DESTIN WATER USERS INC v. LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO et al
Plaintiff: DESTIN WATER USERS INC
Defendant: AT&T CORPORATION and LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05392
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T CORPORATION, LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO., filed by DESTIN WATER USERS INC. (ZAMORA, DARIAN)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The parties' Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Counts II and IV, ECF No. #17 , construed as a motion for leave to amend, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has fourteen days to file an Amended Complaint consistent with the Stipulation, and Defendants have fourteen days thereafter to respond. The pending Amended Motion to Dismiss Counts II and IV, ECF No. #12 , is MOOT. ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/2/2020. (alb)
June 2, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #18 Order. Answer to Amended Complaint is due by 6/30/2020. (alb)
June 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 Stipulation of Dismissal AS TO COUNTS II AND IV. (alb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal AS TO COUNTS II AND IV by DESTIN WATER USERS INC. (GORDON, ALFRED)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Upon entry of the Final Scheduling Order and Mediation Referral on May 20, 2020, ECF No. #15 , the stay of discovery was LIFTED. The dates and deadlines set forth in the Final Scheduling Order and Mediation Referral are unaffected. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/28/2020. (alb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline is extended to 12/29/2020.The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubertmotions is 1/19/2021. Mediation must be completed by 1/26/2021. Mediation Report due by 2/9/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/20/2020. (alb)
May 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and IV (No response filed.) (alb)
May 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TALBERT, JAMES)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation for substitution of counsel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/07/2020. (alb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and IV by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/15/2020). (TALBERT, JAMES)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and IV by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/15/2020). (TALBERT, JAMES)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by AT&T CORPORATION. (TALBERT, JAMES)
April 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. (alb)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED as requested. ( Answer due by 5/3/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/22/2020. (alb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DESTIN WATER USERS INC. (ZAMORA, DARIAN)
April 22, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (alb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AT&T CORPORATION. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AT&T CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent AT&T INC for AT&T CORPORATION.. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. identifying Corporate Parent LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. for LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO... (TALBERT, JAMES)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MODIFIED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/29 /2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2020. Discovery due by 10/15/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2020. (alb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. re #1 Notice of Removal, (TALBERT, JAMES)
April 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TALBERT, JAMES)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO. from OKALOOSA COUNTY, case number 2020CA000794. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5078846.), filed by LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TALBERT, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESTIN WATER USERS INC v. LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESTIN WATER USERS INC
Represented By: DARIAN LOUISE ZAMORA
Represented By: ALFRED BENJAMIN GORDON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW TALBERT
Represented By: BRENDA ELAINE CARPENTER
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION CO.
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW TALBERT
Represented By: BRENDA ELAINE CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?