BERGER v. YOUNG
Plaintiff: JACKIE S BERGER
Defendant: V YOUNG, JON RIVERS, JANE BRIM, J W SMITH, T MCCRAINE, JOHN WHITE, JANE GOODARD, Z BARLOW, JOHN HEATON, P H HUGHES, JOHN JACKSON, JOHN TURNER, C SEAMAN, Z SCRUBBS, L RODRIGUEZ, G CHEEKS, JON NEEL, JANE MALES and T WHEATON
Case Number: 3:2021cv00239
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Set Deadlines re: #6 Order. Fee due by 4/30/2021. (blr)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to File Court Cost or Filing Fee (ECF Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to pay the $402.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's request for all other relief is DENIED. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/31/2021. (blr)
March 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Plaintiff's Request for Extension to file court cost or filing fee. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (blr)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Request for Extension to file court cost or filing fee. by JACKIE S BERGER. (blr)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be recommended for dismissal for failure to prosecute or comply with an order of the Court. The Court will discharge the show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's February 19 order within the fourteen (14) days provided. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/23/2021. Show Cause Response due by 4/6/2021. (blr)
March 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (No IFP or filing fee paid.) (blr)
March 23, 2021 ** ACTION NO LONGER REQUIRED *** ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (No IFP or filing fee paid.) (blr) Modified on 3/23/2021 (blr).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number should be written on the forms. Within twenty-one (21) from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. (Fee due by 3/12/2021.) (Forms mailed to Pltf with Order) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/19/2021. (blr)
February 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (blr)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (blr)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z BARLOW, JANE BRIM, G CHEEKS, JANE GOODARD, JOHN HEATON, P H HUGHES, JOHN JACKSON, JANE MALES, T MCCRAINE, JON NEEL, JON RIVERS, L RODRIGUEZ, Z SCRUBBS, C SEAMAN, J W SMITH, JOHN TURNER, T WHEATON, JOHN WHITE, V YOUNG. filed by JACKIE S BERGER. (no service copies/no filing fee/IFP motion) (blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERGER v. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON RIVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE BRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T MCCRAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE GOODARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z BARLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HEATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P H HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C SEAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z SCRUBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G CHEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON NEEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE MALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T WHEATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE S BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?