NORTH HILLS PROPERTIES LLC et al v. STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: North Hills Properties LLC, David Everritt and DAVID EVERITT
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv04773
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #12 Status Report ( Discovery due by 11/25/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/8/2022. Mediation to take place by 12/23/2022. Mediation Report due by 1/6/2023.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/11/2022. (alb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT JOINT REPORT FOR PARTIES PLANNING CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ALTERNATIVE DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING DEADLINES by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (ELMASRI, RAMY)
February 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Status Report. (alb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (ELMASRI, RAMY)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Clerk is directed to consolidate this case with Case Nos. 3:21cv4775-MCR-HTC and 3:21cv4776-MCR-HTC (N.D. Fla.), and to designate Case No. 3:21cv4773-MCR-HTC as the Lead Case. The parties are directed to file all future pleadings and papers in the Lead Case, Case No. 3:21cv4773-MCR-HTC, only. The Clerk shall file a copy of this order on the docket for all three cases. Set/Clear Flags Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/12/2022. (alb)
January 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES. (alb)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (ELMASRI, RAMY)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NORTH HILLS PROPERTIES LLC. (BRAUER, LYNN)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd. for STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY.. (ELMASRI, RAMY)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended 20 days from the date of this order. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/18/2022). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/29/2021. (alb)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (ELMASRI, RAMY)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LYNN ANNE BRAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BRAUER, LYNN)
December 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (alb)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/9/2022. Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/27/2021. (alb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
December 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY from First Judicial Circuit in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-002947. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6599456.), filed by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet 13) (ELMASRI, RAMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH HILLS PROPERTIES LLC et al v. STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Hills Properties LLC
Represented By: LYNN ANNE BRAUER
Represented By: ROBERT FRANCIS GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Everritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID EVERITT
Represented By: LYNN ANNE BRAUER
Represented By: ROBERT FRANCIS GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: RAMY PABLO ELMASRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?