COX v. ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC
Plaintiff: JEFFREY COX
Defendant: Anesthesia Business Consultants, LLC and ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05731
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion. (alb)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEFFREY COX. (SIMMONS, CORY)
September 28, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/13/2020). (alb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MILLER, DOUGLAS)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 & #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The discovery deadline proposed by the parties (April 16, 2021) is adopted by the Court. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment or other potentially dispositive motions is 28 days after the discovery deadline. The parties shall mediate this case in accordance with the procedures set forth in the Appendix to this Order. The deadline for completing mediation is 14 days after the discovery deadline( Discovery due by 4/16/2021, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/14/2021, Mediation to take place by 4/30/2021, Mediation Report due by 5/7/2021.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 09/28/2020. (alb) Modified on 9/29/2020 to change/correct the judge (alb).
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SIMMONS, CORY)
September 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SIMMONS, CORY)
September 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #7 Amended Complaint. (No response filed, only Amended Complaint filed.) (alb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Defendant's motion to dismiss the original complaint (Doc. #5 ) is DENIED as moot, and Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). ( Answer due by 9/22/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 09/08/2020. (alb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC, filed by JEFFREY COX. (SIMMONS, CORY)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC identifying Corporate Parent MIRAMED GLOBAL SERVICES, INC. for ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC.. (HORKY, ALAN)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/8/2020). (alb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MILLER, DOUGLAS)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/2/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 12/16/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 08/19/2020. (alb)
August 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN RAYMOND HORKY on behalf of Anesthesia Business Consultants, LLC (HORKY, ALAN)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MILLER, DOUGLAS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anesthesia Business Consultants, LLC from Circuit Court in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 2020 CA 000909. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5591655.), filed by Anesthesia Business Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MILLER, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COX v. ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Business Consultants, LLC
Represented By: ALAN RAYMOND HORKY
Represented By: DOUGLAS GRAYSON MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANESTHESIA BUSINESS CONSULTANTS LLC
Represented By: ALAN RAYMOND HORKY
Represented By: DOUGLAS GRAYSON MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY COX
Represented By: CORY SCOTT SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?