BROADCAST MUSIC INC et al v. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC et al
Plaintiff: WELSH WITCH MUSIC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, CROMPTON SONGS, GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., HINDER MUSIC CO., BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, FALL OUT BOY INC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, HINDER MUSIC CO, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC and FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC
Defendant: J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC and THE FRISKY DOLPHIN
Case Number: 3:2020cv02742
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/11/2020. (alb)
March 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC. (HAUSFELD, M.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, FALL OUT BOY INC, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC; Corporate Parent VIVENDI SA for RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC; Corporate Parent Bertelsmann, Inc. for BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC; Corporate Parent TENGA, Inc. for BROADCAST MUSIC INC.. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. MICHAEL HALL served on 2/22/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, CARNIVAL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC, FALL OUT BOY INC, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, HINDER MUSIC CO, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (MESSA, ZACHARY)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC. (alb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Proposed Summonses by BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, HINDER MUSIC CO., NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, SONY ATV SONGS LLC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., TOKECO TUNES, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, WELSH WITCH MUSIC re 3 Docket Annotation, #1 Complaint,,, (MESSA, ZACHARY)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 Copyright New Case Notification. Copy sent to the Register of Copyrights. (alb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (alb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (alb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL HALL, J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC, KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4844796.), filed by GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS, FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC., BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP, FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS, EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC., BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC, CROMPTON SONGS, SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC., HINDER MUSIC CO., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC, BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION, WELSH WITCH MUSIC, TOKECO TUNES, SONY ATV SONGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (MESSA, ZACHARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC INC et al v. J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELSH WITCH MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC d/b/a MUSIC OF EVERPOP
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALL OUT BOY INC. d/b/a CHICAGO X SOFTCORE SONGS
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV SACUFF ROSE MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOY MEETS GIRL MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOKECO TUNES
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARNIVAL MUSIC d/b/a TILTAWHIRL MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROUND HILL MUSIC LP d/b/a ROUND HILL WORKS
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROMPTON SONGS
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIBB BROTHERS MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC d/b/a SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRINGTIME MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HINDER MUSIC CO.
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD MUSIC CORPORATION
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALL OUT BOY INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRINGTIME MUSIC INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROUND HILL MUSIC LP
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HINDER MUSIC CO
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG RIGHTS MANAGEMENT US LLC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARNIVAL MUSIC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOURTEENTH HOUR MUSIC INC
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID MESSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HALL
Represented By: M. KEVIN HAUSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&K DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: M. KEVIN HAUSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMC DOLPHIN ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: M. KEVIN HAUSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FRISKY DOLPHIN
Represented By: M. KEVIN HAUSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?