MAXWELL et al v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: DEB MAXWELL, CHARLENE COTHRAN, JOHN GUNTER, JR and MARK C SEVIER
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, BEN CARSON, SEEMA VERMA, VICTORIA A LIPNIC, ROGER SEVERINO, MICHAEL R POMPEO, WILLIAM BARR, ALEX M AZAR, II and JOHN J SULLIVAN
Case Number: 3:2020cv05689
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
2 Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to DEB MAXWELL Re: #16 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to DEB MAXWELL Re: #17 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to DEB MAXWELL Re: #11 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #12 and #14 Motions for Leave to Exceed Word Count. The clerk of court, therefore, is directed to strike ECF Nos. #13 and #15 from the docket. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 09/09/2020. (sdw)
September 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #16 Order Reassigning Case,,. (jcw)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - I hereby recuse myself from handling any proceedings in the above-styled case. The clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case to one of the other United States Magistrate Judges in this district and change the docket to reflect the reassignment. (Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. Use case number 3:20-cv-5689-RV-EMT.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/4/2020. Motions referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jcw)
September 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File, #14 MOTION for Leave to File, #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively, MOTION for a Permanent Injunction, #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively, MOTION for a Permanent Injunction. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 ***STRICKEN per #17 Order*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively, MOTION for a Permanent Injunction by JOHN GUNTER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support w/ footnotes, #2 Memorandum in Support w/o footnotes) (sdw) Modified on 9/9/2020 (sdw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File by JOHN GUNTER, JR. (sdw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN per #17 Order*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively, MOTION for a Permanent Injunction by DEB MAXWELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support w/ footnotes, #2 Memorandum in Support w/o footnotes) (sdw) Modified on 9/9/2020 (sdw).
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File by DEB MAXWELL. (sdw)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion for the District Court to Set Aside Magistrate Cannon's Order that Weaponizes Procedural Rules to Thwart Justice in a Case where the Integrity of the Court's Past Practices on this Topic are in Question. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/31/2020. (mb)
August 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for the District Court to Set Aside Magistrate Cannon's Order that Weaponizes Procedural Rules to Thwart Justice in a Case where the Integrity of the Court's Past Practices on this Topic are in Question. (sdw)
August 27, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #8 MOTION for the District Court to Set Aside Magistrate Cannon's Order that Weaponizes Procedural Rules to Thwart Justice in a Case where the Integrity of the Court's Past Practices on this Topic are in Question. (sdw)
August 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #10 First Amended Complaint, #9 Notice of Filing, #8 MOTION for the District Court to Set Aside Magistrate Cannon's Order that Weaponizes Procedural Rules to Thwart Justice in a Case where the Integrity of the Court's Past Practices on this Topic are in Question. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants. filed by MARK C SEVIER, JOHN GUNTER, JR, DEB MAXWELL, CHARLENE COTHRAN. (no service copies) (sdw)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by MARK C SEVIER. (sdw)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for the District Court to Set Aside Magistrate Cannon's Order that Weaponizes Procedural Rules to Thwart Justice in a Case where the Integrity of the Court's Past Practices on this Topic are in Question by DEB MAXWELL, MARK C SEVIER. (sdw)
August 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order. (amended complaint not filed) (sdw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to MARK C SEVIER, JOHN GUNTER, JR Re: #5 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to MARK C SEVIER, JOHN GUNTER, JR Re: 4 Notice to Pro Se. (return to sender unable to forward) (sdw)
August 4, 2020 Set Deadlines re #5 Order. Amended Complaint due by 8/25/2020. (sdw)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion at ECF Doc. #2 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion at ECF Doc. #3 is DENIED. The clerk shall send Plaintiffs a copy of this Court's pro se civil rights complaint form. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file one (1) amended complaint on the provided form. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 08/04/2020. (form to Pla) (sdw)
July 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 Emergency MOTION to have the Summons Uploaded to ECF/PACER, #3 MOTION for ECF Filing in this case only. (filing fee paid) Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se litigants MARK C SEVIER, JOHN GUNTER, JR, DEB MAXWELL, and CHARLENE COTHRAN. (sdw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for ECF Filing in this case only by CHARLENE COTHRAN, JOHN GUNTER, JR, DEB MAXWELL, MARK C SEVIER. (sdw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to have the Summons Uploaded to ECF/PACER by CHARLENE COTHRAN, JOHN GUNTER, JR, DEB MAXWELL, MARK C SEVIER. (sdw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR, II, WILLIAM BARR, BEN CARSON, VICTORIA A LIPNIC, MICHAEL R POMPEO, ROGER SEVERINO, JOHN J SULLIVAN, US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES,and SEEMA VERMA filed by MARK C SEVIER, JOHN GUNTER, JR, DEB MAXWELL, and CHARLENE COTHRAN. (no service copies) (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee receipt FLN3-13935, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Part 1, #4 Exhibit Part 2, #5 Declarations, #6 Declaration of Pastor Rich Penkoski, #7 Declaration of Charlene Cothran, #8 Declaration of a Coalition of Multi-Racial Pastors) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAXWELL et al v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEB MAXWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE COTHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GUNTER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK C SEVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA A LIPNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER SEVERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN J SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?