TWEEDY v. WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC
Plaintiff: Martin W Tweedy
Defendant: Wet-N-Wild Water Sports LLC and WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05464
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/18/2020. (mb)
June 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: Set Deadlines re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2020) (Responses not filed). (mb)
May 27, 2020 Set Deadlines re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2020). (mb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC. (BAYER, NEIL)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/5/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/6/2020. Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/22/2020. (mb)
May 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wet-N-Wild Water Sports LLC from First Judicial Circuit of Florida, Okaloosa County, case number 2020-CA-001148 F. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5230773.), filed by Wet-N-Wild Water Sports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Summons) (JANSSON, CHASE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TWEEDY v. WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wet-N-Wild Water Sports LLC
Represented By: CHASE ALEXANDRA JANSSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WET N WILD WATER SPORTS LLC
Represented By: CHASE ALEXANDRA JANSSON
Represented By: NEIL EVAN BAYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin W Tweedy
Represented By: ISAAC TAYLOR NEWLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?