DOE et al v. AUSTIN et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, I, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 1 and JANE DOE 2
Defendant: Secretary of Defense Lloyd Austin, III, Secretary U.S. DHS Xavier Becerra, Secretary Air Force Frank Kendall, Secretary Navy Carlos Del Toro, Commissioner FDA Janet Woodcock, Secretary Army Christine Wormuth, LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, FRANK KENDALL, CARLOS DEL TORO, JANET WOODCOCK and CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Case Number: 3:2021cv01211
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY; striking #6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Plaintiffs may replead by 12/15/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/1/2021. (kdm)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 11/22/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2021. Discovery due by 5/9/2022. Trial set for 9/14/2022 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING #3 and #10 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTIONS signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 11/12/21. (tss)
November 8, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH re #31 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opinion in Church v. Biden, No. 21-cv-2815 (D.D.C.)) (ENLOW, COURTNEY)
November 4, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2021, before Judge Allen Winsor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 8505671374. Tape Number: lisasnydercr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2022. (ls)
November 3, 2021 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2021 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - 9:04 a.m. to 11:25 a.m. - Brandon Johnson and Irbrhim Reyes present for the Plaintiffs and Drew Carmichael present for the defendants - arguments presented by both sides - written order to follow (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss)
October 29, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #31 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Exhibit 28, ECF No. 31-28, #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously re #1 Complaint,,, , #35 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Proceed Anonymously filed by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (POWELL, SIDNEY)
October 29, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY E POWELL on behalf of All Defendants (POWELL, AMY)
October 29, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL on behalf of All Defendants (CARMICHAEL, ANDREW)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #37 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/28/2021. The clerk will seal ECF No. #31 -28. (kdm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on All Outstanding Motions Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2021 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING HEARING signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/27/21. The clerk will set a telephonic hearing for November 3, 2021. The court will consider all outstanding motions at the hearing. Neither side has requested an evidentiary hearing, and the hearing will address legal arguments only. (tss)
October 27, 2021 Filing 37 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #31 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Exhibit 28, ECF No. 31-28 by LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Redaceted Ex. 28 (ECF No 31-28)) (AVALLONE, ZACHARY)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 LEAVE TO FILE REPLY. (Plaintiffs' reply due by 10/29/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/27/2021. (kdm)
October 26, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Proceed Anonymously by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (JOHNSON, BRANDON)
October 26, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Compliance with Protective Order by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9 re #29 Order (JOHNSON, BRANDON)
October 24, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Emergency MOTION to Stay Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Peter McCullough, #2 Affidavit Plaintiffs' Supplemental Declarations (Redacted), #3 Exhibit Congressional Research Service Report, #4 Exhibit OLC EUA Opinion (July 6, 2021)) (JOHNSON, BRANDON)
October 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 10/12/2021, before Judge Allen Winsor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 850-567-1374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022. (ls)
October 21, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Emergency MOTION to Stay Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30) (CARMICHAEL, ANDREW)
October 20, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously re #1 Complaint,,, filed by LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (ENLOW, COURTNEY)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/19/2021. The proposed order (ECF No. #27 -1) is adopted and incorporated into this order as if fully restated here. (kdm)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES re #3 , #10 MOTION for Protective Order. (Defendants' response to both due: 10/21/2021)., Plaintiffs' replies to both due: 10/24/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/18/2021. (kdm)
October 15, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Protective Order by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Appendix) (JOHNSON, BRANDON)
October 12, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2021 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - 4:34 to 448 p.m. - Brandon Johnson and Ibrahim Gandara for the Plaintiffs and Andrew Carmichael for the Defendants - responses due by 10/24/21 - written order to follow(Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss)
October 12, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 12, 2021 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT by LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (ENLOW, COURTNEY)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #2 Brandon Johnson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Jane Doe and John Doe Plaintiffs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/11/2021. (HTC)
October 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY A AVALLONE on behalf of All Defendants (AVALLONE, ZACHARY)
