SAVOURY v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: JOY N SAVOURY
Defendant: MCLANE COMPANY, INC., TRANSCO, INC. and JACOB C SMITH
Case Number: 3:2020cv05795
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #7 Joint Report. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions, as well as daubert motions to be filed by 7/30/2021. Mediation to take place by 7/28/2021. Mediation Report due by 8/11/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (mb)
October 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WEAVER, STEPHEN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANSCO, INC. identifying Corporate Parent MCLANE COMPANY, INC., Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. for TRANSCO, INC... (WEAVER, STEPHEN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MCLANE COMPANY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC. for MCLANE COMPANY, INC... (WEAVER, STEPHEN)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2020. Discovery due by 3/8/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/8/2020. (mb)
September 7, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY by MCLANE COMPANY, INC., JACOB C SMITH, TRANSCO, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (WEAVER, STEPHEN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEAVER, STEPHEN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCLANE COMPANY, INC., TRANSCO, INC., JACOB C SMITH from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT OKALOOSA COUNTY FL, case number 2020 CA 001663F. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5635412.), filed by MCLANE COMPANY, INC., TRANSCO, INC., JACOB C SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOCKET DOCUMENTS, #2 Exhibit B - NOTICE TO STATE COURT, #3 Exhibit C - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY, #4 Exhibit D - DEMAND LTR) (WEAVER, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAVOURY v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCLANE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN KYLE WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSCO, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN KYLE WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOB C SMITH
Represented By: STEPHEN KYLE WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOY N SAVOURY
Represented By: JONATHAN BROCK MINCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?