HOWTON v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER A HOWTON
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv05870
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Court hereby STAYS all Deepwater Horizon BELO cases currently filed and those filed in the future, unless an order lifting the stay is or has been entered in the individual case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a master docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01602. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/6/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8332829) filed by Jennifer A Howton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Jennifer A Howton(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWTON v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: SCOTT CHRISTOPHER SEILER
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT CHRISTOPHER SEILER
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER A HOWTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FALCON
Represented By: JARRETT S FALCON
Represented By: JEREMIAH A SPRAGUE
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?