MERAKI SOLAR LLC et al v. ROSENBALM et al
Plaintiff: MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC and MERAKI SOLAR LLC
Defendant: DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL, MIKOL ROSENBALM and STUART KIRKHAMHN
Case Number: 3:2021cv00405
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #13 & #14 Joint Reports. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. The deadline for filing Dispositive Motions, as well as daubert motions to be filed by 1/10/2022. Mediation to take place by 1/7/2022. Mediation Report due by 1/21/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2021. (mb)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 MOTION Request for Extension of Deadline to Respond to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS Counterclaims. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss is due on or before May 7, 2021. (Response to motion due by 5/7/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2021. (mb)
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 DEFENDANTS' UNILATERAL REPORT OF ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO AMEND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, #13 PLAINTIFFS' UNILATERAL REPORT OF ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO AMEND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (mb)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFENDANTS' UNILATERAL REPORT OF ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO AMEND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SUMSION, STEVEN) Modified on 4/25/2021 to correct docket text to match the pdf attached herein. (mb).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS' UNILATERAL REPORT OF ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO AMEND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ADAMS, RUPERT) Modified on 4/25/2021 to correct docket text to match the pdf attached herein. (mb).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaim (Dkt. 5) Supplemental Response filed by MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC, MERAKI SOLAR LLC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaim (Dkt. 5), #11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS, #12 Response in Opposition to Motion in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS - Supplemental Response. (blr)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaim (Dkt. 5) filed by MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC, MERAKI SOLAR LLC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaim (Dkt. 5) by STUART KIRKHAMHN, MIKOL ROSENBALM, DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL. (SUMSION, STEVEN)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Steven R. Sumsion, of the law firm of Sumsion Business Law, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendants, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed STEVEN SUMSION for STUART KIRKHAMHN, STEVEN SUMSION for MIKOL ROSENBALM, STEVEN SUMSION for DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/14/2021. (mb)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steve Sumsion.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6035459.) (blr)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steve Sumsion.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6035459.) by STUART KIRKHAMHN, MIKOL ROSENBALM, DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SUMSION, STEVEN) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/14/2021) (blr).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaim (Dkt. 5) by MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC, MERAKI SOLAR LLC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/23/2021). (mb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC, MERAKI SOLAR LLC. (ADAMS, RUPERT)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC, MERAKI SOLAR LLC by DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL, MIKOL ROSENBALM, STUART KIRKHAMHN. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting as requested, #3 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (to March 22, 2021). (Answer due by 3/22/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/12/2021. (mb)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (mb)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STUART KIRKHAMHN, MIKOL ROSENBALM, DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/23/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/22/2021. Discovery due by 9/9/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/9/2021. (mb)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL, MIKOL ROSENBALM, STUART KIRKHAMHN from ESCAMBIA COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2021 CA 274. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5978848.), filed by DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL, MIKOL ROSENBALM, STUART KIRKHAMHN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit LLC Filings, #3 Exhibit State Court Materials) (WIGGINS, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERAKI SOLAR LLC et al v. ROSENBALM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESREAL AARON SANDOVAL
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: STEVEN SUMSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKOL ROSENBALM
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: STEVEN SUMSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART KIRKHAMHN
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: STEVEN SUMSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERAKI INSTALLERS LLC
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Represented By: RUPERT BRADLEY ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERAKI SOLAR LLC
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Represented By: RUPERT BRADLEY ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?