SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA v. SERVISFIRST BANK INC. et al
Plaintiff: SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA
Defendant: 1-100 DOES, SERVISFIRST BANK INC., SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION, TRUIST BANK and SYNOVUS BANK
Case Number: 3:2020cv05425
Filed: April 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Texts, #2 Exhibit B - Texts, #3 Exhibit C - Adams deposition, #4 Exhibit D - SBA notice, #5 Exhibit E - Form 159, #6 Exhibit F - Forgiveness application, #7 Exhibit G - Forgiveness instructions) (CASH, WILLIAM)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING HEARING. The Court will conduct a hearing on Defendant's motion on Thursday, July 9, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. (CDT) in Courtroom 3 of the United States District Courthouse, 1 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida, 32502, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant, The First, A National Banking Association's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #53 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant The First, A National Banking Association shall have until July 9, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/9/2020).) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/24/2020. (mb)
June 24, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #53 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (mb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION. (RILEY, CHRISTOPHER)
June 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #52 First MOTION for Protective Order To Terminate Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
June 22, 2020 Filing 52 First MOTION for Protective Order To Terminate Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by SYNOVUS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Adams Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2020-06-15 Bates to Cash email, #3 Exhibit 2020-05-29 Cash email, #4 Exhibit 2020-05-29 Discovery Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 2020-06-02 Nathanson to Cash email, #6 Exhibit Butler Cash email exchange) (PRATHER, RAMSEY)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - That the motion is GRANTED #50 , and attorney Kathryn M. Barber is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Truist Bank. (Appointed KATHRYN MARGARET BARBER for TRUIST BANK). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/18/2020. (mb)
June 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5358666.) (mb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5358666.) by TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (BARBER, KATHRYN)
June 17, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/1/2020). (MATTHEWS, LOGAN)
June 16, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent The First Bancshares, Inc. for THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION.. (RILEY, CHRISTOPHER)
June 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER ALLEN RILEY on behalf of THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (RILEY, CHRISTOPHER)
June 10, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by SYNOVUS BANK. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/24/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (NATHANSON, PAUL)
June 10, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP A BATES on behalf of SYNOVUS BANK (BATES, PHILIP)
June 9, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA. THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (CASH, WILLIAM)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant Truist Bank's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #37 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant Truist Bank shall have until July 3, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to Complaint not filed earlier: 7/3/2020).) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/8/2020. (mb)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE MOTIONS - That the #35 , #38 , #39 , #40 , #41 motions are GRANTED, and Attorney Antonio M. Haynes is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Synovus Bank. Attorneys Cheryl L. Haas and Meredith Laughlin Allen are authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Truist Bank. Attorneys Sara A. Ford and R. Ashby Pate are authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant ServisFirst Bank. (Attorney ANTONIO M HAYNES for SYNOVUS BANK added). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/8/2020. (mb)
June 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Ashby Pate.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5312685.), #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara A. Ford.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5312641.) (mb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Ashby Pate.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5312685.) by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (PATE, ROBERT)
June 5, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara A. Ford.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5312641.) by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (FORD, SARA)
June 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Laughlin Allen, #37 MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint, #38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl L. Haas. (sdw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Laughlin Allen.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5309652.) by TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (HAAS, CHERYL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl L. Haas.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5309304.) by TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (HAAS, CHERYL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by TRUIST BANK. (ROTTMANN, EMILY)
June 5, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY Y ROTTMANN on behalf of TRUIST BANK (ROTTMANN, EMILY)
June 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Haynes. (sdw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Haynes.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5307941.) by SYNOVUS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (HAYNES, ANTONIO)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant ServisFirst Bank's corrected unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #30 ), is granted, and Defendant ServisFirst Bank shall have until June 17, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/17/2020).) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 6/2/2020. (mb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (MATTHEWS, LOGAN)
June 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E BUTLER, JR on behalf of SYNOVUS BANK (BUTLER, JAMES)
June 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by RAMSEY PRATHER on behalf of SYNOVUS BANK (PRATHER, RAMSEY)
June 2, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #30 MOTION to Extend Time (Corrected) (Unopposed) for An Extension of time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (mb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend Time (Corrected) (Unopposed) for An Extension of time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (MATTHEWS, LOGAN)
