WEAVER et al v. CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584
Plaintiff: RODNEY G. WEAVER, ANNA P. WEAVER, RODNEY G WEAVER and ANNA P WEAVER
Defendant: CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584
Case Number: 3:2021cv01711
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MANUEL FERNANDO ALVAREZ on behalf of CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584 (ALVAREZ, MANUEL)
December 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/8/2021. (Joint REPORT not filed). (mb)
November 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Response by ANNA P WEAVER, RODNEY G WEAVER re #11 Response in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand and Defendant's Motion For Leave to Amend Notice of And Petition For Removal. (mb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE by ANNA P WEAVER, RODNEY G WEAVER re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Non-opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant's Notice of and Petition for Removal. (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand and Defendant's Motion For Leave to Amend Notice of And Petition For Removal filed by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584. (BARROWS, JOSHUA)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Re: #8 Motion to Stay. The motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the above titled action is STAYED pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/19/2021. (alb)
November 19, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (alb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE by ANNA P WEAVER, RODNEY G WEAVER re #5 Notice (Other), In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Re: Clarification, #2 Exhibit Notice of Intent with exhibits, #3 Exhibit Email Re: Notice of Intent, #4 Exhibit Order Denying Def. Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Order Denying Def. Motion to Strike, #6 Exhibit Three Carrier Letters) (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
November 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay (mb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by ANNA P WEAVER, RODNEY G WEAVER. (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
November 15, 2021 Set Deadlines re #7 MOTION to Remand. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/29/2021). (mb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by ANNA P. WEAVER, RODNEY G. WEAVER. (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584. (BARROWS, JOSHUA)
November 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Intent, # 2 Senate Bill 76, # 3 House Bill 305, # 4 Article - NAIC Data, # 5 Article - Governor Signs Legislation. (mb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Intent, #2 Senate Bill 76, #3 House Bill 305, #4 Article - NAIC Data, #5 Article - Governor Signs Legislation) (BARROWS, JOSHUA)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/8/2021. Discovery due by 4/25/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/25/2021. (alb)
October 25, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Amended Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (BARROWS, JOSHUA)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARROWS, JOSHUA)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584 from In the First Judicial Circuit In and For Santa Rosa County, Florida, case number 2021-000802-CA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6507662.), filed by CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584. (BARROWS, JOSHUA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEAVER et al v. CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY G. WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA P. WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY G WEAVER
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA P WEAVER
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. T008433584
Represented By: JOSHUA CHRISTOPHER BARROWS
Represented By: MANUEL FERNANDO ALVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?