GALVIN v. U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Appellant: SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN
Appellee: U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv05764
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief. ( Brief due by 11/21/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/7/2020. (alb)
October 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Extend Timeto File Brief. (alb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Timeto File Brief by U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (CECH SAMOLE, BRIGID)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN. (Attachments: #1 Galvin, Opening Brief, Adv (154), #2 Galvin, Appellant's Appendix, Adv (155)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLETE RECORD OF APPEAL in 19-03012 by U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Mot Dismiss 7 Dfnts, Adv (82), #2 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Ord Grant Mot Dismiss 7 Dfnts, Adv (94), #3 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Ord Grant Dfnt Mot to Dismiss, Adv (97), #4 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Notice Cont Status Conf, Adv (116), #5 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Notice Undeliverable Mail, Adv (131), #6 Appellee Desig, Part 4 of 4, Appellee's Designation, Adv (152)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Record of Appeal in 19-03012 by U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Notice Returned Mail, Adv (32), #2 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Notice Undeliverable Mail, Adv (36, #3 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Notice Address Change Dfnt, Adv (40), #4 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Alias Summons, Adv (42), #5 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Mot to Dismiss by Dfnt, Adv (56), #6 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Mot to Dismiss by Dfnt, Adv (77), #7 Appellee Desig, Part 3 of 4, Req for Judicial Not w Exh, Adv (78)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Record of Appeal in 19-03012 by U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Appellee Desig, Part 2 of 4, Alias Summons, Adv (24), #2 Appellee Desig, Part 2 of 4, Complaint Am 2, Adv (29), #3 Appellee Desig, Part 2 of 4, Complaint Am 2 Addendum Not (Adv 31)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Record of Appeal in 19-03012 by U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Appellee Desig, Part 1 of 4, Alias Summons, Adv (10), #2 Appellee Desig, Part 1 of 4, Adv Complaint Notice, Adv (15), #3 Appellee Desig, Part 1 of 4, Mot Expansion Time Am, Adv (16), #4 Appellee Desig, Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 1-3, Adv (20), #5 Appellee Desig, Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 4-5, Adv (20), #6 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Amended Complaint Part 6-9, Adv (20), #7 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 10-11, Adv (20), #8 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Amended Complaint Part 12-15, Adv (20), #9 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint part 16-18, Adv (20), #10 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 19-22, Adv (20), #11 Appellee Desig Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 23-26, Adv (20), #12 Appellee Desi, Part 1 of 4, Am Complaint Part 27-29, Adv (20)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Record of Appeal in 19-03012 by SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN (Attachments: #1 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Summons Service Executed, Adv (63), #2 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Mot to Enter Judgment, Adv (81), #3 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Am Complaint, Adv (83), #4 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Ord Deny Mot Enter Judgment, Adv (90), #5 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Not of Appearance, Adv (91), #6 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Ord Dismiss 7 Dfnts, Adv (111), #7 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Ord Clarify Record Amend Caption, Adv (115), #8 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Mot Dismiss, Adv (123), #9 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Exhibit for Mot Dismiss, Adv (126), #10 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Req for Judicial Notice, Adv (127), #11 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Mot File Am Complaint, Adv (128), #12 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Response to Mot to File Am Complaint, Adv (129), #13 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Notice of Hearing, Adv (130), #14 Appellant Desig, Part 2 of 2, Appellant Stmt of Issue Designation, Adv (149)) (Romine, Carolyn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Record of Appeal in 19-03012 by SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, Part 1 of 2, Complaint Cover Sheet, Adv (1), #2 Appellant Desig, Part 1 of 2, Complaint Parts 1-10, Adv (9), #3 Appellant Desig, Part 1 of 2, Complaint Parts 11-20, Adv (9)) (Romine, Carolyn)
September 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. (No filings.) (alb)
September 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Appellant Brief due by 9/24/2020. (No filings.) (alb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE MARIE CLEMENTE on behalf of U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (CLEMENTE, KATHERINE)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGID F CECH SAMOLE on behalf of U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (CECH SAMOLE, BRIGID)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 9/24/2020. Appellee Brief due by 10/24/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/7/2020. (Mailed to pro se Appellant). (mb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL SHEET by SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN (Attachments: #1 Galvin Notice of Appeal, bkr 139, #2 Galvin Mot Waive Filing Fee, bkr 140, #3 Galvin Ord Deny File Am Complaint, bkr 136, #4 Galvin Ord Dismiss Adv Case, bkr 137, #5 Galvin Public Docket) (Romine, Carolyn) (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/24/2020) (Romine, Carolyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALVIN v. U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SUSAN ELIZABETH GALVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ARI NEWMAN
Represented By: BRIGID F CECH SAMOLE
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE CLEMENTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?