594937.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (MASTROIANNI, ANTHONY)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2346 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Mastroianni.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6594890.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Actions) (MASTROIANNI, ANTHONY)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2345 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. This Document Relates to: Beal, 7:20cv6. The trial of this case will begin Monday, May 9, 2022 and conclude by Friday, May 20, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2344 ORDER - Given the recent dismissal of the McNeal case, No. 7:20cv66, the trial schedule for the above-captioned Group D cases will be modified accordingly: The trial in the Vilsmeyer case, No. 7:20cv113, will now begin Monday, March 14, 2022 and conclude by Friday, March 25, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial in the Beal case, No. 7:20cv6, will begin Monday, May 9, 2022 and conclude by Friday, May 20, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/20/2021. (djb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2343 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurel Li Harris.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6593781.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases) (HARRIS, LAUREL)
December 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2343 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurel Li Harris, #2340 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Dominguez. (djb)
December 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2350 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steve Fils-Aime, #2347 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Tovstolug, #2349 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vivian R. Harris, #2346 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Mastroianni, #2348 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Denny Tang. (djb)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2342 Filed in Error. Must be filed in the individual civil case. STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) by NOTICE ONLY. (MCCLELLAN, ABBY) Modified on 12/20/2021 (djb).
December 17, 2021 Filing 2341 Filed in Error in Lead Case - open individual civil case. COMPLAINT James E. Chambers against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6592051.), filed by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DOMINGUEZ, PAUL) Modified on 12/20/2021 to note Finance department will be notified (djb).
December 17, 2021 Filing 2340 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Dominguez.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6592013.) by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit New Plaintiff Filing) (DOMINGUEZ, PAUL)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2339 Filed in Error in Lead Case - open individual civil case. COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6589250.), filed by George Green. (MENDENHALL, CALLE) Modified on 12/16/2021 (djb).
December 15, 2021 Filing 2338 Filed in Error in Lead Case - open individual civil case. COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6588734.), filed by Jason Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JAGOLINZER, DAVID) Modified on 12/16/2021 (djb).
December 15, 2021 Filing 2337 Filed in Error in Lead Case - open individual civil case. COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6588691.), filed by Brian Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JAGOLINZER, DAVID) Modified on 12/16/2021 (djb).
December 14, 2021 Filing 2336 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-133) Certified - re: MDL No. 2885. (3 actions, MN/0:21-cv-02592, MN/0:21-cv-02593, MN/0:21-cv-02595) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-133 Finalized) (djb)
December 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2333 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John H. Allen, III; #2334 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael James Ganley. (djb)
December 11, 2021 Filing 2335 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA T PAPANTONIO on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PAPANTONIO, SARA)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2334 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael James Ganley.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6582593.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. Certificate of Good Standing NY) (GANLEY, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2333 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John H. Allen, III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6581919.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ALLEN, JOHN)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2332 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-132) Certified. re: MDL No. 2885. (CAC/2:21-cv-09230) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-132 Finalized) (djb)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2331 TRANSFER ORDER (Certified) re: MDL No. 2885, MN/0:21-cv-01758, MN/0:21-cv-01767, MN/0:21-cv-01909. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order Finalized) (djb)
December 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2329 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert K. Jenner. (djb)
December 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2330 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2300 Order and Rule 72 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's November 22, 2021 Order (djb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2330 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2300 Order and Rule 72 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's November 22, 2021 Order by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BROCK, ROBERT)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2329 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert K. Jenner.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6576231.) by NOTICE ONLY, Robert Jenner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (JENNER, ROBERT)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2328 NOTICE of Verification of Compliance With Pretrial Order No. 85 and Destruction of Juror Questionnaires by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ROGERS, BRENTON)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2327 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff Montero's Verification of Compliance with PTO 4 and Destruction of Juror Questionnaires by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2326 MOTION to Seal Document re #2325 Notice Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Regarding Elliott Berger's October 8, 2015, Deposition Testimony (djb)
December 5, 2021 Filing 2326 MOTION to Seal Document #2325 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Regarding Elliott Berger's October 8, 2015, Deposition Testimony by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 5, 2021 Filing 2325 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Regarding Elliott Berger's October 8, 2015, Deposition Testimony by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS re #2320 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Aylstock, #2 Exhibit 3 Sealed Cover, #3 Exhibit 4 Sealed Cover, #4 Exhibit 5 Sealed Cover) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2324 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry M. Landy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6572215.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (LANDY, BARRY)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2323 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia Cline.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6572119.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing) (CLINE, JULIA)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2322 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle M. Sanford.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6572091.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SANFORD, KYLE)
December 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2323 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia Cline; #2324 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry M. Landy; #2322 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle M. Sanford. (djb)
December 2, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2321 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clint Casperson. (djb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2321 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clint Casperson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6568997.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing) (CASPERSON, CLINT)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2320 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Regarding Elliott Berger's October 8, 2015 30(B)(6) Deposition Testimony by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS re #2300 Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan Aylstock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2319 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-131) Certified - 7 actions re: MDL 2885 (GAN/1:21-cv-04765, MN/0:21-cv-02494, MN/0:21-cv-02498, MN/0:21-cv-02499, MN/0:21-cv-02500, MN/0:21-cv-02501, MN/0:21-cv-02502) Inasmuch asno objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-131 Finalized) (djb)
December 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2320 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Regarding Elliott Berger's October 8, 2015 30(B)(6) Deposition Testimony, re: #2300 Order (djb)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2318 NOTICE of Appearance by EPHRAIM SAMUEL GEISLER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (GEISLER, EPHRAIM)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2317 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JAMES THORNBURGH on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (THORNBURGH, DANIEL)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2316 NOTICE of Appearance by BOBBY J BRADFORD on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (BRADFORD, BOBBY)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2315 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD K SCHROM on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (SCHROM, GERARD)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2314 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-130) Certified - 6 actions re: MDL No. 2885, MN/0:21-cv-02488, MN/0:21-cv-02490, MN/0:21-cv-02491, MN/0:21-cv-02492, MN/0:21-cv-02493, MN/0:21-cv-02495) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-130 Finalized) (djb)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2313 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-127) re: MDL No. 2885 MN/0:21-cv-02361) IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of CTO-127 is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-127 Stay Lifted) (djb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2312 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEJANDRO ALVAREZ on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (ALVAREZ, ALEJANDRO)
November 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2309 Amended MOTION Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Blouin, #2310 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Zachary Zatezalo. (djb)
November 26, 2021 Filing 2311 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JAMES SNIDOW on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (SNIDOW, JOHN)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2310 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Zachary Zatezalo.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6559931.) by NOTICE ONLY. (ZATEZALO, J) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY(djb).
