CHANDLER v. WALTON COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER
Defendant: WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR
Case Number: 3:2021cv00507
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL, re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 11/23/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/14/2021. Mediation to take place by 12/21/2021. Mediation Report due by 1/4/2022.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/11/2021. (alb)
May 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (VAIL, JASON)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR. (MCKNIGHT, AVERY)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting as requested, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR answer due 4/7/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/30/2021. (alb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE answer due 4/7/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/30/2021. (alb)
March 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. (alb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (VAIL, JASON)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/23/2021. (alb)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/6/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/6/2021. Discovery due by 9/23/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/23/2021. (alb)
March 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MCKNIGHT, AVERY)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE from First Judicial Circuit in and for Walton County, Florida, case number 21-CA-59. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6000047.), filed by WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (MCKNIGHT, AVERY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHANDLER v. WALTON COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: AVERY DEAN MCKNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A ADKINSON, JR
Represented By: AVERY DEAN MCKNIGHT
Represented By: JASON ERIC VAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?