MACK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHANE VAUGHN, CAMERON SHIELDS, ARSENIO PELAYO, SYLVIA ZAJIS, Edwin Prescott Jr., AMI BUBICA, BRENDA BARKER, BRIAN WHITE, GARRY LONG, ANTHONY SORREL, TANYA ZEIGLER, COURTNEY RUMBLEY, ROCHELLE LAMBERT, BRIAN MACK, VINCE BULICKI, LINDA ZUMWALT, SARAH SAUSEDO, DIANNA KOBIELA, AMANDA GALLAGHER, MINDY TACKMIER, KATHY BUNCH, ALLISON O'CAIN, CRYSTAL RUSSELL, CAROL BEAL, LIANA MASUCCI, JULIUS WOODS, NAM WARREN, MICHELLE GILLIAM, LISA NORRIS, TAMMIE LEVERT, HEATHER BROOKS, KEITH SHARP, KEITH NATHAN, LISA MCCLELLAN, MENDY JOHNSON, KELLY STEWART, MALIK THROWER, TAMMIE MERRIDTH, VICKI GILLIGAN, GEROMI CLAY, BRENDA RILEY, Kenneth Farley Sr., BRANDON JONES, KEMIA GRIFFIN, JESSICA YATES, VICKI VANDENBURG, YVETTE WALTERS, RICHARD LEWIS, RICHARD FUSTON, REGINALD PHILLIPS, MINDY GRANT, COURTNEY LANDERS, CHARLES HARDY, DIANNE SMITH, JACQUELYN BISSELL, JEANETTE ANDERSON, DIANA HARPER, SAVANNAH WEST, LEAH RITTER, ROCHELLE SIGAN, TISA BAKER, JON C HURLEY, MIKITA MICKENS, JOSEPH HOGAN, TABATHER GILES, TANA GILBERT, GREGORY DANEL, NICOLLETTE HURD, LEON LEWIS, MELINDA HENDRICKS, FELICIA IVY, JOHN YEE, DILWORTH ROLAND and ROBYN BAIRD
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05659
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #24 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-04928. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-32) by MDL Panel on 7/8/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #21 Stipulation to Re-Open Case. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #19 Stipulation to Continue Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:30 PM. Parties shall use the following dial-in information: Dial In: 888-684-8852 Access Code: 5862990# (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 02:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2020. Parties shall use the following dial-in information: Dial In: 888-684-8852 Access Code: 5862990# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, and 1446] against All Plaintiffs. Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Case e-transferred to the Northern District of Florida and opened as case# 3:18-cv-2059. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/24/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Ground Of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/23/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/22/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568822. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12594250). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHANE VAUGHN
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON SHIELDS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARSENIO PELAYO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA ZAJIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Prescott Jr.
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMI BUBICA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA BARKER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WHITE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY LONG
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SORREL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA ZEIGLER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY RUMBLEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE LAMBERT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MACK
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCE BULICKI
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ZUMWALT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SAUSEDO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA KOBIELA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA GALLAGHER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY TACKMIER
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BUNCH
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON O'CAIN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL RUSSELL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL BEAL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANA MASUCCI
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS WOODS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAM WARREN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GILLIAM
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA NORRIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE LEVERT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER BROOKS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH SHARP
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH NATHAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MCCLELLAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENDY JOHNSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY STEWART
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIK THROWER
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE MERRIDTH
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI GILLIGAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEROMI CLAY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA RILEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Farley Sr.
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JONES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEMIA GRIFFIN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA YATES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI VANDENBURG
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVETTE WALTERS
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LEWIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FUSTON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD PHILLIPS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY GRANT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY LANDERS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARDY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNE SMITH
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELYN BISSELL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE ANDERSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA HARPER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVANNAH WEST
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH RITTER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE SIGAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TISA BAKER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON C HURLEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKITA MICKENS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HOGAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABATHER GILES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANA GILBERT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY DANEL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLLETTE HURD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON LEWIS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA HENDRICKS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA IVY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN YEE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DILWORTH ROLAND
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN BAIRD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?