November 24, 2021 Filing 2309 Amended MOTION Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice Daniel Blouin by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (BLOUIN, DANIEL)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2308 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C ROGERS, JR on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (ROGERS, ROBERT)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2307 ORDER granting #2251 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2257 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2265 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2266 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2274 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2277 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2291 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2293 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2294 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2295 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2296 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2297 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2298 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2299 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/23/2021. (Appointed PAUL SAMPSON,KATE WALLING AGUIAR,BRADLEY DAVID MASTERS,CAROLINE H STEPHENS,JAMES DAVID YATES, JR,OLIVIA JORDAN POSS,DANIEL R MURDOCK,PAUL QUINCY,WILLIAM BRADFORD BARBER for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. Appointed JOHN JAMES SNIDOW, ERICARAE GARCIA, GERARD K SCHROM, LINDSAY ZANELLO, JEFFREY MICHAEL KUNTZ for NOTICE ONLY) (djb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2306 ORDER - The #2278 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Zachary Zatezalo is DENIED without prejudice for failure to provide a Certificate of Good Standing dated within 30 days of the motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/23/2021. (djb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2305 ORDER - The #2284 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Blouin is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case pending within the MDL in which counsel appears as attorney of record. See ECF No. 86, II. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/23/2021. (djb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2304 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 31. (Wave Order #1). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jff)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2303 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-129) Certified - 7 actions. re: MDLNo. 2885. ( MN/0:21-cv-02435, MN/0:21-cv-02442, MN/0:21-cv-02444, MN/0:21- cv-02445, MN/0:21-cv-02446, MN/0:21-cv-02447, MN/0:21-cv-02448) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-129 Finalized) (djb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2302 PRIVACY ACT ORDER NO. 44. Plaintiffs' #2270 Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibits A1 through A4 to Plaintiffs motion, ECF No. #2270 -2, UNDER SEAL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/22/2021. (djb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2301 ORDER granting #2269 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/22/2021. (djb)
November 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2297 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Quincy; #2298 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Bradford Barber; #2299 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Kuntz. (djb)
November 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2300 ORDER regarding affirmative designations of Elliott Berger's prior trial testimony in the Group C and Sloan/Wayman trials. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/21/2021. (tvj)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2299 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Kuntz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6553664.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing MO Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B Related Cases) (KUNTZ, JEFFREY) Modified on 11/22/2021 to Correct Filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
November 19, 2021 Filing 2298 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Bradford Barber.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6553366.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BARBER, WILLIAM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2297 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Quincy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6552480.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (QUINCY, PAUL)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2296 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Murdock.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6551790.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (MURDOCK, DANIEL)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2295 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Olivia Poss.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6551752.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (POSS, OLIVIA)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2294 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James D. Yates.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6551678.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (YATES, JAMES)
November 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2295 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Olivia Poss; #2296 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Murdock; #2294 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James D. Yates. (djb)
November 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2293 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LINDSAY N ZANELLO. (djb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2293 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LINDSAY N ZANELLO.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6550132.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (ZANELLO, LINDSAY)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2292 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-124) (Certified) in MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:21-cv-02286) IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of CTO-124 is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/17/2021. (djb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2291 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Harvilee Stephens.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6549030.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (STEPHENS, CAROLINE)
November 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2291 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Harvilee Stephens. (djb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2290 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' remaining motions to exclude expert testimony and opinions, in whole or in part, under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert in the Group C cases. See ECF Nos. #2042 , #2051 . All Daubert challenges for the Group C cases have now been resolved. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/16/2021. (tvj)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2289 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel, Robert S. Carey re: Kelley L. Stonebraker and Nathaniel B. Morse. Please file the motion to withdraw in the individual civil case, 3:20-cv-05360. The Motions to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff will be terminated by the clerk. Re #2281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nathaniel B. Morse as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso, #2282 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelley L. Stonebraker as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso. (djb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2288 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel, John Hafemann and C. Dorian Britt. Please file the motion to withdraw in the individual civil case, 3:19cv4929. The #2286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs will be terminated by the clerk. (djb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2287 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-128) (Certified) - 4 actions re: MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:21-cv-02426, MN/0:21-cv-02427, MN/0:21-cv-02428, MN/0:21-cv-02429) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-128 Finalized) (djb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (HAFEMANN, JOHN)
November 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2284 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Blouin. (djb)
November 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nathaniel B. Morse as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso, #2282 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelley L. Stonebraker as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso (djb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2285 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6541096.), filed by Joseph Edna-Perry Alston. (ANDERSON, GARY) Modified on 11/12/2021 to note finance department will be notified for a refund of filing fee (djb).
November 11, 2021 Filing 2284 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Blouin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6541027.) by Daniel Blouin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Certificate of Good Standing) (BLOUIN, DANIEL)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2283 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6540951.), filed by Antonio Lavell Acuff. (ANDERSON, GARY) Modified on 11/12/2021 to note finance department will be notified for a refund of filing fee (djb).
November 11, 2021 Filing 2282 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelley L. Stonebraker as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso by NOTICE ONLY. (CAREY, ROBERT)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nathaniel B. Morse as Counsel for Plaintiff Steven R. DeGiso by NOTICE ONLY. (CAREY, ROBERT)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2280 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY CHANNICK on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CHANNICK, KIMBERLY)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2279 NOTICE of Appearance by DALE CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (RUSSELL, DALE)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2278 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Zachary Zatezalo.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6537724.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ZATEZALO, J) Modified on 11/9/2021 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY (djb).
November 9, 2021 Filing 2277 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley D. Masters.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6537352.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (MASTERS, BRADLEY)
November 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2278 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Zachary Zatezalo. (djb)
November 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2277 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley D. Masters. (djb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2276 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA J HUNT on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (HUNT, AMANDA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2275 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6534770.), filed by John P. Cannon, Harry Underwood. (CANNON, JOHN) Modified on 11/8/2021 to note Finance Department will be notified re refund (djb).
November 8, 2021 Filing 2274 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerard K. Schrom.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6534331.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SCHROM, GERARD)
November 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2274 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerard K. Schrom. (djb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2273 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Blake W. Gibney) Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(H)(1)(B) and Request for Removal from Service List by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BROCK, ROBERT)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2272 Filed in Error - Counsel to open individual case Finance Department notified for a refund. COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6531925.), filed by Andrew Grim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SAUNDERS, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/5/2021 (djb).
November 4, 2021 Filing 2271 NOTICE of Appearance by DINA MARIE ZALEWSKI on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ZALEWSKI, DINA)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2270 MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1-A4 Cover - SEALED, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/22/2021) (djb).
