BRADLEY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: DIONNE BRADLEY
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and ANDREW M SAUL
Case Number: 3:2021cv00681
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Saul, the Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida with a copy of the appropriate summons (ECF Doc. #2 ) and complaint (ECF Doc. #1 ) in the manner and time prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and file the returns of summonses with the Court. Plaintiff is reminded that service must be accomplished in ninety-days (July 19, 2021), or, absent good cause, the case shall be dismissed by the Court. (Deadline for service 7/19/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/30/2021. (alb)
April 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order. (Filing fee received, but no other filings.) (alb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number FLN300014536. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Within seven days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either pay the requisite filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within the same time period, Plaintiff shall respond to this order by advising whether she has served the summonses and complaint on the Commissioner, consistent with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, and will also, within a reasonable time after service, file the returns. Within the same time period, if Plaintiff has not served the summonses and complaint and seeks to proceed in forma pauperis, she shall provide three (3) copies of the USM-285 forms and three (3) copies of the complaint to the Court. The copies of the complaint must be identical to each other and to the filed complaint. ( Fee due by 4/29/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/22/2021. (alb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note the filing fee has not been paid in this case. Please contact the clerks office unless a Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis is filed. (alb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Summons Atty General, #2 SUMMONS US ATTORNEY.) (alb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL (Filing fee $402.), filed by DIONNE BRADLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Office of the Attorney General, #3 Summons - Office of the General Counsel SSA, #4 Summons - United States Attorney's Office - Tallahassee) (BOHR, SARAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIONNE BRADLEY
Represented By: SARAH HARRIET BOHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?