SOSNOWSKI et al v. XEUREB
Plaintiff: ROMAN ALEXANDER SOSNOWSKI, THOMAS ALBERT SOSNOWSKI and ESTATE OF KATARINA J SOSNOWSKI
Defendant: HILDA TYLER, RAY GARZA, REBECCA SCOTT, KATRINA CRANE, MEGAN WILLIAMS, SHANNON XEUREB, TOM SEFTON, JACQUILYN HENRY, BRITTANY HIGHTOWER, ESTATE OF GINA GARZA, SARAH PEACOCK and STACY AMARO
Case Number: 3:2020cv05780
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #8 First Amended Complaint. (jcw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits AA-AX, #2 Exhibits A-I, #3 Exhibits J-V, #4 Exhibits X-ZZ, #5 Exhibits 39, 80, 82, 84-92)(No service copies filed.) (jcw)
September 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: 7 Filing Fee Received. (sdw)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $75.00, receipt number FLN3-14036. Fee status updated to paid. (sdw)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Notice, #1 Complaint. Within twenty-one (21) days (9/23/2020) from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must remit the full filing fee of $400.00; i.e., he must remit an additional $75.00, or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to send the Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/2/2020. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Letter re 3 Partial Filing Fee by THOMAS ALBERT SOSNOWSKI. (jcw)
August 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant mailed to Thomas Albert Sosnoski only, no address given for plaintiff ROMAN ALEXANDER SOSNOWSKI. (alb) Modified on 8/28/2020 (alb).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Partial Filing fee: $ 325.00, receipt number FLN300014000. (alb) Modified on 8/31/2020, Filing fee to be refunded based on IFP has NOT been granted and the full filing fee is due to be paid (alb).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE. Department of Corrections Inmate Trust Fund Special Withdrawal, by THOMAS ALBERT SOSNOWSKI. (alb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATRINA CRANE, ESTATE OF GINA GARZA, RAY GARZA, JACQUILYN HENRY, BRITTANY HIGHTOWER, REBECCA SCOTT, TOM SEFTON, HILDA TYLER, MEGAN WILLIAMS, SHANNON XEUREB, filed by ROMAN ALEXANDER SOSNOWSKI, THOMAS ALBERT SOSNOWSKI. (no service copies.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B THRU J, #3 Exhibit EXCULPATORY EXHIBITS TO EXHIBIT J, #4 Exhibit K THRU ZZ, #5 Exhibit 55 THRU 92, #6 Exhibit JJ thru UU) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOSNOWSKI et al v. XEUREB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROMAN ALEXANDER SOSNOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ALBERT SOSNOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF KATARINA J SOSNOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILDA TYLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRINA CRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON XEUREB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM SEFTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUILYN HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY HIGHTOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF GINA GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH PEACOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY AMARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?