November 3, 2021 Filing 2269 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2268 PRIVACY ACT ORDER NO. 43. Plaintiffs' #2184 Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibits A1 through A4 to Plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #2184 -2, UNDER SEAL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (djb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2267 ORDER granting #2183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (djb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2266 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate T. Walling.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6430395.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (WALLING, KATHERINE)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2265 Amended MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by EricaRae Garcia, by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GARCIA, ERICARAE) Modified on 11/3/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
November 3, 2021 Filing 2264 NOTICE of Appearance by TRIEL D CULVER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CULVER, TRIEL)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2263 ORDER - The #2233 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Zeiger is DENIED without prejudice for failure to provide a Certificate of Good Standing dated within 30 days of the motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (djb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2262 ORDER - The #2182 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate T. Walling is DENIED without prejudice for failure to provide a Certificate of Good Standing dated within 30 days of the motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (djb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2261 ORDER granting #2160 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2161 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2165 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2166 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2167 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2168 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2175 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2176 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2185 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2186 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2191 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2193 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2194 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2198 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2200 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2204 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2205 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2207 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2208 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2209 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2215 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2216 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2220 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2221 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2227 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2228 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2229 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2231 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2234 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2235 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2237 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2239 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2240 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2245 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2246 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2249 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (Appointed YATES M FRENCH,JAMIE A AYCOCK,REX WILLIAM MANNING,SHAYNE HUNTER HENRY,AUSTIN DEL PRIORE,NICKOLAS H BARBER,AUSTIN L KLAR,ANNA TERTERYAN,ELIZABETH CAROLYN DEGORI for 3M DEFENDANTS) (JENNIFER ANN MOORE,HEATH P STRAKA,CARASUSANA B WALL,MARK D SAMSON,MAXWELL HOLT GOINS,MARTIN J PHIPPS,MARTIN J PHIPPS,SHAWN G FOSTER,LEILA E MUSTAFA,LESLIE C MACLEAN,JONATHAN ERIC SCHULMAN,ANNA DEAN KAMINS,NEAL GRAHAM GALLOWAY,GRAHAM L NEWMAN,TODD C COMEAUX,DINA MARIE ZALEWSKI,JON RYAN KRAL,TRISHA MARIE GREEN,ERIC REED NOWAK,KENNETH JOSEPH WINK, JR,TRIEL D CULVER,EMILY BETH ASHE,RODRIGO DE LLANO,THOMAS W SHLOSMAN,BRANDEE FARIA,JOSEPH H MATTINGLY, III,STEVEN DEAN DAVIS,GINGER A GIBBS,JOEL ALAN NASH,DALE CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL,KIMBERLY CHANNICK for NOTICE ONLY) (djb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 ORDER - The #2242 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EricaRae Garcia is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case pending within the MDL in which counsel appears as attorney of record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (djb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2259 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-126) Certified - 3 actions re: MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:21-cv-02366, MN/0:21-cv-02368, MN/0:21-cv-02369) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-126 Finalized) (djb)
November 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2269 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records, re: #2270 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records (djb)
November 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2265 Amended MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, #2266 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate T. Walling. (djb)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2258 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6524131.), filed by Robert Pinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, PEYTON) Modified on 11/2/2021 to note Finance Department will be notified for a refund (djb).
November 2, 2021 Filing 2257 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Sampson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6523754.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SAMPSON, PAUL)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2256 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-125) (Certified) - 3 actions re: MDL No. 2885. (MN/0:21-cv-02344, MN/0:21-cv-02345, MN/0:21-cv-02347) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-125 Finalized) (djb)
November 2, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2257 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Sampson. (djb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2255 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER LEIGH NOLTE on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (NOLTE, JENNIFER)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2254 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by ADRIAN M RAMOS. (SCHROM, GERARD) Modified on 11/1/2021 (djb).
November 1, 2021 Filing 2253 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by Lloyd James Richardson. (SCHROM, GERARD)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2252 NOTICE of Appearance by TROY ALAN RAFFERTY on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (RAFFERTY, TROY)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2251 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John James Snidow.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6521169.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SNIDOW, JOHN)
November 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2249 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Channick. (djb)
November 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2251 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John James Snidow. (djb)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2250 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 30. Case Management Order No. 29 amended the parties sealing protocols. However, due to the impending deadlines in the upcoming bellwether Group C cases only, parties will be permitted to continue to file exhibits under seal pursuant to the process outlined in ECF No. #788 . Case Management Order 29 ECF No. #2236 , is hereby amended for Group C cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/29/2021. (djb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2249 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Channick.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6519605.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CHANNICK, KIMBERLY)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2248 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-124) CERTIFIED - 12 actions re: MDLNo. 2885. (MN/0:21-cv-02274, MN/0:21-cv-02288, MN/0:21-cv-02290, MN/0:21-cv-02304, MN/0:21-cv-02306, MN/0:21-cv-02309, MN/0:21-cv-02310, MN/0:21-cv-02311, MN/0:21-cv-02318, MN/0:21-cv-02320, MN/0:21-cv-02335, MN/0:21-cv-02337) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-124 Finalized) (djb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2247 ORDER granting #2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/28/2021. (kdm)
October 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2246 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dale Christopher Russell; #2245 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel A. Nash (djb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2246 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dale Christopher Russell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6514998.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Arizona) (RUSSELL, DALE) Modified on 10/28/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
October 27, 2021 Filing 2245 MOTION Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (NASH, JOEL)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2244 ORDER sua sponte reconsidering the Court's previous rulings regarding use of the Kevin Michael report in this litigation. The report is inadmissible and may not be used for any purpose with any witness in any future bellwether trials in this MDL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2021. (djb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2243 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT on behalf of, Lev Pobirsky, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6513119.), filed by NOTICE ONLY. (DILIBERTO, ASHLEY) Modified on 10/27/2021 (djb). Open an individual civil case. parties will be taken off the docket, finance department notified for a refund
October 27, 2021 Filing 2242 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EricaRae Garcia.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6513265.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GARCIA, ERICARAE) Modified on 10/27/2021 to correct filer(djb).
October 27, 2021 Filing 2241 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2021, before Judge Magistrate Gary Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 850-567-1374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2022. (ls)
October 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2242 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EricaRae Garcia. (djb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2240 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ginger A. Gibbs.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6511612.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (MA)) (GIBBS, GINGER)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2239 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven D. Davis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6511819.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DAVIS, STEVEN)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2238 ORDER granting #2041 Defendants' Motion to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon, #2045 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/26/2021. (djb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2237 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth C. DeGori.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6511577.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (DEGORI, ELIZABETH)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2235 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph H. Mattingly III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6510516.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MATTINGLY, JOSEPH)
October 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2235 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph H. Mattingly III; #2233 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Zeiger; #2234 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie MacLean. (djb)
October 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2237 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth C. DeGori; #2239 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven D. Davis. (djb)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2236 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 29. The Court hereby amends the parties' sealing protocols in ECF No. #788 to require that they first seek leave of Court prior to filing a motion, an exhibit, or any other filing under seal that does not specifically contain Privacy Act information. In the event any filing contains limited Privacy Act information, a redacted version of the document must be filed on the Court's public docket. This Order applies to documents filed on the main 3M MDL docket, 3:19md2885, as well as any document filed in any individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/25/2021. (djb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2234 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie MacLean.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6510371.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (MACLEAN, LESLIE)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2233 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Zeiger.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6510153.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (ZEIGER, JEFFREY)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2232 ORDER. This Order addresses Defendants' motion to exclude the hMIRE (human-microphone in real ear) opinions of Dr. David A. Eddins, as supplemented in his report dated July 6, 2021, under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharm., Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993). See ECF No. #2042 at 47-52. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/25/2021. (djb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2231 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandee J.K. Faria.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6509717.) by NOTICE ONLY. (FARIA, BRANDEE)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2230 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-123) Certified. 2 actions MN/0:21-cv-02231, MN/0:21-cv-02232. re: MDLNo. 2885. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-123 Finalized) (djb)
October 25, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2227 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rodrigo de Llano. (djb)
October 25, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2231 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandee J.K. Faria. (djb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2229 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neal G. Galloway.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6507760.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GALLOWAY, NEAL)
October 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2229 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neal G. Galloway. #2228 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas W. Shlosman. (djb)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2228 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas W. Shlosman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6505597.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SHLOSMAN, THOMAS)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2227 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rodrigo de Llano.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6505247.) by NOTICE ONLY. (DE LLANO, RODRIGO) #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Case List) (djb). Modified on 10/25/2021 (djb).
