ADENIRAN et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: COLIN MARTIN, SHELLY MEECE, DUANE MARTIN, BERNARD ADENIRAN, NERISSA HARRIS, NOVA HALE, JOHNNY SAINZ, EVERARDA AISPURO, LUKE KARASIUK, LISA BRASSY, KEVIN BIRTON, TOMMY THOMAS, JODY M ORSO, SCOTT WEAVER, DAWN FINS ACERRO, LISA MCNAIR, SHERRION KEMP, MICHAEL BROWN, MAURICE HANSON, ANDREA PRAGER, GRACIE V BERRY, THEO J GOMEZ, RODNEY D CULLORS, KAREN M WITHERBY, LEOTIST TRAMBLE, VIANIA CAMPBELL, TESHAWN GAITHER, ALMA ALFORD, ROBERT M BROCKLEY, FRANK THOMAS, LYNN JONES, MANUEL AYAN, RICKY MCCLARITY, SHARON THOMPSON, CLARA BRYANT, CHARLES YOUNG, ARMANDO SANCHEZ, FRENCHIE SCRIVENS, DAVENNIA POPE, DORIS RICHARDSON, JAMES HAISSER, NATHAN EVERHART, TERRIE DONADIO, BONNIE CALDERON, INGA WHITE, EVELYN THOMAS, JESSE SULLIVAN, NORMA A YOUMANS, LYDIA JOHNSON, SHARON L WILLIAMS, TIMOTHY GRIFFIN, TAMMY MCCARTY, GINA RODRIGUEZ, LUCILLE ROBINSON, ALLEN HUI, EDWARD VELASQUEZ, PAUL MOORE, TIM MARTINEZ, AFENI GRAPHENREED, JULIE JOHNSTON, JOSEPH E LEWIS, JAMES PECK, JEANNETTE MALDONADO, DAWN M. TURK, SHANNON EDMONDS, MARKITTA BENNETT, LUZ MARIA LOMELI VELASCO, BILLY RAY STEWART, BRYANT COULTER, TOBIE A SHERRILL, KAYLA STEWART, DANIEL ANDREWS, PILLAR YOUNG, BIANCA ROBINSON, CHRISTIAN T MOORE, BEVERLY JONES, MARLENE MILLER, ANNE BLANCO, DEREL SMITH, ANGELA LYONS and MARY ORNELAS
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2020cv05632
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CARO, LOUISE)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02620. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company regarding Second Notice of Removal. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 ***Case Reopened. Per order at docket# 17 . (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the clerk to re-open Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2584; Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2588; Evans v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2614; Adeniran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-2620; Booth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5114; and Stone v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Case No. 18-5118. The Court further DIRECTS Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why its "second notices of removal" filed in each case are procedurally proper and timely under 18 U.S.C. 1446. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by June 15, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, AND 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Case Successfully Electronically Transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Their Case number is 3:18-cv-01406. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. The Case is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #11 MOTION TO STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Adeniran (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 16, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Re: #11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Document missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. [err400] (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a status conference has been set for May 29, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/29/2018. Replies due by 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-00254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 5/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bernard Adeniran. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566226. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12324735). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 (no process)Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/3/2018) Modified on 5/4/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADENIRAN et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN MARTIN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELLY MEECE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE MARTIN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNARD ADENIRAN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NERISSA HARRIS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVA HALE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY SAINZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERARDA AISPURO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE KARASIUK
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA BRASSY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BIRTON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY THOMAS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODY M ORSO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT WEAVER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN FINS ACERRO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MCNAIR
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRION KEMP
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BROWN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE HANSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA PRAGER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACIE V BERRY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEO J GOMEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY D CULLORS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN M WITHERBY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEOTIST TRAMBLE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIANIA CAMPBELL
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TESHAWN GAITHER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA ALFORD
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT M BROCKLEY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK THOMAS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN JONES
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL AYAN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY MCCLARITY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON THOMPSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA BRYANT
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES YOUNG
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO SANCHEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRENCHIE SCRIVENS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVENNIA POPE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS RICHARDSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HAISSER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN EVERHART
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRIE DONADIO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE CALDERON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA WHITE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN THOMAS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE SULLIVAN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA A YOUMANS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYDIA JOHNSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON L WILLIAMS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GRIFFIN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY MCCARTY
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCILLE ROBINSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN HUI
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD VELASQUEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MOORE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM MARTINEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFENI GRAPHENREED
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE JOHNSTON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E LEWIS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PECK
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNETTE MALDONADO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN M. TURK
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON EDMONDS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKITTA BENNETT
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ MARIA LOMELI VELASCO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY RAY STEWART
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYANT COULTER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOBIE A SHERRILL
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA STEWART
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL ANDREWS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PILLAR YOUNG
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIANCA ROBINSON
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN T MOORE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY JONES
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE MILLER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE BLANCO
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREL SMITH
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA LYONS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ORNELAS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?