PEAVY v. CORPORATION OF THE UNITED OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A PEAVY
Defendant: CORPORATION OF THE UNITED OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2020cv05732
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Set Deadlines re #7 ORDER. (Amended Complaint due by 11/2/2020. Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 11/2/2020). (mb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff has until November 2, 2020, in which to comply with the court's order of September 2, 2020 (ECF No. #3 ) by filing an amended complaint on the proper form, which the clerk of court provided Plaintiff, and in compliance with the court's Local Rules, and either pay the $400 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the court-approved forms, which the clerk of court also provided Plaintiff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/14/2020. (mb)
October 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time by MICHAEL A PEAVY. (mb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion To Inquire. Indeed, it is not clear from the motion what, if any, relief Plaintiff seeks. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/10/2020. (mb)
September 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)
September 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION To Inquire re #1 Complaint. (mb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION To Inquire re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL A PEAVY. (mb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to forward Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in the Northern District, along with a complete set of forms needed for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff also will have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 10/2/2020. Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 10/2/2020.) (Forms mailed with ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/2/2020. (mb)
August 18, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORPORATION OF THE UNITED OF AMERICA, filed by MICHAEL A PEAVY. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee received.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEAVY v. CORPORATION OF THE UNITED OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATION OF THE UNITED OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A PEAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?