October 21, 2021 Filing 2226 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER GUS PAULOS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PAULOS, CHRISTOPHER)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2225 NOTICE of Appearance by SELENA A GIBSON on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (GIBSON, SELENA)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2224 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM HAMPTON JOHNSON, IV on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (JOHNSON, WILLIAM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2223 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2021 10:30 AM ET before MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below). Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 4251733# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 3696# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Adelita Tinaya-Miller Courtroom Deputy Clerk (atm)
October 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2221 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Terteryan. (djb)
October 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2222 Sealed Defendants' Response, re: #2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS . Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2222 Sealed DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (djb)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2221 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Terteryan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6499259.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (TERTERYAN, ANNA)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2220 MOTION Refiled Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily B. Ashe. by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ASHE, EMILY)
October 19, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2220 MOTION Refiled Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily B. Ashe. re: #2210 Order (djb)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2219 NOTICE of Appearance by DOMINIQUE J CARROLL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (CARROLL, DOMINIQUE)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2218 ORDER - This Order resolves certain of the parties' respective omnibus motions to exclude expert testimony and opinions, in whole or in part for the Trial Group C cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/18/2021. (djb)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2217 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-122) CERTIFIED - 8 actions re: MDLNo. 2885. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-122 Finalized) (djb)
October 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2216 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Triel D. Culver; #2215 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth J. Wink, Jr. (djb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2216 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Triel D. Culver.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6476797.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Ex: A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CULVER, TRIEL)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2215 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth J. Wink, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6476060.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (WINK, KENNETH)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2214 ORDER. The Motions for Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #2094 , #2096 , #2097 , #2098 , #2099 , #2100 , #2102 , #2103 , #2105 , #2110 , #2112 , #2114 , #2115 , #2119 , #2120 , #2121 , #2122 , #2123 , #2125 , #2127 , #2128 , #2129 , #2130 , #2131 , #2132 , #2133 , #2135 , #2136 , #2137 , #2138 , #2139 , #2140 , #2141 , #2142 , #2145 , #2146 , #2147 , #2152 , #2153 , #2154 , #2155 , #2156 , #2157 , #2158 , and #2159 are GRANTED. (Appointed ANNE MCCLAIN SIDRYS,HUNTER JACKSON NORTON,COLLEEN N CAVANAGH,SARA B ROITMAN,KASDIN MILLER MITCHELL,ERIN C JOHNSTON,MATTHEW PERRY STEINBERG,STACEY G PAGONIS,ALESCHIA D HYDE for 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC); (Appointed SHEILA M BOSSIER,KAREN LAWRENCE PUCCIO,PATRICK MASON DENNIS,BRIAN AUGUSTUS BECKCOM,JONATHAN MICHAEL ASHTON,MARTIN A RAMEY,PAUL MICHAEL SCOTT,KEVIN M FITZGERALD,THERESA ANNE LYNN,JOSEPH JOHN FANTINI,CLAIRE E BERG,ROBERT T NAUMES, JR,JULIE E LAMKIN,MATTHEW PALMER LAMBERT,KYLE CHRISTOPHER USNER,D MICHAEL NOONAN,JASON LEE NABORS,STEPHEN J RANDALL,RANDI A KASSAN,LAURA B DANIELSON,BRIAN DAVID SCHALL,MARK RYAN MURPHY,LEVI M PLESSET,DAVID L FRIEND,GREGORY DONALD BROWN,CHRISTOPHER AARON MOORE, II,GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON,TERENCE J SWEENEY,BRADLEY L LEGER,RODNEY K CASTILLE,JOHN ROBERT MAYER,STEVEN DANIEL COHN,FATIMA ABUZERR,MICHAEL T GALLAGHER for NOTICE ONLY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2021. (Joseph Tennant not added at this time, not registered for PHV admission.) (djb)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2213 ORDER. #2148 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis James Wood, is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case in which counsel appears as attorney of record. See ECF No. #86 , II. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2021. (djb)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2212 ORDER. The #2134 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashlee Edwards Winkler, is DENIED without prejudice for failure to provide the required Certificate of Good Standing dated within 30 days of filing the motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2021. (djb) Modified on 10/15/2021 (djb).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2211 ORDER. The #2151 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel A. Nash, is DENIED without prejudice for failure to provide the required Certificate of Good Standing. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2021. (djb) Modified on 10/15/2021 (djb).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2210 ORDER. The #2124 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily B. Ashe, is DENIED without prejudice for failure to identify any individual case in which counsel appears as attorney of record. See ECF No. #86 , II. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2021. (djb) Modified on 10/15/2021 (djb).
October 14, 2021 Filing 2209 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin L. Klar.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6462291.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (KLAR, AUSTIN)
October 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2208 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric R Nowak. (djb)
October 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2209 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin L. Klar. (djb)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2208 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric R Nowak.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6459638.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (NOWAK, ERIC)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2207 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nickolas Barber.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6456975.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BARBER, NICKOLAS)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2206 NOTICE of Change of Address by KIMBALL J JONES (JONES, KIMBALL)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2205 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin J. Del Priore.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6456347.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (DEL PRIORE, AUSTIN)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2204 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shayne H. Henry.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6456170.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (HENRY, SHAYNE)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2203 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (BOGLE, BRANDON)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2202 ORDER - The motion to exclude Johnson's expert opinions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion to exclude Bennett's expert opinions in their entirety are DENIED. re #1864 DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GROUP B PUTATIVE EXPERT OPINIONS UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 702 AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/13/2021. (djb)
October 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2207 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nickolas Barber, #2198 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon Ryan Kral, #2204 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shayne H. Henry, #2200 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trisha M. Green, #2205 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin J. Del Priore. (djb)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer #2050 is denied in part and granted in part, consistent with this Order. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/12/2021. (jff)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2200 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trisha M. Green.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6453597.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KRAL, JON)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2198 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon Ryan Kral.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6453143.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KRAL, JON)
October 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2194 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dina Zalewski; #2193 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd C. Comeaux. (djb)
October 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2195 Sealed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon, #2196 Sealed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants' Group C Expert Opinions and Testimony. (djb)
October 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2197 Sealed PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PRESERVE DAUBERT AND RULE 702 MOTIONS AND ARGUMENTS PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON, #2199 Sealed PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GROUP C PUTATIVE EXPERT OPINIONS UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 702 AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM. (djb)
October 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS . RE: #2192 Order referring motion Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 2194 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dina Zalewski.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6444685.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ZALEWSKI, DINA)
October 11, 2021 Filing 2193 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd C. Comeaux.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6444324.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Case List) (COMEAUX, TODD)
October 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2192 ORDER referring Plaintiffs' #2190 Expedited Motion to Authorize Remote Testimony Pursuant to Rule 43(a) From 3M Fact Witnesses Elliot Berger and Brian Myers for further proceedings, if necessary, and resolution to the pending motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2021. Motion referred to GARY R JONES. (jff)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2199 Sealed PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GROUP C PUTATIVE EXPERT OPINIONS UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 702 AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan F. Aylstock in Support, #2 Exhibit PX-1, #3 Exhibit PX-2, #4 Exhibit PX-3, #5 Exhibit PX-4, #6 Exhibit PX-5, #7 Exhibit PX-6, #8 Exhibit PX-7, #9 Exhibit PX-8, #10 Exhibit PX-9, #11 Exhibit PX-10, #12 Exhibit PX-11, #13 Exhibit PX-12, #14 Exhibit PX-13, #15 Exhibit PX-14, #16 Exhibit PX-15, #17 Exhibit PX-16, #18 Exhibit PX-17, #19 Exhibit PX-18, #20 Exhibit PX-19, #21 Exhibit PX-20, #22 Exhibit PX-21, #23 Exhibit PX-22, #24 Exhibit PX-23, #25 Exhibit PX-24, #26 Exhibit PX-25, #27 Exhibit PX-26, #28 Exhibit PX-27, #29 Exhibit PX-28, #30 Exhibit PX-29, #31 Exhibit PX-30, #32 Exhibit PX-31, #33 Exhibit PX-32, #34 Exhibit PX-33, #35 Exhibit PX-34, #36 Exhibit PX-35, #37 Exhibit PX-36, #38 Exhibit PX-37, #39 Exhibit PX-38, #40 Exhibit PX-39, #41 Exhibit PX-40, #42 Exhibit PX-41, #43 Exhibit PX-42, #44 Exhibit PX-43, #45 Exhibit PX-44, #46 Exhibit PX-45, #47 Exhibit PX-46, #48 Exhibit PX-47, #49 Exhibit PX-48) (djb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2197 Sealed PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PRESERVE DAUBERT AND RULE 702 MOTIONS AND ARGUMENTS PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON. (djb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2196 Sealed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Defendants' Group C Expert Opinions and Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66) (djb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2195 Sealed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve Daubert and Rule 702 Motions and Arguments Previously Ruled Upon. (djb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Graham L. Newman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6440839.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (NEWMAN, GRAHAM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS by CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2189 FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6439981.), filed by NOTICE ONLY. (CAMINATI, KATIE) Modified on 10/8/2021 (djb).
