MARABUTO et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER PORTER, STEPHANIE BAYNE, SHAWN BUTKUS, REBECCA JAMES, JEREEL PARSONS, DONYAI CORBETT, DEMARKIUS GLASPIE, RICKEY CAMPBELL, ELLANDRIA STUBBS, WALTER HORN, MIESHA KELLAM-KING, TERESA CUNNINGHAM, KENYA MALONE, ANITA BRADLEY, BARRY DELL, RANDY WILLIAMS, KAREN SHARP, JONATHAN KENT, MELANI BRITTON, CHLOE ANGULO, IAN ROCKER, SUSAN RAY, MELANIE CHASE, NINA UEDA, TABATHA MORRISSEY, ANGELA LORRAINE JETT, MARCUS BEST, JOEY HERBERT, JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI, DOCK FILLIPE FLOYD, PAMELA THOMPSON, SONIA AGUILERA, MISTY MILEY, ASHLEY JACKSON, JOSEPH MUSIC, KAREN HAMILTON, TROY MARABUTO and IMARI NICOLOFF
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05683
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - The Court has been advised that all but fourteen of the plaintiffs in these cases settled their respective claims under the global settlement program. The plaintiffs who settled their claims must file stipulations of dismissal by 8/13/2020. Expert reports must be served on Defendants by October 2, 2020. By 10/9/2020, 2020, Defendants must provide the Court with a written report identifying which of the fourteen plaintiffs timely produced an appropriate expert report and which did not. Failure to provide an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Rule 26(a)(2) and this Order will constitute grounds for dismissal with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
July 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #20 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-04931. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 7/8/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #17 Stipulation to Re-Open Case.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Re-Open Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Plaintiffs, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 6/23/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.S SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, and 1446 against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Case Electronically Transferred to the Northern District of Florida as case 3:18-cv-02065. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #11 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 REMINDER: Pursuant to L.R. Rule 5-1(g), proposed orders shall be submitted in Word format to the specific address on Judge Armstrong's web page for emailing proposed orders to the assigned judge. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Ground Of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/23/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 ERRATA re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court with jury demand (no process). Their case number is CGC-18-568826. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12594481). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2018) Modified on 8/15/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARABUTO et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER PORTER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE BAYNE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN BUTKUS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA JAMES
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREEL PARSONS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONYAI CORBETT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMARKIUS GLASPIE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKEY CAMPBELL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLANDRIA STUBBS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER HORN
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIESHA KELLAM-KING
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENYA MALONE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANITA BRADLEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY DELL
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY WILLIAMS
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN SHARP
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN KENT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANI BRITTON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHLOE ANGULO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN ROCKER
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN RAY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE CHASE
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINA UEDA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABATHA MORRISSEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA LORRAINE JETT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS BEST
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY HERBERT
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ACEVEDO MARTI
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCK FILLIPE FLOYD
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA THOMPSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONIA AGUILERA
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISTY MILEY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY JACKSON
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MUSIC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN HAMILTON
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY MARABUTO
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMARI NICOLOFF
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: SHARON DOUGLASS MAYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?