October 8, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 04:30 PM before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Adelita Tinaya-Miller Courtroom Deputy Clerk (atm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2021 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 4:30 PM (Eastern) before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (Court Reporter Donna Boland, Official Court Reporter - Pensacola) (atm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9. (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kdm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Summons by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 10, JOHN DOE 11, JOHN DOE 12, JOHN DOE 13, JOHN DOE 14, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, JOHN DOE 6, JOHN DOE 7, JOHN DOE 8, JOHN DOE 9 (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 04:30 PM Eastern Time before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **DUPLICATE ENTRY**ORDER SETTING HEARING - The clerk will set a telephonic hearing for 4:30 p.m. (eastern) today. The purpose of the hearing is to address scheduling, not to address the merits of Plaintiffs' claims. The clerk will distribute call-in information. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/8/2021. (erl)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #11 Memorandum in Support. (Telephonic Hearing set for 10/8/2021 04:30 PM (eastern) today before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/8/2021. (kdm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9. (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Johnson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6430129.). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (kdm)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED Summons Issued as to LLOYD AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, CARLOS DEL TORO, FRANK KENDALL, JANET WOODCOCK, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (kdm)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lloyd Austin, III, Xavier Becerra, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Janet Woodcock, Christine Wormuth. (kdm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/7/2021. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. (alb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9 (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 ***STRICKEN PER #49 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY*** --- Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #9, JOHN DOE #12, JANE 1 DOE, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #5. (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM) Modified on 12/2/2021 to add text(kdm).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. In the interests of justice and pursuant to Canon 3(C)(1)(c) of the Code of Conduct for United States Judges and 28 U.S.C. 455(a) and (b)(4), I recuse myself from this case. The Clerk shall promptly assign the case to another active district judge due to the pending emergency motions. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2021.Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS for all further proceedings. JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case (alb)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, Emergency MOTION to Stay, Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously re #6 Amended Complaint, #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Johnson. #8 Order Reassigning Case. (alb)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, Emergency MOTION to Stay, Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Johnson, #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously re #1 Complaint. (alb)
October 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Johnson, #3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Emergency MOTION to Stay, Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously, #5 Order Reassigning Case. (alb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Plaintiffs to proceed anonymously re #1 Complaint,,, by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9. (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/20/2021).), Emergency MOTION to Stay , Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting stay and temporary restraining order, #2 Brief in support of emergency motion) (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon Johnson.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6430129.) by JANE 1 DOE, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #12, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #9. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (JOHNSON, BRANDON)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6426671.), filed by JOHN DOE #11, JOHN DOE #7, JOHN 2 DOE, JOHN DOE, I, JANE 2 DOE, JOHN DOE #13, JOHN DOE #6, JOHN DOE #3, JOHN DOE #9, JOHN DOE #12, JANE 1 DOE, JOHN DOE #14, JOHN DOE #8, JOHN DOE #4, JOHN DOE #10, JOHN DOE #5. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19) (REYES GANDARA, IBRAHIM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. AUSTIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, I
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN 2 DOE
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #3
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #4
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #5
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #6
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #7
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #8
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #9
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #10
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #11
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #12
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #13
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE #14
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE 1 DOE
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE 2 DOE
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 1
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 2
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 3
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 4
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 5
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 6
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 7
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 8
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 9
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 10
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 11
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 12
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 13
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE 14
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 1
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 2
Represented By: BRANDON C JOHNSON
Represented By: IBRAHIM REYES GANDARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Defense Lloyd Austin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary U.S. DHS Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Air Force Frank Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Navy Carlos Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner FDA Janet Woodcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Army Christine Wormuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD AUSTIN, III
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK KENDALL
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS DEL TORO
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET WOODCOCK
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By: COURTNEY D ENLOW
Represented By: AMY E POWELL
Represented By: ANDREW EVAN CARMICHAEL
Represented By: ZACHARY A AVALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?