MURPHY OIL USA INC v. OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MURPHY OIL USA INC
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: PROCESS SERVICE GROUP, LLC, JUSTIN D PARHAM, SHERRY PARHAM, MATTHEW MCDANIEL and LINDSEY MCDANIEL
Case Number: 3:2021cv01900
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TOLLING DEADLINES re #8 MOTION to Stay re #3 Scheduling Order. All deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are tolled pending further order. The parties shall file a status report 90 days from the date of this Order if their Rule 26(f) report has not been filed by then. (Please see order.) ( Status Report due by 3/7/2022.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/6/20201. (alb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay re #3 Scheduling Order, by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (DESHAZO, JOHN)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PROCESS SERVICE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Justin Parham, #2 Summons Sherry Parham, #3 Summons Matthew McDaniel, #4 Summons Lindsey McDaniel.) (alb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against PROCESS SERVICE GROUP, LLC, JUSTIN D PARHAM, SHERRY PARHAM, MATTHEW MCDANIEL, LINDSEY MCDANIEL, filed by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Supplement PSG Summons, #3 Supplement Justin Parham Summons, #4 Supplement Sherry Parham Summons, #5 Supplement Matthew McDaniel Summons, #6 Supplement Lindsey McDaniel Summons) (DESHAZO, JOHN)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (DESHAZO, JOHN)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MURPHY OIL USA INC. (CRONGEYER, JAMES)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/18/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2021. Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/4/2021. (jcw)
November 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO). (jcw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (DESHAZO, JOHN)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLNDC-6528373.), filed by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Supplement Conflict Disclosure Statement, #5 Supplement Conflict Disclosure Statement (second copy)) (DESHAZO, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY OIL USA INC v. OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURPHY OIL USA INC
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH CRONGEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN CURTIS DESHAZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN CURTIS DESHAZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PROCESS SERVICE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JUSTIN D PARHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SHERRY PARHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MATTHEW MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LINDSEY MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?