BROWN-NETTLES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2021cv01154
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES identifying Corporate Parent LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA for SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES.. (ORTIZ, NICK)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/17/21. (jfj)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/30/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2021. Discovery due by 5/11/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/16/21. (jfj)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent The New York Life Insurance Company for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. (Please see proposed ISO.) (jfj)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service) (ORTIZ, NICK)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (alb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6399216.), filed by SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (ORTIZ, NICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN-NETTLES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAVON J BROWN-NETTLES
Represented By: NICK ANTHONY ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?