BREEZE et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TRACEY VICTORIA MCCRACLIN, JANICE BROOKINS, NICHOLAS BREEZE, TRACY C HAYDEN, DELVIN GALLIMORE, SHARON NORMAN, MICHAEL SHANKLIN, ARIANA VENEGAS and LEONARD TYLER
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2020cv05658
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CARO, LOUISE)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02514. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 32) by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re: MDL No. 2734 (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order, signed 6/24/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #13 Stipulation to Reopen Case.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, AND 1446] against Nicholas Breeze, Janice Brookins, Delvin Gallimore, Tracy C. Hayden, Tracey Victoria McCraclin, Sharon Norman, Michael Shanklin, Leonard Tyler, Ariana Venegas. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 11 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re MDL No. 2734. ***3:18-cv-01327*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) Modified on 5/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Breeze. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 9 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. ***CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-86) by MDL Panel on 05/10/2018. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) Modified on 5/10/2018 (rcsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. re #5 Certificate of Counsel (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 5/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 4/30/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566068. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12308117). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 4/27/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREEZE et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY VICTORIA MCCRACLIN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE BROOKINS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS BREEZE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY C HAYDEN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELVIN GALLIMORE
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON NORMAN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHANKLIN
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIANA VENEGAS
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD TYLER
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Represented By: LOUISE R CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?