POWELL v. SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Defendant: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Petitioner: GAYNETT POWELL
Case Number: 3:2021cv01009
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff's "Motion to Quash and Motion for Extension of Time" (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a civil rights complaint on the court form and either pay the $402 filing fee or file an IFP motion on the court form is extended to NOVEMBER 12, 2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/19/2021. (alb)
October 19, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings RE #9 Order. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. IFP or Fee due by 11/12/2021. (alb)
October 15, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Quash MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 Petitioners Motion to Quash and Motion for Extension of Time, by GAYNETT POWELL. (alb)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Additionally, within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and titled Amended Complaint. (Order and forms mailed.) ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2021, Fee due by 10/12/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE Elizabeth M. Timothy on 9/9/2021. (alb) Modified on 10/15/2021 to correct Judge (alb).
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00880. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2021 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
September 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/3/2021. (CAW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 CASE Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:21-cv-880-BJD-MCR. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (LRB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A), this case is transferred to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, United States District Judge, with his consent. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/3/2021. (JLD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Amended STANDING ORDER Notifying Institution Regarding Inmate Claim of Suicidal Intent or Other Imminent Physical Harm Signed by All Divisional Judges on 01/11/2018. (JDR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 Affidavit against Santa Rosa Correctional Institution Annex filed by Gaynett Powell. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JDR) Modified on 9/3/2021 to correct party spelling (LRB). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GAYNETT POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?