NOVICK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ALBERT PONIEDZIALEK, DIANE RHONE, DENISE TWIFORD, BARBARA OATIS, SUSAN NOVICK, APRIL RINEHART, RONALD FERGUSON, STACEY BURLEY, VERONICA RAMIREZ, ROBERT LANDERS, NARONDA REED, KIARA KUYKENDALL, Craig Huddleston Jr., TANNYA HOLLAND, TERRA PAINTER, LATASHA JOHNSON, MARY AKINS, JANET BOTELLO, RICE SANCHEZ, ALEXANDER SHEN, ALAINA LYONS, SOMSITH CHINDAVONG, DONALD SALAZAR, JR, ANGELA TROTTER, MICHAEL ROBERTS, PAULA GALLERANI, REBECCA SCOTT, ALLISON TAYLOR, SHERRY LORD, ANDRE HUDSON, Sindi Widensky, SUZANNA COMBS, KATHY MOTZNO, JAMES GREEN, BRENDA ANTILLON, WILLIE JONES, SHERRY MCGINTY, CHANETT GREEN, JOCELYN RHIMES, KEVIN HURNDON, JASMINE ELDRIDGE, CANDACE PROTIC, FAY FORREST, JACQUELINE ALAO, ANTHONY POW, KEITH BEAN, GWENDOLYN PATTERSON, BONNIE HUNT, EFFIE PITTMAN, DONNA KONIGSMARK, IRMA NEWSOME, JERALD GOFFNEY, ERNEST MCDAY, NESHELL CARTER, EVA GARCIA, OSCAR VARGAS, LUZ MEJIA, JOHN CARVER, STELLA PEREZ, FRANCINE ROBINSON, CHRISTINE WHITAKER, ANGELA SPRUILL, TEVIS CHILDS, ALZENA CUMMINGS, DAVID MEACHAM, BILLIE DENNIS, KIMBERLY LAMAR, TRACY BAILEY, KARL MALDANADO, LAI-LA JOHNSON and TIANNA WILLIAMS
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2020cv05653
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-05016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 14, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel (MDL 2734) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 STIPULATED REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, and 1446] against All Plaintiffs. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2061. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 ERRATA re #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Withdrawal of Ground of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and L.R. 3-15 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568926, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12601222). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVICK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT PONIEDZIALEK
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE RHONE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE TWIFORD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA OATIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN NOVICK
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL RINEHART
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD FERGUSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY BURLEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA RAMIREZ
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LANDERS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARONDA REED
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIARA KUYKENDALL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Huddleston Jr.
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANNYA HOLLAND
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRA PAINTER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATASHA JOHNSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY AKINS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET BOTELLO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICE SANCHEZ
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER SHEN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAINA LYONS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOMSITH CHINDAVONG
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD SALAZAR, JR
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA TROTTER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ROBERTS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA GALLERANI
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA SCOTT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON TAYLOR
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY LORD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE HUDSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sindi Widensky
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNA COMBS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY MOTZNO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GREEN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA ANTILLON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE JONES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY MCGINTY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANETT GREEN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOCELYN RHIMES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HURNDON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE ELDRIDGE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDACE PROTIC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAY FORREST
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE ALAO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY POW
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH BEAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN PATTERSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE HUNT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFFIE PITTMAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA KONIGSMARK
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMA NEWSOME
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERALD GOFFNEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST MCDAY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NESHELL CARTER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA GARCIA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR VARGAS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ MEJIA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CARVER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLA PEREZ
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCINE ROBINSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE WHITAKER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SPRUILL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEVIS CHILDS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALZENA CUMMINGS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MEACHAM
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE DENNIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY LAMAR
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY BAILEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL MALDANADO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAI-LA JOHNSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIANNA WILLIAMS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?