JONES v. CASH et al
Plaintiff: JR DONALD R JONES and DONALD R JONES
Defendant: JOHN DOE, MOYE and B CASH
Case Number: 3:2021cv00487
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DONALD R JONES. (alb)
May 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Within twenty-one days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on this Court's civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, along with two service copies of the second amended complaint. The clerk is directed to provide to the Plaintiff, along with this Order, a copy of the civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners. ( Amended Pleadings and service copies are due by 5/27/2021.) (Order and form mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 5/6/2021. (alb)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 5/4/2021. (alb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN300014514. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against B CASH, JOHN DOE, MOYE, filed by DONALD R JONES. (No service copies received.) (alb)
April 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: 5 Filing Fee Received, #4 Amended Complaint. (alb)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for prisoners). This case number should be written on the forms. Within twenty-one days from the date of this order, if Plaintiff intends to proceed with this action, he shall submit a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. The clerk shall also send Plaintiff one (1) section 1983 complaint form for use by pro se, prisoner litigants. Within the same time period, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. The Court will not, however, take action on the amended complaint unless Plaintiff submits a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pays the filing fee. (Order and forms mailed.)( Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2021, Fee due by 4/14/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/24/2021. (alb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DONALD R JONES. (alb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B CASH, JOHN DOE, MOYE, filed by DONALD R JONES. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Table of Contents) (alb)
March 19, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #1 Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
March 19, 2021 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. CASH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JR DONALD R JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD R JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?