ABRAM v. UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ROY ABRAM
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Case Number: 3:2021cv01013
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 Report and Recommendations by SAMUEL ROY ABRAM. (jcw)
October 13, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #8 Objection to Report and Recommendations (jcw)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Re: #5 ORDER. Not deliverable as addressed. (Correct address on file.) (jcw)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #5 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (jcw)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff's complaint is frivolous, and Plaintiff is a three-striker under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) who has failed to pay the filing fee. The clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 9/24/2021. (jcw)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR DISMISSAL #1 Complaint. Accordingly, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED: This cause be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and 1915(e)(B)(ii) for failure to pay the filing fee and as frivolous. The clerk be directed to close this file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/12/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/14/2021. (jcw)
September 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by SAMUEL ROY ABRAM. (jcw)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE, filed by SAMUEL ROY ABRAM. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABRAM v. UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ROY ABRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?