BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al
Plaintiff: Blue Angel Properties, LLC and BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE and OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01880
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to #16 Order. (jcw)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND DISMISSING CASE re granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall arbitrate their dispute in accordance with the arbitration clause in the insurance policy. This case DISMISSED without prejudice to the parties' rights under 9 U.S.C. 207. The Clerk shall close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/27/2021. (jcw)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause (Doc. #12 ) is discharged. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/22/2021. (jcw)
December 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #14 NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents. (jcw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing State Court Documents by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #12 Order to Show Cause,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR on behalf of All Defendants (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - No later than Wednesday, 12/22/2021, defense counsel, John Michael Grimley, Jr., shall: a. file a copy of the complaint and other papers filed in state court as required by Local Rule 7.2(A) and this Court's prior order; and b. show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed on him for his failure to comply with the local rule and this Court's prior order even after being sent a courtesy reminder by the Court's law clerk. If Mr. Grimsley does not file a copy of the complaint by the deadline established in this Order, Plaintiff shall do so the following day. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/20/2021. (jcw)
December 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order - Complaint and other state court papers have not been filed. (jcw)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Within 7 days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall file a copy of the complaint and any other papers filed or served in state court in accordance with Local Rule 7.2(A). Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall file a reply to Plaintiff's argument that the arbitration agreement is unenforceable due to unconscionability. The reply shall be limited to 2,400 words, as counted and certified under Local Rule 7.1(F). (Deadline to file a copy of the complaint- 12/9/2021. Replies due by 12/16/2021.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/2/2021. (alb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC. (GREENBERG, GREGORY)
December 1, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Response in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Dismiss. (alb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (GRIMLEY, JOHN)(Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/8/2021) Modified on 11/27/2021 to correct docket text.) (alb).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME - Upon due consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #6 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have until 12/2/2021, to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/12/2021. (jcw)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC. (GREENBERG, GREGORY)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Filing Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 11/17/2021, to respond to the motion. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/5/2021. (jcw)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to C. KEVIN GRIM, JR., Esq. on behalf of Defendants. (jcw)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44) is to be filed with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet," which is found under "Other Documents." (jcw)
November 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Removal. (jcw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal of Action by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY from First Judicial Circuit in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-2599. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6527968.), filed by GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from State Court) (GRIMLEY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Angel Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE ANGEL PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: GREGORY NEAL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover SE
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Represented By: C KEVIN GRIM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?