October 8, 2021 Filing 2188 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDITH A SUSSKIND on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SUSSKIND, JUDITH)
October 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Graham L. Newman. (djb)
October 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2190 MOTION PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE REMOTE TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 43(a) FROM 3M FACT WITNESSES ELLIOTT BERGER AND BRIAN MYERS (djb)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Re: Wilkerson, 7:20cv35. The trial of this case will begin Monday, March 14, 2022 and conclude by Friday, March 25, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial will be conducted before Judge Lisa Wood, at the United States District Court, 111 North Adams Street, Tallahassee, Florida. A pretrial conference will be held before Judge Rodgers in Pensacola on March 4, 2022, beginning at 8:30AM. The attorney's conference required by paragraph III must be held no later than February 4, 2022. The pretrial stipulation and other papers required by paragraphs IV and V must be filed no later than February 22, 2022. Motions in limine regarding evidentiary matters known to counsel, must be filed no later than February 7, 2022, with responsive memoranda due within 5 calendar days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2186 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna D. Kamins.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6434317.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAMINS, ANNA)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2185 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan E. Schulman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6434001.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SCHULMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 10/7/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE PARTY (djb).
October 7, 2021 Filing 2184 MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1-A4 Cover - SEALED, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/3/2021) (djb).
October 7, 2021 Filing 2183 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2182 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate T. Walling. (djb)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records, re: #2184 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records. (djb)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2186 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna D. Kamins; #2185 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan E. Schulman. (djb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2182 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate T. Walling.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6430395.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (WALLING, KATHERINE)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/6/2021. (djb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2176 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leila E. Mustafa.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6426105.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (MUSTAFA, LEILA)
October 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2175 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex W. Manning. (djb)
October 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2176 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leila E. Mustafa. (djb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2181 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Re: Vilsmeyer, 7:20cv113. The trial of this case will begin Monday, May 9, 2022 and conclude by Friday, May 20, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial will be conducted before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, at the United States District Court, 100 North Palafox Street, Courtroom 2, Pensacola, Florida. A pretrial conference will be held before Judge Rosenberg on April 27, 2022, beginning at 9:00AM. The attorney's conference required by paragraph III must be held no later than March 11, 2022. The pretrial stipulation and other papers required by paragraphs IV and V must be filed no later than April 11, 2022. Motions in limine regarding evidentiary matters known to counsel, must be filed no later than April 4, 2022, with responsive memoranda due within 5 calendar days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2180 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Re: Vaughn, 7:20cv134. The trial of this case will begin Monday, April 18, 2022 and conclude by Friday, April 29, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial will be conducted before Judge Steven D. Grimberg, at the United States District Court, 401 SE First Ave., Gainesville, Florida. A pretrial conference will be held before Judge Grimberg on April 12, 2022, beginning at 2:00PM. The attorney's conference required by paragraph III must be held no later than March 4, 2022. The pretrial stipulation and other papers required by paragraphs IV and V must be filed no later than March 25, 2022. Motions in limine regarding evidentiary matters known to counsel, must be filed no later than March 11, 2022, with responsive memoranda due within 5 calendar days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Re: McNeal, 7:20cv066. The trial of this case will begin Monday, March 14, 2022 and conclude by Friday, March 25, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial and all pretrial proceedings will be conducted before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., at the United States District Court, 100 North Palafox Street, Courtroom 2, Pensacola, Florida. A pretrial conference will be held before Judge Dalton in Pensacola on March 3, 2022, beginning at 9:00AM. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/22/2022. Attorney Conference to take place by 2/4/2022. Motions in limine regarding evidentiary matters known to counsel, must be filed no later than February 7, 2022, with responsive memoranda due within 5 calendar days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2178 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Re: Kelley, 7:20cv153. The trial of this case will begin Monday, March 28, 2022 and conclude by Friday, April 8, 2022, unless extended by the presiding judge. The trial will be conducted before Judge Thomas Barber, at the United States District Court, 100 North Palafox Street, Courtroom 2, Pensacola, Florida. A pretrial conference will be held before Judge Rodgers in Pensacola on March 16, 2022, beginning at 8:30AM. The attorney's conference required by paragraph III must be held no later than February 16, 2022. The pretrial stipulation and other papers required by paragraphs IV and V must be filed no later than March 9, 2022. Motions in limine regarding evidentiary matters known to counsel, must be filed no later than March 2, 2022, with responsive memoranda due within 5 calendar days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (djb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2175 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex W. Manning.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6424619.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (MANNING, REX)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2174 Filed in Error COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6422975.), filed by Bobby Ray Gunnoe, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FRANCIS, BRANDON) Modified on 10/5/2021 Finance Department will be notified (djb).
October 5, 2021 Filing 2173 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jamie Alan Aycock.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6421886.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (AYCOCK, JAMIE)
October 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2173 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jamie Alan Aycock. (djb)
October 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2170 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shawn G. Foster; #2167 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin J. Phipps; #2163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carasusana Wall; #2166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Samson; #2165 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yates M. French; #2168 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maxwell Goins. (djb)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2172 PRIVACY ACT ORDER NO. 42. The #2078 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibits A1 through A4 to Plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #2078 -2, UNDER SEAL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2021. (djb)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2171 ORDER - The #2077 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records is GRANTED, as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2021. (djb)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2170 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shawn G. Foster.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6418742.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing, #2 List of clients) (FOSTER, SHAWN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2169 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH DANIEL TALMADGE, JR on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (TALMADGE, JOSEPH)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2168 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maxwell Goins.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6416798.) by NOTICE ONLY. (GOINS, MAXWELL)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2167 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin J. Phipps.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6416506.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (PHIPPS, MARTIN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Samson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6416629.) by NOTICE ONLY. (SAMSON, MARK)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2165 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yates M. French.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6416212.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (FRENCH, YATES)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2164 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 27. Pursuant to the Order amending parties' sealing protocol, ECF No. #788 , the parties are advised that in 90 days the undersigned will direct the Clerk of Court to unseal all sealed motions, as well as any accompanying exhibits, responses, or related memorandum initially filed under seal where no motion has been filed requesting that the documents remain under seal. This Order includes documents filed on the main 3M MDL docket, 3:19md2885, as well as any document filed in any individual bellwether plaintiff's case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2021. (djb)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carasusana Wall.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6414604.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - OH) (WALL, CARASUSANA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2162 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDALL SETH CROMPTON on behalf of R. Seth Crompton (CROMPTON, RANDALL)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2161 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heath P. Straka.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6413106.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (STRAKA, HEATH)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2160 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Moore.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6413017.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MOORE, JENNIFER)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael T. Gallagher.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6408477.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2158 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fatima Abuzerr.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6408399.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ABUZERR, FATIMA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2157 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven D. Cohn.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6407786.) by NOTICE ONLY. (COHN, STEVEN)
October 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2158 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fatima Abuzerr; #2159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael T. Gallagher; #2160 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Moore; #2161 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heath P. Straka; #2157 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven D. Cohn. (djb)
October 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Mayer; #2155 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rodney Kent Castille; #2154 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley Landon Leger. (djb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Mayer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6403166.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (MAYER, JOHN)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2155 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rodney Kent Castille.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6402218.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CASTILLE, RODNEY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2154 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley Landon Leger.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6401560.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CASTILLE, RODNEY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2153 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terence Sweeney.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6401204.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SWEENEY, TERENCE) Modified on 10/1/2021 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY party (djb).