June 1, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SYNOVUS BANK identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Financial Corp. for SYNOVUS BANK.. (NATHANSON, PAUL)
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J NATHANSON on behalf of SYNOVUS BANK (NATHANSON, PAUL)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by SERVISFIRST BANK INC.. (MATTHEWS, LOGAN) Modified on 6/2/2020 to term MOTION due to amended correction (mb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRUIST BANK identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for TRUIST BANK.. (ROTTMANN, EMILY)
May 29, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to TRUIST BANK. (Attachments: #1 THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION). (mb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONS by SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA. (CASH, WILLIAM)
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONS by SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA. (CASH, WILLIAM)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - That Defendant Synovus Trust Company's motion to dismiss (Doc. #14 ) is DENIED as moot, and Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order (for Defendants who have been served) or within the time prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a) (for Defendants who have yet to be served). (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/11/2020).) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 5/28/2020. (mb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against SERVISFIRST BANK INC., SYNOVUS BANK, THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION, TRUIST BANK, filed by SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA. (CASH, WILLIAM)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - That the #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Attorney James E. Butler, Jr., is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Synovus Trust Co., N.A. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 5/21/2020. (mb)
May 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #18 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Butler, Jr..( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5240461.) (mb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ramsey B. Prather is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Synovus Trust Co., N.A. (Appointed RAMSEY PRATHER for SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 5/20/2020. (mb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Butler, Jr..( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5240461.) by SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (BUTLER, JAMES)
May 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #17 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ramsey B. Prather.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5235186.) (mb)
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ramsey B. Prather.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5235186.) by SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (PRATHER, RAMSEY)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/1/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/14/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 5/18/2020. (mb)
May 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #15 Notice of Appearance (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP A BATES on behalf of SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (BATES, PHILIP)
May 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/1/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Robert C. Brand, Jr., #2 Exhibit B- 5/1/2020 Email from Paul J. Nathanson to John Wirt) (NATHANSON, PAUL)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Financial Corp. for SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.. (NATHANSON, PAUL)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Nathanson. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 05/15/2020. (sdw)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Nathanson.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5213306.) by SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (NATHANSON, PAUL)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA COCALAS WIRT on behalf of SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA (WIRT, PAMELA)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA M BUCHANAN on behalf of SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA (BUCHANAN, VIRGINIA)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW DAVID SCHULTZ on behalf of SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III on behalf of SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA (CASH, WILLIAM)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SERVISFIRST BANK INC, (Attachments: #1 SYNOVUS TRUST) (mb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
April 26, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES by Sport & Wheat CPA PA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request to Clerk to Issue Summons) (WIRT, JOHN)
April 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Sport & Wheat CPA PA. (WIRT, JOHN)
April 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WIRT, JOHN)
April 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED EMERGENCY CLASS ACTION FOR INTER ALIA DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against 1-100 DOES, SERVISFIRST BANK INC., Synovus Trust Company, National Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5132174.), filed by Sport & Wheat CPA PA. (WIRT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA v. SERVISFIRST BANK INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-100 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVISFIRST BANK INC.
Represented By: ROBERT ASHBY PATE
Represented By: SARA FORD
Represented By: LOGAN T MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNOVUS TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RAMSEY PRATHER
Represented By: PAUL J NATHANSON
Represented By: JAMES E BUTLER, JR
Represented By: PHILIP A BATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FIRST, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ALLEN RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: KATHRYN MARGARET BARBER
Represented By: EMILY Y ROTTMANN
Represented By: MEREDITH LAUGHLIN ALLEN
Represented By: CHERYL HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNOVUS BANK
Represented By: ANTONIO M HAYNES
Represented By: RAMSEY PRATHER
Represented By: PAUL J NATHANSON
Represented By: JAMES E BUTLER, JR
Represented By: PHILIP A BATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPORT & WHEAT CPA PA
Represented By: JOHN SIDNEY WIRT
Represented By: PAMELA COCALAS WIRT
Represented By: VIRGINIA M BUCHANAN
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID SCHULTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?