SHARP v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: BYRON G SHARP
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 3:2022cv00826
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 03/09/22. (Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2022.) (jfj)
March 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (Neither filing fee, nor fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis received.) (jfj)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. ( Fee due by 2/28/2022.) (Order and form mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/27/2022. (alb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
January 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jfj)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by BYRON G SHARP. (No service copies, fee, or IFP motion received.) (jfj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARP v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYRON G SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?