October 1, 2021 Filing 2152 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary A. Anderson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6398508.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B Registered Cases, #3 Exhibit C Registered Cases) (ANDERSON, GARY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2151 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel A. Nash.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6398409.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (NASH, JOEL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2150 NOTICE of Appearance by LEANNA B PITTARD on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (PITTARD, LEANNA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2149 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-119) Certified - 1 action (re: MDL No. 2885. MN/0:21-cv-02056) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-119 Finalized) (djb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2148 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis James Wood.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6398083.) by NOTICE ONLY. (WOOD, LEWIS) Modified on 10/1/2021 to correct filer as NOTICE ONLY party (djb).
October 1, 2021 Filing 2147 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Moore.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6397886.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MOORE, CHRISTOPHER)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2146 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory D. Brown.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6396539.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BROWN, GREGORY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2145 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David L. Friend.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6395275.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Plaintiffs List) (FRIEND, DAVID)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2144 NOTICE of Appearance by HOLLY RACHELLE WERKEMA on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (WERKEMA, HOLLY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2143 NOTICE of Appearance by DANAE N BENTON on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (BENTON, DANAE)
October 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2142 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Levi Plesset; #2141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aleschia D. Hyde. (djb)
October 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2153 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terence Sweeney. (djb)
October 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2148 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lewis James Wood; #2152 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary A. Anderson; #2146 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory D. Brown; #2147 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Moore; #2151 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel A. Nash. (djb)
October 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2145 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David L. Friend. (djb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2142 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Levi Plesset.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6391554.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (PLESSET, LEVI)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aleschia D. Hyde.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6389756.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (HYDE, ALESCHIA)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2140 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey G. Pagonis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6389312.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (PAGONIS, STACEY)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2139 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Steinberg.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6388898.) by 3M COMPANY. (STEINBERG, MATTHEW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2138 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin C. Johnston.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6389001.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (JOHNSTON, ERIN)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2137 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kasdin M. Mitchell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6388577.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (MITCHELL, KASDIN)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2136 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Murphy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6388756.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MURPHY, MARK)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Roitman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6388225.) by 3M COMPANY. (ROITMAN, SARA)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2134 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashlee Edwards Winkler.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6387404.) by NOTICE ONLY. (WINKLER, ASHLEE)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Schall.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6383619.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SCHALL, BRIAN)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura B. Danielson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6381958.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DANIELSON, LAURA)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2131 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randi Kassan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6381700.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KASSAN, RANDI)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Randall.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6381546.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (RANDALL, STEPHEN)
September 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Randall. (djb)
September 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2139 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Steinberg; #2137 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kasdin M. Mitchell; #2134 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashlee Edwards Winkler; #2138 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin C. Johnston; #2136 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Murphy; #2140 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey G. Pagonis; #2135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Roitman. (djb)
September 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura B. Danielson; #2131 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randi Kassan; #2133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Schall. (djb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2129 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason L. Nabors.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6379251.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (NABORS, JASON)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle C. Usner.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6378854.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (USNER, KYLE)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colleen Cavanagh.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6375754.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (CAVANAGH, COLLEEN)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2126 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY MATTHEW LAKIN on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (LAKIN, BRADLEY)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2125 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Palmer Lambert.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6375617.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LAMBERT, MATTHEW)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2124 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily B. Ashe, Esq..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6375102.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ASHE, EMILY)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2123 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Lamkin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6373278.) by NOTICE ONLY. (LAMKIN, JULIE)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2122 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert T. Naumes, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6372961.) by NOTICE ONLY. (NAUMES, ROBERT)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2121 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Claire E. Berg.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6373071.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BERG, CLAIRE)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph John Fantini.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6372162.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - PA, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - NJ) (FANTINI, JOSEPH)
September 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2119 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Michael Noonan; #2115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hunter Norton; #2114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theresa Lynn. (djb)
September 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2129 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason L. Nabors; #2128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle C. Usner; #2127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colleen Cavanagh. (djb)
September 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2122 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert T. Naumes, Jr; #2125 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Palmer Lambert; #2123 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Lamkin; #2121 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Claire E. Berg; #2124 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily B. Ashe, Esq; #2120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph John Fantini. (djb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2119 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Michael Noonan.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6369892.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (NOONAN, D)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2118 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL E ADHAM on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (ADHAM, BASIL)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2117 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-117) Certified. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of CTO-117 is LIFTED insofar as it relates to thisaction.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-117 Stay Lifted) (djb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2116 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-118) Certified. re: MDLNo. 2885. Inasmuch as no objection is pendingat this time, the stay is lifted.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-118 Finalized) (djb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hunter Norton.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6367768.) by 3M COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (NORTON, HUNTER)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theresa Lynn.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6366324.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (LYNN, THERESA) Modified on 9/29/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2113 ORDER granting #2007 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2010 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2011 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2015 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2023 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2025 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2026 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2028 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2029 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2030 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2031 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2033 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2035 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2037 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2037 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2038 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2039 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2040 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2043 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2044 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2046 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2047 Motion to appear pro hac viceto appear pro hac vice; granting #2048 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2052 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2053 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2054 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2055 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2057 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2060 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2062 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2063 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2065 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2068 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2069 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2070 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2071 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2072 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2073 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2074 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2075 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2076 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2079 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #2080 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed LEAH M MCMORRIS,TIMOTHY W PORTER,WILLIAM L WALSH,DAVID P MCCORMACK,STACY KATHRYN HAUER,DANIEL CHRISTOPHER BURKE,MICHAEL C SCHAFLE,BASIL E ADHAM,MARGARET M BRANCH,TERRY COCHRAN,STEVEN LEE LAUER,LAURA VECCHIO MCCASKILL,LEE PAUL MANKIN, IV,CARMELO DOMENICO MORABITO,ERIC W NEWELL,R RON POGGE,COURTNEY T WILSON,KIMBERLY WILSON WHITE,AMY C GUNN,JOSHUA MICHAEL AUTRY,SHANNON M PENNOCK,ASHLEY G BEENER,DOUGLAS D SMALL,JUDITH A SUSSKIND,JAMES L WARD, JR,SAMUEL M WENDT,RICHARD N LAMINACK,GREGORY DONALD BROWN,CARAGH FAY OWENS,KELLY E REARDON,RAUDEL ARMANDO CANCHE,GERARDO L GUERRA,JOHN E SUTHERS, LINDSEY N SCARCELLO for NOTICE ONLY)(Appointed Leslie Smith, Gavin R. Tisdale, Renee D. Smith, Judson Brown, David I. Horowitz, Mark W. Premo-Hopkins, Brian D. Sieve, Brenton A. Rogers, and Vanessa A. Barsanti for 3M DEFENDANTS). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/28/2021. (djb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2112 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Sidrys.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6367238.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, and Aearo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SIDRYS, ANNE) Modified on 9/29/2021 (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2111 FILED IN ERROR wrong case NOTICE of Designated Forum by NOTICE ONLY (COOK, JAMES) Modified on 9/28/2021 (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2110 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin M. Fitzgerald.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6366710.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (FITZGERALD, KEVIN) Modified on 9/29/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY(djb).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 ORDER - The #2027 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Murray B. Wells is DENIED without prejudice, for failure to provide the required Certificate of Good Standing. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/28/2021. (djb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2108 FILED IN ERROR wrong case AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NATHAN ARTERBERRY. (RIEDER, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/29/2021 (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2107 FILED IN ERROR wrong case NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - USDC, SOUTHERN DIST OF CALIFORNIA, SAN DIEGO DIVISION by NATHAN ARTERBERRY (RIEDER, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/29/2021 (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2106 FILED IN ERROR wrong case NOTICE OF TRANSITION by NATHAN ARTERBERRY (RIEDER, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/29/2021 (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2105 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Scott.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6364720.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" - Certificate of Good Standing) (SCOTT, PAUL)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2104 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS: when filing Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice do not add parties or the attorney to the docket. When prompted for the filer pick NOTICE ONLY party from the drop down. (djb) Modified on 9/30/2021 to direct this to counsel for plaintiffs only (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin A. Ramey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6363954.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (RAMEY, MARTIN) Modified on 9/28/2021 to correct filer (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan M. Ashton.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6363648.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Exhibit related cases) (ASHTON, JONATHAN) Modified on 9/28/2021 to correct filer (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2101 FILED IN ERROR Attorney Notified COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6363645.), filed by JASON FLAMMOND. (PARAFINCZUK, JUSTIN) Modified on 9/28/2021 (djb). Finance Department notified.
September 28, 2021 Filing 2100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Tennant.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6363570.) by NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Spreadsheet) (BECKCOM, BRIAN) Modified on 9/28/2021 to correct filer (djb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2099 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Beckcom.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6362489.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Spreadsheet) (BECKCOM, BRIAN) Modified on 9/28/2021 to correct filer(djb).
September 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2110 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin M. Fitzgerald; #2105 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Scott; #2112 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Sidrys. (djb)
September 28, 2021 FILED IN ERROR wrong case Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6365599), filed by NATHAN ARTERBERRY. (RIEDER, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/29/2021 (djb). Finance Department notified.
September 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2099 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Beckcom; #2102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan M. Ashton; #2098 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Patrick Doyle; #2097 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick M. Dennis; #2103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin A. Ramey; #2100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Tennant; #2096 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Lawrence Puccio. (djb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2098 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Patrick Doyle.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6361243.) by SPENCER SCOTT GALVAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DENNIS, PATRICK)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2097 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick M. Dennis.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6361198.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (DENNIS, PATRICK) Modified on 9/28/2021 to correct filer (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2096 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Lawrence Puccio.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6360932.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (PUCCIO, KAREN)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2095 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEILA M BOSSIER on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - List of Cases) (BOSSIER, SHEILA)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2094 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheila M. Bossier.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6359468.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit "B" - Case List) (BOSSIER, SHEILA)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2093 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MARIO M ROANHORSE. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2092 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by MARIO M ROANHORSE (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2091 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF TRANSITION TO 3M MDL DOCKET by MARIO M ROANHORSE (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2090 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by TRAVIS L JOHNSTON. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2089 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by TRAVIS L JOHNSTON (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2088 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF TRANSITION TO 3M MDL DOCKET by TRAVIS L JOHNSTON (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2087 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JERRY L GILLIAM. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2086 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by JERRY L GILLIAM (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 filer notified (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2085 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF TRANSITION TO 3M MDL DOCKET by JERRY L GILLIAM (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2084 FILED IN ERROR REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by DONN B COLTRIN. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2083 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by DONN B COLTRIN (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2082 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE OF TRANSITION TO 3M MDL DOCKET by DONN B COLTRIN (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 Filing 2081 RESPONSE to Motion re #2050 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2080 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John E. Suthers.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6355143.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (SUTHERS, JOHN)
September 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2080 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John E. Suthers. (djb)
September 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2081 Response to Motion, #2050 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer and Request for Expedited Consideration (djb)
September 27, 2021 FILED IN ERROR - Finance Department Notified Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6358238), filed by DONN B COLTRIN. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 FILED IN ERROR - Finance Department Notified Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6358722), filed by TRAVIS L JOHNSTON. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2094 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheila M. Bossier. (djb)
September 27, 2021 FILED IN ERROR - Finance Department Notified Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6358521), filed by JERRY L GILLIAM. (DIAMOND, DAVID) Modified on 9/27/2021 (djb).
September 24, 2021 Filing 2079 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vanessa A. Barsanti.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6353600.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BARSANTI, VANESSA)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2078 MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1-A4 Cover - SEALED, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/5/2021) (djb).
September 24, 2021 Filing 2077 MOTION to Seal Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2076 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brenton A. Rogers.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6353313.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (ROGERS, BRENTON)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2075 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Sieve.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6353110.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (SIEVE, BRIAN)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2074 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Premo-Hopkins.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6352544.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (PREMO-HOPKINS, MARK)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2073 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerardo L. Guerra.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6352743.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (GUERRA, GERARDO)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2072 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David I. Horowitz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6352337.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (HOROWITZ, DAVID)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2071 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randy A. Canche.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6352098.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (CANCHE, RAUDEL)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2070 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Judson Brown.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6352021.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (BROWN, JUDSON)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2069 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Renee D. Smith.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6351667.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (SMITH, RENEE)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2068 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly E. Reardon.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number BFLNDC-6350405.) by NOTICE ONLY. (REARDON, KELLY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2067 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R MENCEL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MENCEL, JONATHAN)
September 24, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2065 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gavin R. Tisdale. (djb)
September 24, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2068 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly E. Reardon. (djb)
September 24, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2077 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to their Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records, re: #2078 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Authorize Disclosure of Military Records (djb)
September 24, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2075 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Sieve; #2071 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randy A. Canche; #2079 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vanessa A. Barsanti; #2069 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Renee D. Smith; #2073 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerardo L. Guerra; #2070 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Judson Brown; #2072 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David I. Horowitz; #2076 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brenton A. Rogers; #2074 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Premo-Hopkins. (djb)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2066 Filed in error - wrong case COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6348185.), filed by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designated Forum Form) (STEVENS, LINDSAY) Modified on 9/24/2021 PDF's removed Attorney notified (djb). Modified on 9/24/2021 (djb).
September 23, 2021 Filing 2065 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gavin R. Tisdale.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6348143.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing) (TISDALE, GAVIN)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2064 Filed in Error - wrong case FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Jack Dixon. (PANTAZIS, EVAN) Modified on 9/23/2021 Attorney Notified (djb).
