ESTELLE v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT CHARLES ESTELLE
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2020cv05255
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 51 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel Larry Thomas Hill - Jeanette Bazis and Edmond Ahadome were taken off the docket after the transfer because they were not admitted. Re #50 Notice of Withdrawal filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #49 Notice of Withdrawal filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (djb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (STERN, MITCHELL)
April 2, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by PAIGE SHARPE on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (SHARPE, PAIGE)
April 2, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (EISENSTEIN, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by ANAND AGNESHWAR on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (AGNESHWAR, ANAND)
April 2, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF TRANSFER IN FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT as to pro se plaintiff, Robert Charles Estelle. re: #37 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
April 1, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES)
April 1, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/1/20. (bkp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT CHARLES ESTELLE. (djb)
March 31, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #40 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, re: #37 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Referred to GARY R JONES. (djb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #37 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Mailed to Attorney, Jeanette M Bazis, counsel for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (djb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #37 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Mailed to Attorney, Edmond K Ahadome counsel for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (djb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00354. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
March 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #37 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Notice of Removal (djb)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #8 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/23/2020. (TJB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 34 Cover Letter to Clerk's office re: Affidavit of Service Doc nos: #31 , #32 , #33 from Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Modified text on 3/16/2020 (KNK). Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 30 Cover Letter to Clerk's Office re: #28 and #29 Affidavit of Service documents from Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle (KNK) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle (KNK) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #26 Answer to Complaint (Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 25 Cover Letter to Clerk's Office from Robert Charles Estelle Re: #24 Plaintiffs' Reply. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 24 PLAINTIFFS' REPLY re: #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert Charles Estelle.(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 23 Cover Letter from Robert Charles Estelle re: #18 , #19 , #20 Affidavit of Service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 Cover Letter re: #15 , #16 , #17 Affidavit of Service for Motion to Remand filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 Cover Letter re: #12 , #13 , #14 Affidavit of Service re: Motion to Vacate. filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition on Otsuka America Pharmaceutical Inc. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition on Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition on Greene Espel, PllP. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court Otsuka America Pharmaceutical Inc. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court on Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Charles Estelle re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court on Greene Espel, PLLP. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: Motion to Vacate on Green Espel, PLLP by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: Motion to Vacate on Otsuka America Pharmaceutical Inc. by Robert Charles Estelle (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: Motion to Vacate on Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Qc'd on 2/27/2020 (KNK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT X re #8 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Robert Charles Estelle filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (KNK) Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Schultz. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/10/2020. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBIT VI re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert Estelle.(kt) Document QC'd on 2/12/2020 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBITS I-XIII re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit II, #2 Exhibit III, #3 Exhibit IV, #4 Exhibit V, #5 Exhibit VII, #6 Exhibit VIII, #7 Exhibit IX, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit XI, #10 Exhibit XII, #11 Exhibit XIII)(kt) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (kt). Document QC'd on 2/12/2020 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert Charles Estelle. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 2/12/2020 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-354 (WMW/DTS). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, Second Judicial District, State of Minnesota, case number 62-CV-20-103 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7432521) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Transfer Order, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ahadome, Edmond) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]
January 27, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTELLE v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: PAIGE SHARPE
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Represented By: MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Represented By: ANAND AGNESHWAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CHARLES ESTELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?