MORGAN et al v. WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Morgan and Jerry Morgan
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc., WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC, MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC and WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05519
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF STAY granting #18 Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer and Centralization Motion by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/31/2020. (sdw)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer and Centralization Motion by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by JERRY MORGAN, PATRICIA MORGAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compiled Exhibits for Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay) (SWANICK, DAVID)
July 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transfer and Centralization Motion by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (alb)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin M. Bosman. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/27/2020. (sdw)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Y. Park. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/27/2020. (sdw)
July 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin M. Bosman, #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Y. Park. (sdw)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin M. Bosman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5530846.) by MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (BOSMAN, ERIN)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Y. Park.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5530758.) by MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (PARK, JULIE)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/14/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/13/2020. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/30/2020. (sdw)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or File Defensive Motions filed by WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (Answer due by 8/10/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/30/2020. (sdw)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JERRY MORGAN, PATRICIA MORGAN. WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (SWANICK, DAVID)
June 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or File Defensive Motions. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or File Defensive Motions by MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS on behalf of MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JERRY MORGAN, PATRICIA MORGAN. MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (SWANICK, DAVID)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JERRY MORGAN, PATRICIA MORGAN. WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (SWANICK, DAVID)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. (Attachments: #1 WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC, #2 MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC) (sdw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5307230.), filed by Jerry Morgan, Patricia Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc., #3 Exhibit Summons as to Wright Medical Group, Inc., #4 Exhibit Summons as to Microport Orthopedics, Inc.) (SWANICK, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN et al v. WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC
Represented By: JULIE Y PARK
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: ERIN M BOSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROPORT ORTHOPEDICS INC
Represented By: JULIE Y PARK
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: ERIN M BOSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC
Represented By: JULIE Y PARK
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: ERIN M BOSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Morgan
Represented By: DAVID R SWANICK
Represented By: DAVID R SWANICK, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Morgan
Represented By: DAVID R SWANICK
Represented By: DAVID R SWANICK, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?