LARNCE v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: Mary Larnce
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 3:2021cv01033
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General. Re: #1 Complaint, #3 Order, 4 Summons Issued as to USA. (alb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (jcw)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY (jcw)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KILOLO KIJAKAZI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Summonses, USM-285 forms, 3 service copies of #1 complaint received on 9/29/2021 and forwarded to USMS along with 3 certified copies of #3 Order.) (jcw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall send Plaintiff two (2) AO 440 (summons in a civil action) forms and three (3) USM-285 forms. Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court the prepared summonses and USM-285 forms for Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General of the United States and the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida. Plaintiff shall also submit three (3) service copies of the complaint (ECF Doc. #1 ). Upon receipt of these materials, the clerk is directed to issue summonses submitted by Plaintiff and send them, along with three (3) certified copies of this order, the service copies of the complaint, and the prepared USM-285 forms to the United States Marshals Service. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (Summonses, USM-285 Forms, 3 service copies due by 9/27/2021). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/20/2021. (jcw)(Summonses and USM-285 forms sent to counsel as ordered.)
September 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Larnce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis) (HERRERA, BETTY)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by Mary Larnce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons) (HERRERA, BETTY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARNCE v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Larnce
Represented By: BETTY HERRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?