BARGE v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: BARGE
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Petitioner: MELISSA M BARGE
Respondent: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA
Case Number: 3:2020cv04945
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be recommended for dismissal for failure to prosecute or follow an order of the Court. The Court will discharge this show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's March 25 Order within the fourteen (14) days provided. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 5/6/2020. (Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2020). (mb)
April 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (Amended Complaint not received. No IFP Motion or filing fee received either). (mb)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a civil complaint form for pro se litigants and a complete set of forms needed for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, she shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, file an amended complaint. Also, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, she shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, either file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee. (Amended Complaint and IFP Motion or Filing fee due by 4/27/2020). (Forms mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/25/2020. (mb)
March 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition For Writ of Prohibition, filed by MELISSA M BARGE. (No service copies/fee not paid/no IFP Motion). (mb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, MELISSA M BARGE. (mb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION For Writ of Prohibition, filed by MELISSA M BARGE. (No service copies/fee not paid/no IFP Motion). (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARGE v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MELISSA M BARGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?