September 23, 2021 Filing 2063 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caragh Fay Owens.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6347069.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (OWENS, CARAGH) Modified on 9/23/2021 (djb).
September 23, 2021 Filing 2062 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory D. Brown.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6346796.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Actions, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing) (BROWN, GREGORY)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2061 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R MENCEL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MENCEL, JONATHAN)
September 23, 2021 Filed in wrong case Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6348012), filed by Jack Dixon. (PANTAZIS, EVAN) Modified on 9/23/2021 (Finance Department and Attorney Notified)
September 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2063 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caragh Fay Owens; #2062 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory D. Brown. (djb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2060 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard N. Laminack.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6340866.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LAMINACK, RICHARD)
September 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2055 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James L. Ward, Jr; #2057 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel M. Wendt. (djb)
September 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2060 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard N. Laminack. (djb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2059 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY R STEVENS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (STEVENS, LINDSAY)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2058 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY R STEVENS on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (STEVENS, LINDSAY)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2057 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel M. Wendt.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6338392.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (WENDT, SAMUEL)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2056 ORDER re #2050 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer and Request for Expedited Consideration. The Court will require an expedited response from Plaintiffs. The response is due by September 27, 2021 at 12PM CT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/21/2021. (djb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2055 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James L. Ward, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6336077.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (WARD, JAMES)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2054 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Judith Susskind.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6335800.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SUSSKIND, JUDITH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2053 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas D. Small.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6335179.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Certificate of Good Standing re Douglas D. Small) (SMALL, DOUGLAS)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2052 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley G. Beener.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6335099.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (BEENER, ASHLEY)
September 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2032 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carmelo D. Morabito; #2052 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley G. Beener; #2053 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas D. Small; #2043 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Josh Autry; #2037 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Courtney T. Wilson, #2047 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Courtney T. Wilson; #2044 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey N. Scarcello; #2033 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric W. Newell; #2038 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Wilson White; #2035 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Ronald Pogge, #2046 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice by R. Ronald Pogge; #2048 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon M. Pennock; #2040 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Smith; #2039 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Collignon Gunn. (djb)
September 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2049 Notice of Filing of Verification of Compliance with Pretrial Order No. 83 and Destruction of Juror Questionnaires; #2050 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer and Request for Expedited Consideration. (djb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2050 MOTION to Extend Time to Complete the Depositions of Mr. Hamery and Mr. Dancer and Request for Expedited Consideration by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (BROCK, ROBERT)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2049 NOTICE of Filing of Verification of Compliance with Pretrial Order No. 83 and Destruction of Juror Questionnaires by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (KARIS, HARIKLIA)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2048 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon M. Pennock.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6334900.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Case List) (PENNOCK, SHANNON)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2047 AMENDED MOTION to appear pro hac vice re: #2037 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NOTICE ONLY. (WILSON, COURTNEY) Modified on 9/21/2021 (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2046 AMENDED MOTION to appear pro hac vice by R. Ronald Pogge, on behalf of NOTICE ONLY. (POGGE, R) Modified on 9/21/2021 (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2044 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey N. Scarcello.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6333412.) by NOTICE ONLY. (SCARECELLO, LINSEY) Modified on 9/21/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2043 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Josh Autry.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6333409.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Kentucky Bar Association) (AUTRY, JOSHUA)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2040 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Smith.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6332342.) by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SMITH, LESLIE)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2039 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Collignon Gunn.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6331162.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (GUNN, AMY)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2038 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Wilson White.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6331155.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (WHITE, KIMBERLY)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2037 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Courtney T. Wilson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6330952.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (WILSON, COURTNEY) Modified on 9/21/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2036 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R MENCEL on behalf of NOTICE ONLY (MENCEL, JONATHAN)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2035 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Ronald Pogge.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6330608.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (POGGE, R) Modified on 9/20/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2034 Filed in error - filed in wrong caseREFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, filed by CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (POGGE, R) Modified on 9/20/2021 (djb).
September 20, 2021 Filing 2033 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric W. Newell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6330094.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit) (NEWELL, ERIC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2051 SEALED PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan F. Aylstock in Support, #2 Exhibit PX-1, #3 Exhibit PX-2, #4 Exhibit PX-3, #5 Exhibit PX-4, #6 Exhibit PX-5, #7 Exhibit PX-6, #8 Exhibit PX-7, #9 Exhibit PX-8, #10 Exhibit PX-9, #11 Exhibit PX-10, #12 Exhibit PX-11, #13 Exhibit PX-12, #14 Exhibit PX-13, #15 Exhibit PX-14, #16 Exhibit PX-15, #17 Exhibit PX-16, #18 Exhibit PX-17, #19 Exhibit PX-18, #20 Exhibit PX-19, #21 Exhibit PX-20, #22 Exhibit PX-21, #23 Exhibit PX-22, #24 Exhibit PX-23, #25 Exhibit PX-24, #26 Exhibit PX-25, #27 Exhibit PX-26, #28 Exhibit PX-27, #29 Exhibit PX-28, #30 Exhibit PX-29, #31 Exhibit PX-30, #32 Exhibit PX-31, #33 Exhibit PX-32, #34 Exhibit PX-33, #35 Exhibit PX-34, #36 Exhibit PX-35, #37 Exhibit PX-36, #38 Exhibit PX-37, #39 Exhibit PX-38, #40 Exhibit PX-39, #41 Exhibit PX-40, #42 Exhibit PX-41, #43 Exhibit PX-42, #44 Exhibit PX-43, #45 Exhibit PX-44, #46 Exhibit PX-45, #47 Exhibit PX-46, #48 Exhibit PX-47, #49 Exhibit PX-48, #50 Exhibit PX-49, #51 Exhibit PX-50, #52 Exhibit PX-51, #53 Exhibit PX-52, #54 Exhibit PX-53, #55 Exhibit PX-54, #56 Exhibit PX-55) (djb) Modified on 9/21/2021 (djb).
September 17, 2021 Filing 2045 SEALED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRESERVE DAUBERT AND RULE 702 MOTIONS AND ARGUMENTS PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. (djb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2042 SEALED DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' GROUP C PUTATIVE EXPERT OPINIONS UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 702 AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 (Part 1), #18 Exhibit 17 (Part 2), #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64) (djb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2041 SEALED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PRESERVE DAUBERT AND RULE 702 MOTIONS AND ARGUMENTS PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (djb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2032 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carmelo D. Morabito.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6327375.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Related Cases, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (MORABITO, CARMELO)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2031 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Paul Mankin.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6326343.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MANKIN, LEE)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2030 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LAURA VECCHIO MCCASKILL.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6325737.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MCCASKILL, LAURA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2029 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Lee Lauer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6325743.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (LAUER, STEVEN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2028 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terry L. Cochran.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6325507.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (COCHRAN, TERRY) Modified on 9/17/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY (djb).
September 17, 2021 Filing 2027 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Murray B. Wells.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6325484.) by NOTICE ONLY. (WELLS, MURRAY)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2026 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret M. Branch.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6325208.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs List) (BRANCH, MARGARET) Modified on 9/17/2021 to correct filer to NOTICE ONLY(djb).
September 17, 2021 Filing 2025 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Basil E. Adham.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6324736.) by NOTICE ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ADHAM, BASIL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2024 FILED IN ERROR wrong case NOTICE OF TRANSITION of David Waack by LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (COON, BRENT) Modified on 9/28/2021 (djb).